Open Society Justice Initiative v. Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Defendant: Department of State and Department of Justice
Case Number: 1:2019cv01329
Filed: February 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference served on Department of Justice, Department of State on March 20, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/19/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer; and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/19/2019) (anc)
March 18, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Department of Justice, Department of State.(Teleanu, Natasha)
March 18, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Natasha Waglow Teleanu on behalf of Department of Justice, Department of State. (Teleanu, Natasha)
February 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Department of Justice answer due 3/18/2019; Department of State answer due 3/18/2019. (anc)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting (22) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases; granting (22) Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer in case 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 2/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00234-PAE, 1:19-cv-01329-PAE (anc) Modified on 2/27/2019 (anc).
February 27, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. (anc)
February 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
February 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
February 15, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
February 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of State. (jgo)
February 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Department of Justice. (jgo)
February 13, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 19-cv-234. (jgo)
February 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
February 12, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Open Society Institute for Open Society Justice Initiative. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-00234-PAE. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative.(Amirfar, Catherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of State, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Department of Justice, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Amirfar, Catherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Amirfar, Catherine)
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Justice, Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16334962)Document filed by Open Society Justice Initiative. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's FOIA requests)(Amirfar, Catherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Open Society Justice Initiative v. Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of State
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Represented By: Natasha Waglow Teleanu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Open Society Justice Initiative
Represented By: Catherine M. Amirfar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?