Adjangba et al v. Hisko, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Ayayi Adjangba and Ayi Raycharles Adjangba
Defendant: Chantal Goli, Glenn Hisko, Jr. and Glenn Hisko Lowboy Service LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01415
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of of Appearance and Consent to Remove Action From State Court to Federal Court. Document filed by Glenn Hisko Lowboy Service LLC, Glenn Hisko, Jr.. (Eccher, Ann)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action having been assigned to me for all purposes, it is hereby, ORDERED as follows: If a conforming case management plan is submitted at least two business days prior to the scheduled initial conference and subsequently approved by the Court, the initial conference will be canceled automatically. If a motion has been filed either before or after the case management plan is approved, and the parties desire a conference, a letter must be submitted to the Court via fax specifically asking that the initial conference not be canceled. If the parties fail to agree upon such a plan or fail to submit the plan to the Court within the time provided (at least two business days before the conference date), the parties must appear for a conference on 7/26/2019 in courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007 at 11:15a.m. Initial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 2/21/2019) (mml) Modified on 2/22/2019 (mml).
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so redesignated. (wb)
February 19, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Vincent L. Briccetti is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scahill, Francis)
February 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Francis Scahill. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1441; County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1446; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Francis Scahill to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Defendant code - multiple selections;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Scahill, Francis) Modified on 2/15/2019 (jgo).
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 32346/18E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16350893).Document filed by Chantal Goli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Answer and Demands)(Scahill, Francis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adjangba et al v. Hisko, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chantal Goli
Represented By: Francis Scahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Hisko, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Hisko Lowboy Service LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayayi Adjangba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayi Raycharles Adjangba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?