Bittner v. ProShares Trust II et al
Plaintiff: Jeff Bittner
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC, Jefferies LLC, Virtu Financial BD LLC, Knight Execution & Clearing Services, LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Goldman, Sachs & Co., ProShares Trust II, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Todd B. Johnson, Banca IMI Securities Corp., Michael L. Sapir, Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp., UBS Securities LLC, Louis M. Mayberg, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., ProShare Capital Management LLC, Edward Karpowicz, HRT Financial LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Wedbush Securities, Inc., Timber Hill, LLC,, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Newedge USA LLC, ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC and RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Petitioner: Stacy Smith, Fei Liu, Kershner Trading Group, LLC, Anthony Ludovici, Thomas Butler, III, Great Point Capital LLC and Lisa Ludovici
Case Number: 1:2019cv01840
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Barbara Hart dated April 10, 2019 re: the Lead Plaintiff Motion of Kershner Trading Group, LLC. Document filed by Kershner Trading Group, LLC.(Hart, Barbara)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: The above-captioned cases having been reassigned to this Court on April 4, 2019, it is hereby ORDERED that the time of the April 29, 2019 conference is moved from 9 a.m. to 10 a.m. in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street. Prior to the date of the conference, all parties must send the Court one copy of all pleadings. All pretrial conferences must be attended by the attorney who will serve as principal trial counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the briefing schedule on the pending lead plaintiff motions filed on April 1 shall remain unchanged. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 4/5/2019) (gr)
April 4, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Ronnie Abrams is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
April 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #12 Proposed Order #11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
April 2, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Great Point Capital LLC. Related Document Number: [19-cv-886, Dkt. No. 77]. (Apton, Adam) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Thomas Butler, III, Fei Liu, Stacy Smith, Anthony Ludovici, Lisa Ludovici. Related Document Number: [82 in Case No. 1:19-cv-00886]. (Rosenfeld, David) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #10 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
April 2, 2019 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Kershner Trading Group, LLC. Related Document Number: #7 . (Hart, Barbara) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
April 1, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Barbara Hart in Support re: #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-0886, 19-cv-1840, 19-cv-1955 . MOTION to Appoint Kershner Trading Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Kershner Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Hart, Barbara)
April 1, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-0886, 19-cv-1840, 19-cv-1955 . MOTION to Appoint Kershner Trading Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Kershner Trading Group, LLC. (Hart, Barbara)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-0886, 19-cv-1840, 19-cv-1955 ., MOTION to Appoint Kershner Trading Group, LLC to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Kershner Trading Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hart, Barbara)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that, no later than March 22, 2019, Plaintiff shall inform the Court whether he intends to file notice of this action pursuant to 15 U.S.C. 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(i) or whether he believes further notice is not required under 78u-4(a)(3)(A)(ii). If Plaintiff intends to rely on the notice filed in the Related Action, briefing on the appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel shall adhere to the schedule set in the Related Action. See 19-CV-319, Dkt. 5. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall participate in the conference in the Related Action, which has been scheduled for April 29, 2019 at 9 a.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007 to consider any motions for appointment of lead plaintiff and lead counsel and for consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall promptly serve a copy of this Order on each of the Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 4/29/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams.) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/19/2019) (anc)
March 18, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so redesignated. (jc)
March 18, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
March 18, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-00886-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
February 28, 2019 Filing 5 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:19-cv-00886 (RA). Document filed by Jeff Bittner.(Holleman, William)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banca IMI Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HRT Financial LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Todd B. Johnson, Edward Karpowicz, Knight Execution & Clearing Services, LLC, Louis M. Mayberg, Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Newedge USA LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., ProShare Capital Management LLC, ProShares Trust II, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Michael L. Sapir, Timber Hill, LLC,, UBS Securities LLC, Virtu Financial BD LLC, Wedbush Securities, Inc.. (jgo)
February 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
February 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Scott Holleman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Jeff Bittner. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney William Scott Holleman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (jgo)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ProShares Trust II, ProShare Capital Management LLC, Todd B. Johnson, Edward Karpowicz, Michael L. Sapir, Louis M. Mayberg, ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, Banca IMI Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HRT Financial LLC, Jefferies LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Knight Execution & Clearing Services, LLC, Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp., Mizuho Securities USA LLC., Newedge USA LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Timber Hill, LLC, UBS Securities LLC, Virtu Financial BD LLC, Wedbush Securities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Jeff Bittner. (Holleman, William)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Holleman, William)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC, BNP Paribas Securities Corp., Banca IMI Securities Corp., Barclays Capital Inc., Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman, Sachs & Co., HRT Financial LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Jefferies LLC, Todd B. Johnson, Edward Karpowicz, Knight Execution & Clearing Services, LLC, Louis M. Mayberg, Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Newedge USA LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., ProShare Capital Management LLC, ProShares Trust II, RBC Capital Markets, LLC, SG Americas Securities, LLC, Michael L. Sapir, Timber Hill, LLC,, UBS Securities LLC, Virtu Financial BD LLC, Wedbush Securities, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16412028)Document filed by Jeff Bittner.(Holleman, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bittner v. ProShares Trust II et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SG Americas Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferies LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtu Financial BD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Execution & Clearing Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Suisse Securities (USA) LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman, Sachs & Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProShares Trust II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Capital Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banca IMI Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Sapir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch Professional Clearing Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louis M. Mayberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNP Paribas Securities Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ProShare Capital Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Karpowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRT Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nomura Securities International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wedbush Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timber Hill, LLC,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mizuho Securities USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newedge USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABN AMRO Clearing Chicago LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RBC Capital Markets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Bittner
Represented By: William Scott Holleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Stacy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fei Liu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kershner Trading Group, LLC
Represented By: Barbara J. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Ludovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas Butler, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Great Point Capital LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lisa Ludovici
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?