Kabir v. Jones, Jr. et al.
Plaintiff: FAISAL KABIR
Defendant: BER LIMOUSINE, INC., SHERMAN L JONES, Jr. and Sherman L. Jones, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01557
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 CASE REMANDED OUT from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the State Court - Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Sent certified copy of docket entries and remand order. Mailed via UPS Tracking Number 1zE22E532210015234 on 3/20/2019. (ne)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this matter is REMANDED to the New York State Supreme Court, Bronx County, with all parties to bear their own costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to remand this matter to the New York State Supreme Court, Bronx County, and to close the case brought in this District. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/18/2019) (ne) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Anne Marie Ladia-Garcia dated March 18, 2019. Document filed by Ber Limousine, Inc., Sherman L. Jones, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Supplemental Response to Statement of Damages, #2 Plaintiff's Stipulation capping damages to $75,000.00, #3 Proposed Order)(Ladia-Garcia, Anne Marie)
March 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 3/5/2019) (rro)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ladia, Anne)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Anne Marie Ladia to RE-FILE Document #4 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (ldi)
February 21, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Ber Limousine, Inc., Sherman L. Jones, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Ladia, Anne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ber Limousine, Inc., Sherman L. Jones, Jr..(Ladia, Anne) Modified on 2/26/2019 (ldi).
February 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anne Marie Ladia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 09:203;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332;. (pc)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anne Marie Ladia to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple citizenship of principal parties for the defendant were selected. Choose one. (pc)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anne Marie Ladia. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
February 20, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anne Marie Ladia. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: BER LIMOUSINE, INC., SHERMAN L JONES, Jr, FAISAL KABIR. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
February 19, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Notice of Removal,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16371529.(Ladia, Anne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ladia, Anne) Modified on 2/20/2019 (pc).
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by BER LIMOUSINE, INC., SHERMAN L JONES, Jr.(Ladia, Anne)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 28643/2018E..Document filed by BER LIMOUSINE, INC., SHERMAN L JONES, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Statement of Damages, #3 Exhibit Response Statement of Damages)(Ladia, Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kabir v. Jones, Jr. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BER LIMOUSINE, INC.
Represented By: Anne Marie Ladia-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHERMAN L JONES, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Marie Ladia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman L. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Anne Marie Ladia-Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FAISAL KABIR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?