Altimeo Asset Management v. WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Altimeo Asset Management
Defendant: Ning Zhao, Xiaozhong Liu, ABG II-WX Limited, Yunfeng II WX Limited, Sequoia Capital China Growth Fund III, L.P., SPDB International Holdings Limited, WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc., Ping An Life Insurance Company of China. Ltd., New WuXi Life Science Limited, Yinfu Capital Management Co., Hillhouse Capital Fund II, L.P., WuXi Merger Limited, G&C IV Limited, Edward Hu, Boyu Capital Fund II, L.P., New WuXi Life Science Holdings Limited, Ge Li, Zhaohui Zhang, Constant Cypress Limited, G&C Partnership L.P. and Temasek Life Sciences Private Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv01654
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Initial Conference set for 7/12/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 2/25/2019) (jca)
February 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABG II-WX Limited, Boyu Capital Fund II, L.P., Constant Cypress Limited, G&C IV Limited, G&C Partnership L.P., Hillhouse Capital Fund II, L.P., Edward Hu, Ge Li, Xiaozhong Liu, New WuXi Life Science Holdings Limited, New WuXi Life Science Limited, Ping An Life Insurance Company of China. Ltd., SPDB International Holdings Limited, Sequoia Capital China Growth Fund III, L.P., Temasek Life Sciences Private Limited, WuXi Merger Limited, WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc., Yinfu Capital Management Co., Yunfeng II WX Limited, Zhaohui Zhang, Ning Zhao. (dnh)
February 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
February 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
February 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Altimeo Asset Management. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of Altimeo Asset Management. (Hood, Joseph)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc., Ge Li, Edward Hu, Ning Zhao, Xiaozhong Liu, Zhaohui Zhang, New WuXi Life Science Holdings Limited, New WuXi Life Science Limited, WuXi Merger Limited, G&C Partnership L.P., ABG II-WX Limited, Boyu Capital Fund II, L.P., Hillhouse Capital Fund II, L.P., Ping An Life Insurance Company of China. Ltd., Temasek Life Sciences Private Limited, G&C IV Limited, Yinfu Capital Management Co., Yunfeng II WX Limited, Sequoia Capital China Growth Fund III, L.P., Constant Cypress Limited, and SPDB International Holdings Limited., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Altimeo Asset Management. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABG II-WX Limited, Boyu Capital Fund II, L.P., Constant Cypress Limited, G&C IV Limited, G&C Partnership L.P., Hillhouse Capital Fund II, L.P., Edward Hu, Ge Li, Xiaozhong Liu, New WuXi Life Science Holdings Limited, New WuXi Life Science Limited, Ping An Life Insurance Company of China. Ltd., SPDB International Holdings Limited, Sequoia Capital China Growth Fund III, L.P., Temasek Life Sciences Private Limited, WuXi Merger Limited, WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc., Yinfu Capital Management Co., Yunfeng II WX Limited, Zhaohui Zhang, Ning Zhao. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16386841)Document filed by Altimeo Asset Management. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Assignment, #2 Schedule A)(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Altimeo Asset Management v. WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ning Zhao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiaozhong Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABG II-WX Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yunfeng II WX Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital China Growth Fund III, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPDB International Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WuXi PharmaTech (Cayman) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ping An Life Insurance Company of China. Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New WuXi Life Science Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yinfu Capital Management Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillhouse Capital Fund II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WuXi Merger Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&C IV Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Hu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyu Capital Fund II, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New WuXi Life Science Holdings Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ge Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhaohui Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constant Cypress Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G&C Partnership L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Temasek Life Sciences Private Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altimeo Asset Management
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?