In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan, International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No. 14 Pension and Health and Welfare Funds, Joseph Torsella, in His Official Capacity as Treasurer of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, Police Retirement System of St. Louis, Alaska Electrical Pension Fund, PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION, Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., First Tennessee Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Deutsche Bank AG, Barclays Bank PLC, Bank of America, N.A., UBS Securities LLC, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, FTN Financial Securities Corp., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Jefferies Group LLC,, BofA Securities, Inc. and Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Deerfield Beach Municipal Firefighters Pension Trust Fund and Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund
Consolidated Plaintiff: Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System
Case Number: 1:2019cv01704
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2019, (Consolidated Complaint due by May 23, 2109, Motions due by 6/13/2019., Reply to Response to Brief due by 7/9/2019., Responses due by 6/27/2019, Oral Argument set for 7/23/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Plaintiffs' position is that this case is to be tried to a jury. Defendants reserve all rights with respect to whether this case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 5/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2019. Motions due by 2/21/2020. Responses due by 3/6/2020 Replies due by 3/13/2020. Deposition due by 2/20/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/23/2019. Oral argument on the motion for class certification will be held on 2/17/20 at 4pm. Oral Argument set for 3/20/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/30/2020 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, and as further specified and set forth in this Civil Case Management Plan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/10/2019) (rjm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 168 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 4/26/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 14, 2019 Filing 167 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 4/26/2019 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/4/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
May 13, 2019 Filing 166 MOTION for Matthew E. Guarnero to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION, Police Retirement System of St. Louis.(Twersky, Mitchell)
May 13, 2019 Filing 165 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle J Kolb on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Kolb, Kyle)
May 13, 2019 Filing 164 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen M. Anderson on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Anderson, Kristen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 163 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Walter W. Noss on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Noss, Walter)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF CHRISTOPHER B. CRAIG granting #138 Motion for Christopher B. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/6/2019) (jwh)
May 3, 2019 Filing 161 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kyle C. Bisceglie on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Bisceglie, Kyle)
May 3, 2019 Filing 160 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John G. Moon on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Moon, John)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 159 MEMORANDUM ORDER denying #92 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting #94 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #98 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying #101 Motion to Appoint Counsel: Accordingly, the Court concludes that Scott/Lowey are best suited to represent the interests of the class. The Court's only concern is whether Scott/Lowey possesses the resources to litigate this case without excessive delegation to other firms. In their papers, Scott/Lowey obliquely suggested that they might "draw upon the resources of" seven other firms "if necessary." Scott/Lowey Mem. 11, ECF No. 95. That is not acceptable to the Court. No lead counsel work should be delegated to any firm that has not been investigated and approved by the Court. The Court therefore appoints Scott+Scott and Lowey Dannenberg as interim co-lead class counsel, on the condition that no lead counsel work be delegated to any other firm without first obtaining the Court's prior written approval. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close entries 92, 94, 98, and 101 on the docket of this case. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/2/2019) (jwh)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER: On April 3, 2019, this Court consolidated a number of related cases under the heading In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation. See Dkt. 19-cv-1704, ECF No. 86. Subsequently, the above-captioned individual case, docket number 19-cv-3261, was filed and reassigned as related to the consolidated cases. The Court therefore informed counsel for the plaintiffs in this case that, unless they objected by April 29, 2019, the Court would consolidate this case with the existing cases and place it on the same schedule as the others. No party objected to consolidation. Therefore, this case is hereby consolidated for all purposes under the In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation docket and shall be governed by the Court's prior scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 5/1/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-03261-JSR(mro)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #135 Motion for CAROL V. GILDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/24/2019) (ama)
April 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. (15 in 1:19-cv-02900-JSR, 45 in 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 111 in 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 155 in 1:19-cv-01704-JSR) MOTION for Christina D. Saler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16758540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(jc)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #139 Motion for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/23/2019) (ne)
April 24, 2019 Filing 155 MOTION for Christina D. Saler to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16758540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Saler, Christina)
April 23, 2019 Filing 154 MOTION for Jon R. Roellke to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16750411. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jefferies Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jon R. Roellke in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing - Massachusetts, #3 Exhibit C - Certificate of Good Standing - District of Columbia, #4 Exhibit D - [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al.(Roellke, Jon)
April 23, 2019 Filing 153 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Ols on behalf of Deerfield Beach Municipal Firefighters Pension Trust Fund, Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01900-JSR, 1:19-cv-02045-JSR(Ols, Michael)
April 23, 2019 Filing 152 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jayne Arnold Goldstein on behalf of Deerfield Beach Municipal Firefighters Pension Trust Fund, Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01900-JSR, 1:19-cv-02045-JSR(Goldstein, Jayne)
April 23, 2019 Filing 151 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Brendan Toscano on behalf of TD Securities (USA) LLC. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR(Toscano, David)
April 22, 2019 Filing 150 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Manisha M. Sheth on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. New Address: Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP, 51 Madison Avenue, 22nd Floor, New York, NY, United States of America 10010, 2128497000. (Sheth, Manisha)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER FOR MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #125 Motion for Jesse T. Smallwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (jwh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER FOR MOTION ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #126 Motion for William J. Vigen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (jwh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER FOR MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #127 Motion for Lauren A. Howard to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (jwh)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER FOR MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #124 Motion for Beth A. Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/18/2019) (jwh)
April 22, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. The Oral Argument formerly scheduled for April 23, 2019 is adjourned to 4/26/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 22, 2019 Filing 145 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Jefferies Financial Group Inc. for Jefferies Group LLC,. Document filed by Jefferies Group LLC,.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 144 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Ian Schacter on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Schacter, Kenneth)
April 22, 2019 Filing 143 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian A. Herman on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Herman, Brian)
April 22, 2019 Filing 142 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jawad B. Muaddi on behalf of Jefferies Group LLC,. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02900-JSR(Muaddi, Jawad)
April 22, 2019 Filing 141 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Michael Hall on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Hall, Jason)
April 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #139 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16735435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #138 MOTION for Christopher B. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16734626. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #135 MOTION for CAROL V. GILDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16723979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 19, 2019 Filing 140 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Brian Shamah on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Shamah, Adam)
April 19, 2019 Filing 139 MOTION for Henry B. Liu to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16735435. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C- Affidavit in Support)(Liu, Henry)
April 19, 2019 Filing 138 MOTION for Christopher B. Craig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16734626. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Joseph Torsella, in His Official Capacity as Treasurer of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Attachments: #1 Craig Declaration, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02438-JSR(Briganti, Vincent)
April 19, 2019 Filing 137 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Briganti on behalf of Joseph Torsella, in His Official Capacity as Treasurer of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania. (Briganti, Vincent)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #85 Motion for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/15/2019) (jca)
April 18, 2019 Filing 135 MOTION for CAROL V. GILDEN to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number NYSDC-16723979. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR(Gilden, Carol)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting (91) Motion for Brent W. Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice in case 1:19-cv-01704-JSR. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/15/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR (ks)
April 16, 2019 Filing 133 DECLARATION of Amanda F. Lawrence in Support re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 4/26/17 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 4/28/17 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - 6/8/17 Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - FINRA reports, #5 Exhibit 5 - Proposed timeline)(Lawrence, Amanda)
April 16, 2019 Filing 132 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Susman Godfrey LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Carmody, William)
April 16, 2019 Filing 131 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. . Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Lawrence, Amanda)
April 16, 2019 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Gregory R. Stokes in Support re: (101 in 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 104 in 1:19-cv-01796-JSR) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR(Brockett, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: (101 in 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 104 in 1:19-cv-01796-JSR) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR(Brockett, Daniel)
April 16, 2019 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: #92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, Robbins Geller Rudman & Down LLP, and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 16, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #127 MOTION for Lauren Anna Howard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #125 MOTION for Jesse T. Smallwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700381. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #124 MOTION for Beth Alison Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #126 MOTION for William Jefferson Vigen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 15, 2019 Filing 127 MOTION for Lauren Anna Howard to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700407. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Howard, Lauren)
April 15, 2019 Filing 126 MOTION for William Jefferson Vigen to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700389. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Vigen, William)
April 15, 2019 Filing 125 MOTION for Jesse T. Smallwood to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700381. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., BofA Securities, Inc., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Smallwood, Jesse)
April 15, 2019 Filing 124 MOTION for Beth Alison Stewart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16700239. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., BofA Securities, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit C)(Stewart, Beth)
April 12, 2019 Filing 123 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeremy Daniel Andersen on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Andersen, Jeremy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 122 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony P. Alden on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Alden, Anthony)
April 12, 2019 Filing 121 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony P. Alden on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Alden, Anthony)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER: No party objected to consolidation. Therefore, these cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes under the In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation docket and shall be governed by the Court's prior scheduling order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/12/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-03091-JSR, 1:19-cv-03122-JSR(jwh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 119 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Lepri on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Lepri, Thomas)
April 12, 2019 Filing 118 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steig Olson on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Olson, Steig)
April 12, 2019 Filing 117 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Atara Hirsch on behalf of PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION, Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Hirsch, Atara)
April 12, 2019 Filing 116 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Manisha M. Sheth on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Sheth, Manisha)
April 12, 2019 Filing 115 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell M.Z. Twersky on behalf of PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION, Police Retirement System of St. Louis. (Twersky, Mitchell)
April 12, 2019 Filing 114 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Mun-Yin Seck on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Seck, Christopher)
April 12, 2019 Filing 113 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Lawrence Brockett on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Brockett, Daniel)
April 11, 2019 Filing 112 NOTICE of In Support of Motion of Robbins Geller and Quinn Emmanuel for Appointment as Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by Police Retirement System of St. Louis, PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al.(Twersky, Mitchell)
April 11, 2019 Filing 111 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David W. Mitchell on behalf of Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Mitchell, David)
April 11, 2019 Filing 110 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 4/3/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 11, 2019 Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 4/3/2019 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/2/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 11, 2019 Filing 108 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Kunjumon Robertson on behalf of Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Robertson, Sharon)
April 11, 2019 Filing 107 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Abraham Braun on behalf of Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Braun, Robert)
April 10, 2019 Filing 106 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Kane on behalf of International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No. 14 Pension and Health and Welfare Funds. (Kane, Michael)
April 10, 2019 Filing 105 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund. (Nussbaum, Linda)
April 10, 2019 Filing 104 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Linda P. Nussbaum on behalf of Deerfield Beach Municipal Firefighters Pension Trust Fund. (Nussbaum, Linda)
April 10, 2019 Filing 103 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Margaret Ciavarella MacLean on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (MacLean, Margaret)
April 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #97 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 10, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #91 AMENDED MOTION for Brent William Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $200 Receipt No. ANYSDC-16653156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 9, 2019 Filing 102 DECLARATION of Daniel L. Brockett and David W. Mitchell in Support re: (104 in 1:19-cv-01796-JSR) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR(Brockett, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 101 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP and Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Alaska Electrical Pension Fund.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR(Brockett, Daniel)
April 9, 2019 Filing 100 DECLARATION of William Christopher Carmody in Support re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Susman Godfrey LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Carmody, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 99 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Susman Godfrey LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel. . Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. (Carmody, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 98 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Susman Godfrey LLP as Interim Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.(Carmody, William)
April 9, 2019 Filing 97 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. Related Document Number: #94 . (Lawrence, Amanda) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 9, 2019 Filing 96 DECLARATION of Amanda F. Lawrence in Support re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - S+S firm resume, #2 Exhibit 1 - Love Decl., #3 Exhibit 2 - Craig Decl., #4 Exhibit 3 - Donovan Decl., #5 Exhibit 4 - Briganti Decl., #6 Exhibit 5 - Seaver Decl., #7 Exhibit 6 - Zelcs Decl., #8 Exhibit 7 - Nussbaum Decl., #9 Exhibit 8 - Asciolla Decl., #10 Exhibit 9 - Dell'Angelo Decl., #11 Exhibit 10 - Freed Decl., #12 Exhibit 11 - Radice Decl.)(Lawrence, Amanda)
April 9, 2019 Filing 95 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. . Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Lawrence, Amanda)
April 9, 2019 Filing 94 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Scott+Scott Attorneys at Law LLP and Lowey Dannenberg, P.C. as Interim Co-Lead Counsel. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System.(Lawrence, Amanda)
April 9, 2019 Filing 93 DECLARATION of Michael B. Eisenkraft in Support re: #92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, Robbins Geller Rudman & Down LLP, and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel.. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 92 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Application to Appoint Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP, Robbins Geller Rudman & Down LLP, and Cohen Milstein Sellers & Toll, PLLC Interim Co-Lead Class Counsel. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund.(Eisenkraft, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 91 AMENDED MOTION for Brent William Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee $200 Receipt No. ANYSDC-16653156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR(Johnson, Brent)
April 9, 2019 Filing 90 MOTION for Brent William Johnson to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt No. ANYSDC-16653156. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust, Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR, 1:19-cv-01796-JSR, 1:19-cv-02715-JSR(Johnson, Brent)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting #72 Motion for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/29/2019) (kv)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hae Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/29/2019) (kv)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. Jury Trial set for 5/4/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Oral Argument on Lead Counsel set for 4/23/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/3/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER. On consent of all parties, and in accordance with the Court's oral ruling from the bench, these cases are hereby consolidated for all purposes under the title "In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation" and bearing the case number 19-cv-1704. All documents relating to these cases must be filed under the consolidated docket number. If a particular document relates only to a particular case or cases, that should be indicated in the heading. Counsel may, if they wish, also file documents on the individual dockets, so long as the documents are filed on the consolidated docket as well. Motions for the appointment of lead counsel must be filed by April 9, 2019. Any opposition is due by April 16, 2019. The Court will hold a hearing regarding the appointment of lead counsel on April 23, 2019 at 3:00pm, and will issue a ruling by May 1, 2019. The consolidated trial of these cases will begin on May 4, 2020. Following the appointment of lead counsel, the parties should confer and prepare, preferably jointly but otherwise separately, a proposed scheduling order governing discovery, motion practice, and all other pre-trial matters. The proposed scheduling order(s) should be submitted to the Court no later than May 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 4/9/2019. Responses due by 4/16/2019. Oral Argument set for 4/23/2019 at 03:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff). (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/3/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01704-JSR et al. (rjm)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #85 MOTION for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16608716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 2, 2019 Filing 85 MOTION for D. Jarrett Arp to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16608716. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of D.Jarrett Arp, #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order)(Arp, David)
April 2, 2019 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Stephen Mortenson on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Mortenson, Gregory)
April 2, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #83 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (jwh)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #64 Motion for Lara A. Flath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 4/1/2019) (jwh)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #12 Motion for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/29/2019) (jwh)
April 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #82 MOTION for Leslie R. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 1, 2019 Filing 82 MOTION for Leslie R. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Leslie)
April 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #81 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #80 MOTION for Jonathan D. Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 29, 2019 Filing 81 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John)
March 29, 2019 Filing 80 MOTION for Jonathan D. Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan D. Porter in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Jonathan)
March 29, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #79 MOTION for Leslie R. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16587897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing certificate of good standing from the Supreme Court of Massachusetts;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
March 29, 2019 Filing 79 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Leslie R. Stern to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16587897. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Stern, Leslie) Modified on 3/29/2019 (ma).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #51 Motion for Gretchen M. Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/22/2019) (jwh)
March 27, 2019 Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Lewis Taffet on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Taffet, Eric)
March 27, 2019 Filing 76 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lilia Borislavova Vazova on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Vazova, Lilia)
March 27, 2019 Filing 75 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lawrence Edward Buterman on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Buterman, Lawrence)
March 27, 2019 Filing 74 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Barclays Group US Inc., Corporate Parent Barclays US LLC, Corporate Parent Barclays PLC, Corporate Parent Barclays Bank PLC for Barclays Capital Inc.; Corporate Parent Barclays PLC for Barclays Bank PLC. Document filed by Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc..(Owens, Richard)
March 27, 2019 Filing 73 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard David Owens on behalf of Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc.. (Owens, Richard)
March 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #72 MOTION for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16571581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 27, 2019 Filing 72 MOTION for Adrienne V. Baxley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16571581. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Adrienne V. Baxley in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #3 MD Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Baxley, Adrienne)
March 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #70 MOTION for Jonathan D. Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #68 MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Virginia;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
March 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #67 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558827. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 25, 2019 Filing 71 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Bank AG, Corporate Parent DB USA Corporation, Corporate Parent DB U.S. Financial Markets Holding Corporation for Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc..(Terzaken, John)
March 25, 2019 Filing 70 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jonathan D. Porter to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558993. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jonathan D. Porter in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Porter, Jonathan) Modified on 3/26/2019 (wb).
March 25, 2019 Filing 69 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Abram Jeremy Ellis on behalf of Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Ellis, Abram)
March 25, 2019 Filing 68 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Terzaken to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Terzaken in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 VA Certificate of Good Standing, #3 DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Terzaken, John) Modified on 3/26/2019 (wb).
March 25, 2019 Filing 67 MOTION for John Edward Schmidtlein to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16558827. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Schmidtlein, John)
March 25, 2019 Filing 66 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent UBS Americas Holding LLC, Corporate Parent UBS Americas Inc., Other Affiliate UBS AG, Other Affiliate UBS Group AG for UBS Securities LLC. Document filed by UBS Securities LLC.(Bell, Jefferson)
March 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #64 MOTION for Lara A. Flath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16556236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 25, 2019 Filing 65 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jefferson Eliot Bell on behalf of UBS Securities LLC. (Bell, Jefferson)
March 25, 2019 Filing 64 MOTION for Lara A. Flath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16556236. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Lara A. Flath, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Flath, Lara)
March 25, 2019 Filing 63 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc..(Pitt, Jonathan)
March 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - PDF ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jonathan Bradley Pitt to RE-FILE Document #62 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. The attached PDF does not match the docket entry. (ldi)
March 22, 2019 Filing 62 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. Document filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc..(Pitt, Jonathan) Modified on 3/25/2019 (ldi).
March 22, 2019 Filing 61 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BAC North America Holding Company, Corporate Parent BANA Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Bank Of America Corporation, Corporate Parent NB Holdings Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. Document filed by Bank of America, N.A..(Pitt, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Bradley Pitt on behalf of Bank of America, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.. (Pitt, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE ANDTIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER, MOVE OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINTS: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, subject to approval of the Court, that: 1. The undersigned counsel accept service of the complaints in the Related Actions on behalf of their respective clients, expressly reserving the right to contest whether any party is properly named as a defendant, and without waiver of any defenses, including without limitation those related to personal jurisdiction and venue, except as to the sufficiency of process and the service of process. 2. All Defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaints filed in the Related Actions is hereby suspended until an order is entered by the Court at or after the April 3 initial conference at which the parties anticipate addressing with the Court, and as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/22/2019) (jca)
March 22, 2019 Filing 58 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Credit Suisse Group AG for Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. Document filed by Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC.(Januszewski, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Giffin Mann on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Mann, Samuel)
March 22, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter James Linken on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Linken, Peter)
March 22, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan David Thier on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Thier, Jonathan)
March 22, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David George Januszewski on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Januszewski, David)
March 22, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Herbert Scott Washer on behalf of Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC. (Washer, Herbert)
March 22, 2019 Filing 52 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent First Horizon National Corporation, Other Affiliate First Tennessee Bank National Association for FTN Financial Securities Corp.; Corporate Parent First Horizon National Corporation, Other Affiliate FTN Financial Securities Corp. for First Tennessee Bank, N.A.. Document filed by FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank, N.A..(Wick, Robert)
March 22, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Gretchen M. Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16541835. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 21, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Gretchen M. Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16541835. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Gretchen M. Wolf in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit of Gretchen M. Wolf -- Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Gretchen)
March 21, 2019 Filing 50 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Document filed by J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A..(Bershteyn, Boris)
March 21, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Boris Bershteyn on behalf of J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Bershteyn, Boris)
March 21, 2019 Filing 48 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. for Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. Document filed by Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC.(Pepperman, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Filing 47 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent BNP Paribas for BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp..(Hakki, Adam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Sloan Carter on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (Carter, Jonathan)
March 21, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Joseph Porpora on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (Porpora, Matthew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Agnes Dunogue on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Dunogue, Agnes)
March 21, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam Selim Hakki on behalf of BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Hakki, Adam)
March 21, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard C. Pepperman, II on behalf of Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC. (Pepperman, Richard)
March 21, 2019 Filing 41 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by BNP Paribas Securities Corp.. (Hakki, Adam)
March 21, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16538248. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 21, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Robert D. Wick to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16538248. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - DC Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Robert D. Wick)(Wick, Robert)
March 21, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lev Louis Dassin on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Dassin, Lev)
March 21, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Meredith Eve Kotler on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Kotler, Meredith)
March 21, 2019 Filing 37 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Financial Products Inc., Other Affiliate CitiGroup Inc., Other Affiliate Citigroup Global Markets Holdings Inc. for Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets Inc..(Weaver, Andrew)
March 21, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew W. Weaver on behalf of Citigroup Global Markets Inc.. (Weaver, Andrew)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE OF JULIA R. MCGRATH granting #26 Motion for Julia R. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/19/2019) (jwh)
March 20, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. FTN Financial Securities Corp. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Tara Washington, Compliance Clerk. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 20, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. First Tennessee Bank, N.A. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Tara Washington, Compliance Clerk. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #14 Motion for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/18/2019) (ks)
March 18, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/3/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B at the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/18/2019) (mro)
March 13, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Credit Suisse AG served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Lynanne Gares, Person Authorized to Accept Service. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. UBS Securities LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Jane Doe (name refused per company policy), Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 13, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bank of America, N.A. served on 3/12/2019, answer due 4/2/2019. Service was accepted by Lindsay Brunson, Service of Process Intake Clerk. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Julia R. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16479540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 12, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Julia R. McGrath to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16479540. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McGrath, Julia)
March 11, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. J.P. Morgan Securities LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Joanne Cook, Vice President - Litigation & Regulatory Proceedings. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Deutsche Bank Securities Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Deutsche Bank AG served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Kris Kwong, Paralegal. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Citigroup Global Markets Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Rodd Corner, Vice President - Paralegal. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 18 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. BNP Paribas Securities Corp. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 17 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barclays Capital Inc. served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Sattie Jairam, Service of Process Intake Coordinator. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Barclays Bank PLC served on 3/5/2019, answer due 3/26/2019. Service was accepted by Solomon Kibriye, Legal Department. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Burke, Christopher)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #13 Motion for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 3/5/2019) (jwh)
March 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16436802. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 4, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Carl Hammarskjold to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16436802. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammarskjold, Carl)
March 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #13 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16428665. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #12 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 1, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Randall P. Ewing, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16428665. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Randall P. Ewing, Jr. in Support of Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing from the State of Florida and State of Illinois, #3 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Ewing, Randall)
March 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for George A. Zelcs to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number:ANYSDC-16428454. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of George A. Zelcs, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing from the DC Bar and State of IL, #3 Exhibit [Proposed] Order Granting Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Zelcs, George) Modified on 3/1/2019 (ma).
February 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #11 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
February 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Seaver, Todd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Kay Boardman on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Boardman, Thomas)
February 26, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #9 MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16406989. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit/Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Todd A. Seaver to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16406989. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Seaver, Todd) Modified on 2/26/2019 (jc).
February 25, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank, N.A., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (sj)
February 25, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Burke, Christopher)
February 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
February 25, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
February 25, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
February 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Christopher M. Burke to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the event wrong event type was used to file the civil cover sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. (sj)
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Amanda F. Lawrence on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System. (Lawrence, Amanda)
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Roland Raymond St. Louis, III on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (St. Louis, Roland)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christian Levis on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Levis, Christian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vincent Briganti on behalf of City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Briganti, Vincent)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., First Tennessee Bank, N.A., FTN Financial Securities Corp., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., UBS Securities LLC, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Burke, Christopher)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Bank of America, N.A., Barclays Bank PLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Citigroup Global Markets Inc., Credit Suisse AG, Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank AG, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., FTN Financial Securities Corp., First Tennessee Bank, N.A., Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc., UBS Securities LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16393667)Document filed by Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W., City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System, Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Burke, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re GSE Bonds Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Global Markets Inc.
Represented By: Meredith Eve Kotler
Represented By: Lev Louis Dassin
Represented By: Andrew W. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lara A Flath
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Gretchen Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Represented By: Lara A Flath
Represented By: Boris Bershteyn
Represented By: Gretchen Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC
Represented By: Jonathan Sloan Carter
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Porpora
Represented By: Richard C. Pepperman, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: Jonathan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Tennessee Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Represented By: Lauren Anna Howard
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jesse T. Smallwood
Represented By: William Jefferson Vigen
Represented By: Beth A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Jonathan David Thier
Represented By: Peter James Linken
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank AG
Represented By: John Terzaken
Represented By: Abram Jeremy Ellis
Represented By: Adrienne Vollmer Baxley
Represented By: Jonathan Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank PLC
Represented By: Lilia Borislavova Vazova
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Represented By: Adam Brian Shamah
Represented By: Eric Lewis Taffet
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Bradley Pitt
Represented By: Lauren Anna Howard
Represented By: John E. Schmidtlein
Represented By: Jesse T. Smallwood
Represented By: William Jefferson Vigen
Represented By: Beth A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Represented By: Jefferson Eliot Bell
Represented By: David Jarrett Arp
Represented By: Kyle C. Bisceglie
Represented By: John G. Moon
Represented By: Kyle J Kolb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Represented By: Samuel Giffin Mann
Represented By: Jonathan David Thier
Represented By: Peter James Linken
Represented By: Herbert Scott Washer
Represented By: Jason Michael Hall
Represented By: David George Januszewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FTN Financial Securities Corp.
Represented By: Henry Liu
Represented By: Robert D. Wick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Represented By: Agnes Dunogue
Represented By: Adam Selim Hakki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Represented By: Lilia Borislavova Vazova
Represented By: Lawrence Edward Buterman
Represented By: Richard David Owens
Represented By: Adam Brian Shamah
Represented By: Eric Lewis Taffet
Represented By: Gregory Stephen Mortenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies Group LLC,
Represented By: Jawad B. Muaddi
Represented By: Brian A. Herman
Represented By: Kenneth Ian Schacter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BofA Securities, Inc.
Represented By: Lauren Anna Howard
Represented By: Jesse T. Smallwood
Represented By: William Jefferson Vigen
Represented By: Beth A. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC
Represented By: Richard A. Rosen
Represented By: Adam Block Schwartz
Represented By: Susanna Michele Buergel
Represented By: Jane Baek O'Brien
Represented By: Brad Scott Karp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension System Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Leslie R. Stern
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Represented By: Julia R McGrath
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Birmingham Retirement and Relief System
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Amanda F. Lawrence
Represented By: Julia R McGrath
Represented By: Thomas Kay Boardman
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Represented By: Walter W. Noss
Represented By: Kristen M. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local 103, I.B.E.W. Health Benefit Plan
Represented By: Christopher M. Burke
Represented By: Leslie R. Stern
Represented By: Christian Levis
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Represented By: George A. Zelcs
Represented By: Margaret Ciavarella MacLean
Represented By: Randall P. Ewing, Jr.
Represented By: Todd Seaver
Represented By: Carl Hammarskjold
Represented By: Julia R McGrath
Represented By: Roland Raymond St. Louis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Heat and Frost Insulators and Allied Workers Local No. 14 Pension and Health and Welfare Funds
Represented By: Michael J. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Torsella, in His Official Capacity as Treasurer of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Represented By: Vincent Briganti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Police Retirement System of St. Louis
Represented By: Mitchell M.Z. Twersky
Represented By: Atara Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Electrical Pension Fund
Represented By: Manisha M. Sheth
Represented By: Thomas Lepri
Represented By: David W. Mitchell
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Brockett
Represented By: Steig Olson
Represented By: Anthony P. Alden
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Andersen
Represented By: Christopher Mun-Yin Seck
Represented By: Steven M Jodlowski
Represented By: Brian O. O'Mara
Represented By: Patrick Joseph Coughlin
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Represented By: Ashley M Kelly
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PUERTO RICO GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES AND JUDICIARY RETIREMENT SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION
Represented By: Mitchell M.Z. Twersky
Represented By: Atara Hirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Area Rapid Transit Employees Defined Benefit Retirement Plan and Trust
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Robert Abraham Braun
Represented By: Christina Donato Saler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheet Metal Workers Local 19 Pension Fund
Represented By: Sharon Kunjumon Robertson
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Eisenkraft
Represented By: Carol V. Gilden
Represented By: Robert Abraham Braun
Represented By: Christina Donato Saler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: William Christopher Carmody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Deerfield Beach Municipal Firefighters Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Lincolnshire Police Pension Fund
Represented By: Linda P. Nussbaum
Represented By: Jayne Arnold Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Oklahoma Police Pension and Retirement System
Represented By: Gregory Scott Asciolla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?