Castillo v. 235 Hotel, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Castillo
Defendant: 235 Hotel, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01773
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331fm
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (235 Hotel, LLC answer due 5/15/2019.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/22/2019) (rro)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Anthony J. Tomari dated April 18, 2019. Document filed by 235 Hotel, LLC.(Tomari, Anthony)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony John Tomari on behalf of 235 Hotel, LLC. (Tomari, Anthony)
April 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lisa Castillo served on 3/19/2019, answer due 4/9/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Secretary of State authorized agent. Document filed by Lisa Castillo. (Lipsky, Douglas)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to 235 Hotel, LLC. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lipsky, Douglas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to 235 Hotel, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Lisa Castillo. (Lipsky, Douglas)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 235 Hotel, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16405302)Document filed by Lisa Castillo.(Lipsky, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. 235 Hotel, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 235 Hotel, LLC
Represented By: Anthony John Tomari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Castillo
Represented By: Douglas Brian Lipsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?