Schwartz v. James J. Peters VA Medical Center

Plaintiff: Arnold Schwartz
Defendant: James J. Peters VA Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv01635
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 5/16/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (cf)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 18, 2019, is adjourned to May 16, 2019, at 10:40 a.m. The parties shall file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by May 9, 2019. On April 22, 2019, Plaintiff shall file a status letter updating the Court regarding his efforts to serve Defendant. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/15/2019) (cf)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Letter and Proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Kurt Robertson, Esq. dated 4/12/2019. Document filed by Arnold Schwartz.(Robertson, Kurt)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. WHEREAS, the initial pretrial conference is scheduled for April 18, 2019; WHEREAS, the parties failed to file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order by April 11, 2019, as required by this Court's Order (Dkt. No. 5). It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order as soon as possible, and in any event no later than April 15, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 4/12/2019) (rjm)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER : It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. Parties who are not local (within the Metropolitan tri-state area) may request to attend by phone by filing a letter motion via ECF. Any open legal issues can be addressed at the conference. Additionally, in accordance with the Court's Individual Rules, the parties are hereby ORDERED to prepare a joint Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order in the form available at the Court's website (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Schofield) and append it to their joint letter described below. The parties must propose dates for the various deadlines even if they intend to request a stay of discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint letter on ECF at least seven calendar days prior to the initial pre-trial conference, not to exceed 5 pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs as further set forth in this Order. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: April 18, 2019 at 11:00 a.m., in Courtroom 1106 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Please monitor the docket the day before the conference, as the time may change slightly. (Initial Conference set for 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 3/7/19) (yv)
February 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Kurt Dominic Robertson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to Dutchess. (pne)
February 22, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James J. Peters VA Medical Center. (pne)
February 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
February 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Robertson, Kurt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to JAMES J. PETERS VA MEDICAL CENTER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Arnold Schwartz. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Robertson, Kurt)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James J. Peters VA Medical Center. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16385366)Document filed by Arnold Schwartz.(Robertson, Kurt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schwartz v. James J. Peters VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Peters VA Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Schwartz
Represented By: Kurt Dominic Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?