Ryszetnyk v. City of New York
Plaintiff: thomas Ryszetnyk
Defendant: the city of new york and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv02027
Filed: March 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William H Pauley
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by City of New York.(Depugh, David)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Lee Depugh on behalf of City of New York. (Depugh, David)
March 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This action has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. Counsel are directed to appear in Courtroom 20B at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007 on June 4, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. for an initial pretrial conference with the Court. At that conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the narrowing of issues or claims, amendment of pleadings, contemplated motions, discovery, and settlement. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/4/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 3/12/2019) (ama)
March 8, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. City of New York served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. Service was accepted by B. Mazyck, Window Clerk. Document filed by Thomas Ryszetnyk. (Friedman, Bernard)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City of New York. (dnh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Thomas Ryszetnyk. (Friedman, Bernard)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Friedman, Bernard)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Bernard D. Friedman to RE-FILE Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Request for Issuance of Summons must be filed separately; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Summons form dated June 2012. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) Modified on 3/6/2019 (jgo).
March 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
March 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
March 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Bernard D. Friedman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bernard D. Friedman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $105000; Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $1050000; the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
March 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Bernard D. Friedman. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet separately. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
March 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against the city of new york. Document filed by thomas Ryszetnyk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Friedman, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ryszetnyk v. City of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: thomas Ryszetnyk
Represented By: Bernard D. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: the city of new york
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: David Lee Depugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?