Juscinska v. Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC et al

Plaintiff: Natalia Juscinska
Defendant: Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC and 170 Elizabeth Street LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01220
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC answer due 4/18/2019., Set/Reset Hearings:( Initial Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 11:40 AM before Judge Analisa Torres.) (mro)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED in part, DENIED in part. By April 18, 2019, Defendant Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 15, 2019 is ADJOURNED to April 29, 2019, at 11:40 a.m. By April 22, 2019, the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed case management plan. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 3/19/2019) (mro)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #5 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, #1 Complaint and request for adjournment of conference addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Benjamin A. Levine, Esq. dated March 19, 2019. Document filed by Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC.(Levine, Benjamin)
March 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Aaron Levine on behalf of Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC. (Levine, Benjamin)
March 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. 170 Elizabeth Street LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019; Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC served on 2/12/2019, answer due 3/5/2019. Service was accepted by secretary of state. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/11/2019) (mro)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/15/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 2/11/2019) (mro)
February 11, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 170 Elizabeth Street LLC, Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ELIZABETH STREET BAGEL VENTURES LLC and 170 ELIZABETH STREET LLC,, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Natalia Juscinska. (Sekendiz, Ismail)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 170 Elizabeth Street LLC, Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16315907)Document filed by Natalia Juscinska.(Sekendiz, Ismail)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Juscinska v. Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalia Juscinska
Represented By: Ismail Sinan Sekendiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Street Bagel Ventures LLC
Represented By: Benjamin Aaron Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 170 Elizabeth Street LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?