State Street Global Advisors Trust Company v. Visbal
Plaintiff: State Street Global Advisors Trust Company
Defendant: Kristen Visbal
Case Number: 1:2019cv01719
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Motions due by 1/8/2020. Deposition due by 10/20/2019. Fact Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/9/2019. Status Conference set for 12/19/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4-6 days. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/24/2019) (ks)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/23/2019. (Court Reporter Andrew Walker) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Steve Mitby dated 04/22/2019 re: Preliminary Injunction. Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - A Terms & Conditions, #2 Exhibit - B Redline)(Mitby, Steven)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material...SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 4/19/2019) (anc)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #50 Motion for Michael A. Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Autuoro and Steve Mitby dated April 18, 2019 re: Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order)(Autuoro, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION for M.A. "Mickey" Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court Cert of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Mills, Michael)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #49 MOTION for M.A. "Mickey" Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16715102. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #50 MOTION for M.A. "Mickey" Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for M.A. "Mickey" Mills to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16715102. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Mills, Michael) Modified on 4/18/2019 (wb).
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from SSGA and Kristen Visbal dated 04/16/2019 re: Status of the Case. Document filed by Kristen Visbal.(Wolff, Nancy)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Wolff, Nancy)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/18/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/18/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Steven Griffing, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/15/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Kristen Visbal answer due 4/15/2019. (jwh)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #43 Letter filed by Kristen Visbal. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. The deadline for defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to April 15, 2019. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for April 9, 2019 is adjourned to April 23, 2019 at 1:30 p.m. The joint letter and proposed case management plan described in the Court's March 13, 2019 order, Dkt. No. 31, are due no later than April 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Gregory H. Woods.) (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/29/2019) (anc)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nancy E. Wolff dated 03/28/2019 re: request for a brief adjournment of the current deadlines. Document filed by Kristen Visbal.(Wolff, Nancy)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Steven J. Mitby to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Steven J. Mitby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16573048. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Steven J. Mitby to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16573048. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Mitby, Steven)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/5/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/5/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Carol Ganley, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a MOTION proceeding held on 2/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: MOTION held on 2/25/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/12/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/22/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from John S. Goetz dated March 22, 2019 re: Letter filed by Mr. Gigante on March 4, 2019. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company.(Goetz, John)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying #32 Letter Motion to Expedite. For the reasons stated on the record during the teleconference held on March 18, 2019, the Court denies Plaintiffs motion asking the Court to affirm that the injunctive relief granted in section three of the preliminary injunction order that the Court granted on March 6, 2019, Dkt. No. 27, may be effectuated through the company that hosts the website at which Defendants automated sales form is located. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 32. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods)(Text Only Order) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Telephone Conference held on 3/18/2019. (Daniels, Anthony)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER. The Court will hold a teleconference to discuss the relief requested in Plaintiffs March 14, 2019 letter, Dkt. No. 32, on March 18, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. The parties are directed to call Chambers (212-805-0296) at that time with all parties on the line. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on March 15, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nancy E. Wolff dated 03/14/2019 re: Defendant's response letter to Court re Plaintiff's March 14, 2019 letter to the Court requesting the Court extend further injunctive relief beyond that granted in the Court's Order dated March 6, 2019. Document filed by Kristen Visbal.(Wolff, Nancy)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 LETTER MOTION to Expedite Request for Preliminary Injunctive Relief addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Autuoro dated March 14, 2019. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Autuoro, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 4/9/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods; and as further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/13/2019) (anc)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 2/25/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 2/25/2019 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Andrew Walker, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/15/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent State Street Bank and Trust Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company.(Autuoro, Michael)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Accordingly it is hereby ORDERED that: Defendant is enjoined from completing (or effecting completion of) the delivery, sale, or transfer of a German replica to her undisclosed buyer or buyers in Germany, to the extent that such delivery, sale, or transfer has not already taken place; Defendant is enjoined from promoting a German replica; and Defendant is enjoined from using an automated sales form to sell replicas including but not limited to the use of the automated sales form located at https://www.fearlessgirl.us/purchase-a-reproduction/. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/6/2019) (anc)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Autuoro dated March 6, 2019 re: Filing of the Declaration of Rebecca Elise Smith. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Rebecca Elise Smith)(Autuoro, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gregory H. Woods: Status Conference held on 3/5/2019. (Court Reporter Carol Ganley) (Daniels, Anthony)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: On February 26, 2019, the Court held a hearing regarding Plaintiff's application for a temporary restraining order. For the reasons stated on the record during that hearing, the Court denied Plaintiff's application for entry of a temporary restraining order. The Court granted and denied in part Plaintiff's request for expedited discovery. The Court ordered that the following discovery be provided by Defendant within thirty (30) days after February 26, 2019: and further set forth in this Order. The Court's order was entered on the basis of information available to it at the date of the conference and is subject to further modifiation by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 3/1/2019) (rro)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Alexander Gigante dated 03/04/2019 re: Request at Hearing for Extension of Deadlines. Document filed by Kristen Visbal.(Gigante, Alexander)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Nancy E. Wolff dated 03/04/2019 re: Plaintiff's Request for Restraining Order. Document filed by Kristen Visbal.(Wolff, Nancy)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Service was accepted by Richard Long, Paralegal authorized to accept on Nancy Wolff's behalf. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Autuoro, Michael)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Alexander Gigante on behalf of Kristen Visbal. (Gigante, Alexander)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolff, Nancy)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sara Marie Gates on behalf of Kristen Visbal. (Gates, Sara)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. The Court will hold a hearing to address the issues raised in Plaintiffs letter, Dkt. No. 7, on March 5, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Gregory H. Woods on March 1, 2019) (Text Only Order)(Daniels, Anthony)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief For a Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Expedited Discovery. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Autuoro, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIRMATION of Lochiel Crafter in Support re: #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Autuoro, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIRMATION of Michael F. Autuoro in Support re: #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Autuoro, Michael)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Autuoro, Michael) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief For Sealing Confidential Court Records and Expedited Consideration. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Goetz, John)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIRMATION of John S. Goetz in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Goetz, John)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIRMATION of John S. Goetz in Support re: #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Goetz, John)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Goetz, John) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REJECTION OF PROPOSED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Notice to Attorney Michael Autuoro re: Document #14 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was rejected by the Clerk's Office for the following reason, the Temporary Restraining Order should not be electronically filed. Please download and review the Local Rules, Judge's Individual Rules of Practice and ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (km)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #10 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR A SEALING OF CONFIDENTIAL COURT RECORDS IN CIVIL ACTION: It is hereby ordered that, in light of defendant's removal of this action to Federal court, and in light of plaintiff's intention to file for emergency relief before the judge to whom this matter is assigned, that plaintiff may file these materials in the SDNY notwithstanding their stat-court caption and form; and it is further ordered that plaintiff may file case materials associated with the initiation of the litigation under seal, provided that by 5 p.m. Wednesday, February 27, plaintiff publicly file redacted versions of these materials on the docket of this case, redacting only as necessary. ENTERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer, sitting Part I on 2/25/2019) (anc)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application granted. The parties are directed to review and comply with the Court's Individual Rules of Practice in Civil Cases, which contain rules regarding the submission of proposed redactions. The parties are reminded that their agreement to maintain a document confidential does not on its own dictate whether or not the presumption of public access to judicial documents has been overcome. The Court is mindful of the fact that, as the parties indicate in their letter, the agreements at issue are, and already have been, the specific focus of the Court's evaluation of the parties' dispute. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion pending at Dkt. No. 6. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 2/28/2019) (anc)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Autuoro dated February 27, 2019 re: Notice to the Court of Facts Concerning Defendant's Participation in the Australia Unveiling Ceremony. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael F. Autuoro)(Autuoro, Michael)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File materials associated with Plaintiff's Orders to Show Cause addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Michael F. Autuoro dated February 27, 2019. Document filed by State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Autuoro, Michael)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Stephen Goetz on behalf of State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Goetz, John)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Vivian Chiwing Cheng on behalf of State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Cheng, Vivian)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kristen A. McCallion on behalf of State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (McCallion, Kristen)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Frank Autuoro on behalf of State Street Global Advisors Trust Company. (Autuoro, Michael)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 650981/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16396013).Document filed by Kristen Visbal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Summons, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Complaint & Exhibits)(Wolff, Nancy)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Nancy Evelyn Wolff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: State Street Global Advisors Trust Company, Kristen Visbal. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Nancy Evelyn Wolff. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nancy Evelyn Wolff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Street Global Advisors Trust Company v. Visbal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Visbal
Represented By: Nancy Evelyn Wolff
Represented By: Steven John Mitby
Represented By: Sara Marie Gates
Represented By: Alexander Gigante
Represented By: Michael Mickey Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Street Global Advisors Trust Company
Represented By: Vivian Chiwing Cheng
Represented By: Kristen A. McCallion
Represented By: John Stephen Goetz
Represented By: Michael Frank Autuoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?