Fulton County Employees' Retirement System v. Blankfein et al
Plaintiff: Fulton County Employees' Retirement System
Defendant: Mark A. Flaherty, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Mark O. Winkelman, Peter Oppenheimer, Lakshmi N. Mittal, David A. Viniar, M. Michele Burns, Jan E. Tighe, Ellen J. Kullman, David M. Solomon, Drew G. Faust, James A. Johnson, Lloyd Blankfein and William W. George
Nominal Defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01562
Filed: February 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sharon L. Nelles dated September 12, 2019 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Julia A. Malkina in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R)(Nelles, Sharon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #39 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint. . Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Nelles, Sharon)
September 12, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Amended Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17387075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph E. White, III, #2 Affidavit Michael E. Kramer, #3 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph)
August 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #37 MOTION for Michael E. Kramer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17387075. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
August 2, 2019 Filing 36 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE of Motion to Admit Michael E. Kramer Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Joseph E. White, III, #2 Affidavit Michael E. Kramer, #3 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing of Michael E. Kramer, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(White, Joseph) Modified on 8/7/2019 (wb).
July 12, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint, against Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. Related document: #1 Complaint,.(Singer, Steven)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned parties to this action, as follows: Plaintiff will serve and file the Amended Complaint on or before July 12, 2019. Defendants will have until September 12, 2019 to answer or move to dismiss the Amended Complaint. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Defendants' joint memorandum in support of the Dismissal Motion shall be a single brief not exceeding 35 pages. Plaintiff will have until November 5, 2019 (or up to 54 days from the filing of the Dismissal Motion if filed earlier than September 12, 2019) to serve and file its opposition memorandum, which shall not exceed 35 pages. Defendants will have until December 20, 2019 (or up to 45 days from the filing of Plaintiff's opposition if filed earlier than November 5, 2019) to serve and file their joint reply memorandum, which shall not exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 7/12/2019., Motions due by 9/12/2019., Responses due by 11/5/2019, Replies due by 12/20/2019.), Motions terminated: #33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brandon Grzandziel dated 06/28/2019 filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/1/2019) (rro)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Brandon Grzandziel dated 06/28/2019. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Singer, Steven)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned parties to this action, as follows: Plaintiff will serve and file the Amended Complaint on or before July 8, 2019. Defendants will have up to 60 days from the filing of the Amended Complaint to answer or move to dismiss the Amended Complaint. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint (the "Dismissal Motion"), Defendants' joint memorandum in support of the Dismissal Motion shall be a single brief not exceeding 35 pages. Plaintiff will have up to 60 days from the filing of the Dismissal Motion to serve and file its opposition memorandum, which will not exceed 35 pages. Defendants will have up to 45 days from the filing of Plaintiffs opposition memorandum to serve and file their joint reply memorandum, which will not exceed 15 pages. SO ORDERED. (Service due by 7/8/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/3/2019) (rro)
May 31, 2019 Filing 31 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Singer, Steven)
May 31, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Refunded: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee refunded for Receipt number ANYSDC-16372104, for the following reason(s): duplicate payment. (jom)
May 13, 2019 Filing 30 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sharon L. Nelles dated May 13, 2019 re: Oral Argument Request. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Julia A. Malkina in Support re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint.. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Nelles, Sharon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #27 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. . Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Nelles, Sharon)
May 13, 2019 Filing 27 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/8/2019) (rro)
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Sharon L. Nelles dated May 2, 2019. Document filed by Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman.(Nelles, Sharon)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Brandon Grzandziel to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Adam D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vernon S. Broderick)(Text Only Order) (msa)
March 20, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Adam D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Adam D. Warden, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order )(Warden, Adam)
March 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #21 MOTION for Adam D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Maya Saxena, #2 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Saxena, Maya)
March 19, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the attorneys for the undersigned parties to this action, as follows: The undersigned counsel for Defendants hereby accepts service of the Complaint in this action on behalf of all Defendants. Defendants will serve and file the Dismissal Motion on or before May 13, 2019. Plaintiff will have 60 days from service of the Dismissal Motion to serve and file its opposition to the Dismissal Motion ("Opposition"). Defendants will have 45 days from the service of the Opposition to serve and file a reply memorandum in support of the Dismissal Motion. Plaintiff hereby dismisses its Complaint without prejudice as to Defendants Jan E. Tighe and Drew G. Faust. Plaintiff reserves all rights to seek amendment of its Complaint, and Defendants reserve all rights to oppose. Defendants reserve and do not waive all rights and defenses, including as to jurisdiction, except for a defense as to the sufficiency of service of the Complaint. (Motions due by 5/13/2019.)(Drew G. Faust and Jan E. Tighe terminated.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/15/2019) (rro)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Goldman Sachs Group Inc..(Nelles, Sharon)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Julia A Malkina on behalf of Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Malkina, Julia)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Benjamin Robert Walker on behalf of Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Walker, Benjamin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Alexander Schwartz on behalf of Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Schwartz, Matthew)
March 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Maxwell Rein on behalf of Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Rein, David)
March 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon L. Nelles on behalf of Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Nelles, Sharon)
March 14, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Saxena, Maya) Modified on 3/14/2019 (ma).
March 14, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Singer, Steven)
March 14, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE AFFIDAVIT MUST LIST THE CASE CAPTION AND THE CASE NUMBER.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
March 12, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Adam D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16482707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Warden, Adam) Modified on 3/12/2019 (bcu).
March 12, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Saxena, Maya) Modified on 3/12/2019 (bcu).
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Brandon Grzandziel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Grzandziel, Brandon)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Saxena, Maya) Modified on 3/12/2019 (wb).
March 12, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #8 MOTION for Brandon Grzandziel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16444179, paid on 3/5/2019. (wb)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION to Amend/Correct Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the motion;. Re-file the motion using the event type Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice found under the event list Motions - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Brandon Grzandziel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #10 MOTION for Adam D. Warden to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16482707. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #9 MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Language is missing from the attorney affidavit/declaration per local Rule 1.3;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
March 5, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16443510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Saxena, Maya) Modified on 3/5/2019 (bcu).
March 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #6 MOTION for Maya Saxena to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16443510. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Florida;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (bcu)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 28, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-12084-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
February 20, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, The Goldman Sachs Group Inc., Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (sj)
February 20, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
February 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 20, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 1:18cv12084. (sj)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-12084-VSB. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Singer, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lloyd Blankfein, David M. Solomon, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System. (Singer, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Singer, Steven)
February 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lloyd Blankfein, M. Michele Burns, Drew G. Faust, Mark A. Flaherty, William W. George, James A. Johnson, Ellen J. Kullman, Lakshmi N. Mittal, Adebayo O. Ogunlesi, Peter Oppenheimer, David M. Solomon, Jan E. Tighe, David A. Viniar, Mark O. Winkelman. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16372152)Document filed by Fulton County Employees' Retirement System.(Singer, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fulton County Employees' Retirement System v. Blankfein et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Flaherty
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adebayo O. Ogunlesi
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark O. Winkelman
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Oppenheimer
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakshmi N. Mittal
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Viniar
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Michele Burns
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan E. Tighe
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen J. Kullman
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David M. Solomon
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drew G. Faust
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Johnson
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd Blankfein
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William W. George
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: The Goldman Sachs Group Inc.
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Matthew Alexander Schwartz
Represented By: Julia A Malkina
Represented By: Benjamin Robert Walker
Represented By: David Maxwell Rein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fulton County Employees' Retirement System
Represented By: Steven B. Singer
Represented By: Maya S Saxena
Represented By: Brandon Thomas Grzandziel
Represented By: Adam Warden
Represented By: Joseph E. White, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?