Lewis v. Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations et al.
Plaintiff: Donald Lewis
Defendant: Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations and Diarra Adama
Case Number: 1:2019cv01375
Filed: February 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Referring Judge: Nelson Stephen Roman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441au
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations. (Fallon, Connor)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Roseann Graffia, paralegal dated April 4, 2019 re: Partially signed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. Document filed by Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations.(Fallon, Connor)
March 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard S Weiss on behalf of Donald Lewis. (Weiss, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re: #9 Letter filed by Donald Lewis: Plaintiff's request for oral argument, (ECF No. 9), on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, (ECF No. 6), is GRANTED. Oral argument will be held on June 19, 2019 at 10:30 am. (Oral Argument set for 6/19/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/21/2019) (jwh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Paul Koenigsberg dated 3/20/19 re: requesting oral argument for motion to remand. Document filed by Donald Lewis.(Koenigsberg, Paul)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/19/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/20/2019) (rjm)
March 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so redesignated. (jc)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge George B. Daniels. Judge Nelson Stephen Roman is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
March 14, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Motion served on KEANE & BERNHEIMER, PLLC on 3/14/19. Document filed by Donald Lewis. (Koenigsberg, Paul)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Document filed by Donald Lewis.(Koenigsberg, Paul)
March 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Paul Koenigsberg on behalf of Donald Lewis. (Koenigsberg, Paul)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Fallon, Connor)
February 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Connor William Fallon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State);. (pc)
February 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Connor William Fallon. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations, Mr. Donald Lewis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Fallon, Connor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fallon, Connor)
February 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34521/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16344149).Document filed by Diarra Adama, Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter from Ambassador for the Pemanent Mission, #3 Exhibit Affidavits of Service)(Fallon, Connor)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Permanent Mission of Cote D'ivoire to The United Nations
Represented By: Connor William Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diarra Adama
Represented By: Connor William Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lewis
Represented By: Paul Koenigsberg
Represented By: Richard S Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?