Gabry v. Verizon Wireless NA

Plaintiff: Anthony Gerald Garby and Anthony Gerald Gabry
Defendant: Verizon Wireless NA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01826
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Barbara C Moses
Referring Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1332rd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Mailed a copy of #8 Order, to Anthony Gerald Gabry 1828 Gold Finch Way Lawrenceville, GA 30043. (aea)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REGARDING GENERAL PRETRIAL MANAGEMENT: The above-referenced action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for general pretrial management, including scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). All pretrial motions and applications, including those related to scheduling and discovery (but excluding motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, for injunctive relief, for summary judgment, or for class certification under Fed. R. Civ. P. 23) must be made to Judge Moses and in compliance with this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, available on the Court's website at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Moses. Parties and counsel are cautioned as further set forth herein. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this Order to the plaintiff. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 4/9/2019) (ks) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 4/16/2019 (ks).
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FRCP INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Anthony Gerald Gabry 1828 Gold Finch Way Lawrenceville, GA 30043, at, on 4/8/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a flyer about the free legal assistance clinic located in the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse (only in non prisoner cases), a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge, a form for you to complete if you consent to receive filings electronically (only in nonprisoner cases). (nb)
April 8, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 4/8/2019 Re: Judge Alison J. Nathan #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Verizon Wireless NA. (nb)
April 8, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Verizon Wireless NA. (nb)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order and the accompanying referral order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to complete a USM-285 form with the address for Verizon Wireless NA, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service on this defendant to the U.S. Marshals Service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/5/2019) (kv) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 4/5/2019) (kv)
April 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
April 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
April 3, 2019 Mailed a copy of #3 Order Granting IFP Application to Anthony Gerald Gabry 1828 Gold Finch Way Lawrenceville, GA 30043. (aea)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 4/2/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
February 25, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Verizon Wireless NA. Document filed by Anthony Gerald Gabry. (sac) Modified on 4/2/2019 (sac).
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Anthony Gerald Gabry.(sac) Modified on 4/2/2019 (sac).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabry v. Verizon Wireless NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verizon Wireless NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gerald Garby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Gerald Gabry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?