Suris v. Columbia University
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Defendant: Columbia University
Case Number: 1:2019cv01864
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Robert W Lehrburger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. SO ORDERED. Columbia University answer due 5/29/2019. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 4/23/2019) (mml)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint requesting an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint by thirty (30) days, up to and including May 29, 2019 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Samuel Sverdlov, Esq. dated April 23, 2019. Document filed by Columbia University.(Sverdlov, Samuel)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Columbia University served on 3/8/2019, answer due 4/29/2019. Service was accepted by Elizabeth Conley, Paralegal. Document filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Segal, Mitchell)
March 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Columbia University answer due 4/29/2019. (rro)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger on 3/18/2019) (rro)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File requesting an extension of time for Defendant to respond to the Complaint by thirty (30) days, up to and including April 29, 2019 addressed to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger from Samuel Sverdlov, Esq. dated March 18, 2019. Document filed by Columbia University.(Sverdlov, Samuel)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Segal, Mitchell)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger. The parties are hereby notified that this Court has written on a legal issue that appears central to this case: the applicability of the ADA to websites. See Del-Orden v. Bonobos, Inc., No. 17 Civ. 2744 (PAE), 2017 WL 6547902 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 20, 2017). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 3/4/2019) (kv)
March 1, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Columbia University. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mitchell S. Segal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Yaroslav Suris. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Mitchell S. Segal to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the Signature of Attorney of Record was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
March 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mitchell S. Segal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000,000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to left blank; the County code has been modified to Nassau; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
March 1, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #3 Complaint. Filing fee $ $400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16415925, paid on 02/27/2019. (dnh)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Columbia University. Document filed by Yaroslav Suris.(Segal, Mitchell)
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Mitchell S. Segal to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 3/5/2019. (sj)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Segal, Mitchell) Modified on 3/1/2019 (dnh).
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Columbia University, re: Complaint. Document filed by Yaroslav Suris. (Segal, Mitchell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Suris v. Columbia University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbia University
Represented By: Samuel Sverdlov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yaroslav Suris
Represented By: Mitchell S. Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?