Stubbs v. The City of Newburgh et al

Plaintiff: Anisha L. Stubbs
Defendant: The Newburgh Police Department and The City of Newburgh
Case Number: 1:2019cv01226
Filed: February 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order Directing Prisoner Authorization, to Anisha L. Stubbs 164 Lander Street Apt. 2 Newburgh, NY 12550. (aea)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING PRISONER AUTHORIZATION: Plaintiff is directed to submit a completed and signed Prisoner Authorization Form to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Prisoner Authorization Form due by 4/29/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 3/28/2019) (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Authorization)(keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 21, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER re: I have a Complaint with the City of Newburgh an Newburgh Police Dept.. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs.(rdz)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER from Anisha Stubbs re: I have a case pending against the City of Newburgh and City of New Police Dept. basically the State of NY, However, I've been indicted on charges I'm not guilty of. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs.(sbr)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER from Anisha L. Stubbs dated 3/10/2019 re: I wanna put in a complaint against Orange County Court and Orange County Jail. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs. (sac)
March 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs.(sac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs.(rdz)
February 12, 2019 Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Anisha L. Stubbs 164 Lander Street Apt. 2 Newburgh, NY 12550. (aea)
February 11, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: Plaintiff is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 3/11/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 3/11/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/8/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(keb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
February 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Newburgh, The Newburgh Police Department. Document filed by Anisha L. Stubbs.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stubbs v. The City of Newburgh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Newburgh Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Newburgh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anisha L. Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?