Colbourne v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased and Prinsema Colbourne
Defendant: United States America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01757
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Sarah Netburn
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by United States America, Prinsema Colbourne. (Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge) CASE ASSIGNED to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. IT IS ORDERED: This case ls referred to a United States magistrate judge to conduct all proceedings and order the entry of a final judgment in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed. R. Clv. P. 73. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/23/19) (yv)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. The conference is canceled. The Court will enter the consent to try this matter before a Magistrate Judge, Assigning this matter to Magistrate Judge Netburn. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 4/23/2019) (js)
April 23, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kirti Vaidya Reddy on behalf of United States America. (Reddy, Kirti)
April 23, 2019 Filing 15 EMERGENCY LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference set for 04/23/2019 at 4:30pm addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Joseph Santora dated 04/23/2019. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne.(Santora, Joseph)
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Joint Consent to Magistrate re: Case Designation,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph)
April 22, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of A085 re: Case Designation,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph)
April 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Consent to Magistrate re: Case Designation,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph)
April 18, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER re: consent to magistrate. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne.(Santora, Joseph)
March 29, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
March 14, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Kirti Vaidya Reddy dated March 14, 2019 re: opposition to consolidation with 16 Civ. 5606. Document filed by United States America.(Reddy, Kirti)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
February 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
February 28, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:16-cv-05606-SN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb)
February 27, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Santora to RE-FILE Document No. #8 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY. (dnh)
February 27, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DUPLICATE DOCKET ENTRY -REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph) Modified on 2/27/2019 (dnh).
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Santora to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney information omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne. (Santora, Joseph) Modified on 2/26/2019 (dnh).
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Joseph Santora to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Attorney information was omitted. Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name (c/o General Counsel). The form used for the summons is blank. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge John G. Koeltl as possibly related to 1:16-cv-05606-SN. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joseph Santora. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:2271; Arbitration code m (Mandatory);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1367; the Arbitration code has been deleted. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joseph Santora. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased. (Santora, Joseph) Modified on 2/26/2019 (dnh).
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:16-cv-05606 (SN). Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased.(Santora, Joseph)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Santora, Joseph)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED BLANK SUMMONS FORM - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States of America, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased. (Santora, Joseph) Modified on 2/26/2019 (dnh).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States America. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16401863)Document filed by Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rosita Colbourne Claim, #2 Exhibit Prinsema-claim-death)(Santora, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colbourne v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States America
Represented By: Kirti Vaidya Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prinsema Colbourne, As Adminstratrix of the Estate of Rosita Colbourne, Deceased
Represented By: Joseph Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prinsema Colbourne
Represented By: Joseph Santora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?