Wahlhuetter v. CollegeHumor.com, LLC

Plaintiff: Sebastian Wahlhuetter
Defendant: CollegeHumor.com, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01501
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Richard Liebowitz dated April 19, 2019. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter.(Liebowitz, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to CollegeHumor.com, LLC. (km)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Richard Liebowitz in Support re: #12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter. (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter. (Liebowitz, Richard) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Order to Show Cause for default judgment and supporting papers by May 2, 2019. The initial pretrial conference is adjourned sine die and all other deadlines are canceled. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/5/2019) (kv)
April 4, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. CollegeHumor.com, LLC served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter. (Liebowitz, Richard)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. For the Court to determine whether Defendant's response to the Complaint is past due, Plaintiff must submit a dated proof of service as soon as possible and no later than April 8, 2019. If Plaintiff does not have proof of service, Plaintiff shall submit a letter, not to exceed 3 pages, on status of service, by April 8, 2019. Until the Court can determine whether Defendants are in default, the initial pretrial conference shall be adjourned to April 23, 2019. The conference materials, which must comply with Dkt. No. 7, are due April 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/4/2019) (cf)
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Richard Liebowitz dated April 2, 2019. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter.(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 2/26/2019) (ks)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CollegeHumor.com, LLC. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Liebowitz, Richard)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CollegeHumor.com, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter. (Liebowitz, Richard)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CollegeHumor.com, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16363623)Document filed by Sebastian Wahlhuetter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wahlhuetter v. CollegeHumor.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CollegeHumor.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian Wahlhuetter
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?