Ohio Imaging Associates, Inc. v. Radiology Partners, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.
Defendant: Radiology Partners, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Columbus Radiology Corp. and Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02496
Filed: March 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:30 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos. (jar)
July 30, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Rescheduling Notice - The December 4 case management is adjourned to March 4, 2021, at 10:30 a.m. (jar)
July 30, 2020 Filing 55 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. Attorney Dominic Joseph Picca terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/30/2020) (mro)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the Discovery Deadlines in the Scheduling Order. ACCORDINGLY, it is hereby ORDERED, that the Motion is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 12/17/2020. Discovery due by 3/4/2021. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/29/2020) (jca)
July 29, 2020 Filing 53 MOTION for Dominic J. Picca to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendants. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Dominic J. Picca)).(Kurtz, David)
July 28, 2020 Filing 52 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the Discovery Deadlines in the Scheduling Order addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from David C. Kurtz dated July 28, 2020. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Kurtz, David)
July 27, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephen Stecker on behalf of Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc...(Stecker, Stephen)
July 27, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Charles Kurtz on behalf of Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc...(Kurtz, David)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #48 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Hoenig dated 05/06/2020. LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Hoenig dated 05/06/2020. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc. The application is GRANTED. The discovery schedule shall be modified in accordance with the table on page 1 of this letter. Furthermore, the case management conference scheduled for May 13, 2020 is adjourned to December 4, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. So ordered. (Case Management Conference set for 12/4/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos). (Deposition due by 9/18/2020. Discovery due by 12/4/2020). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 5/6/2020) (rjm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 48 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Hoenig dated 05/06/2020., LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Michael Hoenig dated 05/06/2020. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc...(Hoenig, Michael)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #44 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. The revised discovery deadlines are approved. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 6/5/2020. Discovery due by 8/21/2020. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/10/2020) (kv)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. Attorney Stephen Howell Jett terminated. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 2/7/2020) (kv)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #42 Motion for Nicholas B. Wille to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
February 6, 2020 Filing 44 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time of the discovery deadlines in the scheduling order addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher C. Loeber dated 2/6/2020. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc...(Loeber, Christopher)
February 6, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Stephen H. Jett to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc...(Hoenig, Michael)
February 6, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #42 MOTION for Nicholas B. Wille to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18718456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 6, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Nicholas B. Wille to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18718456. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A: Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Wille, Nicholas)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Ashleigh Dawn Karnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
September 27, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #40 MOTION for Ashleigh Dawn Karnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17676693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
September 27, 2019 Filing 40 MOTION for Ashleigh Dawn Karnell to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17676693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dominic J. Picca, dtd 9/27/19, #2 Exhibit Declaration of A. Karnell with Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Picca, Dominic)
September 25, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: (Deposition due by 5/10/2020.) Set/Reset Hearings: (Case Management Conference set for 5/13/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Edgardo Ramos.) (rjm)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Non-expert depositions shall be completed by March 7, 2020. Expert depositions shall be completed by May 10, 2020. ALL DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED BY May 10, 2020, and as further set forth in this Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The next case management conference is scheduled for May 13, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. (The Court will set this date at the initial conference.) So ordered. Granting #38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Loeber dated September 24, 2019. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc. (Discovery due by 5/10/2020). (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 9/25/2019) (rjm)
September 24, 2019 Filing 38 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher Loeber dated September 24, 2019. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9.24.19 Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, #2 Exhibit 9.24.19 Redline against Prior Scheduling Order)(Loeber, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO E-MAIL PDF. Note to Attorney Stephen Howell Jett for noncompliance with Section 14.2 of the S.D.N.Y. Electronic Case Filing Rules & Instructions. E-MAIL the PDF for Document #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet to: caseopenings@nysd.uscourts.gov. (jgo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a motion proceeding held on 4/3/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
June 4, 2019 Filing 36 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: motion held on 4/3/2019 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Vincent Bologna, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/5/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 10, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc..(Smith, Lucas)
April 10, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lucas R Smith on behalf of Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Smith, Lucas)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 CIVIL CASE DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Plaintiff has demanded a jury trial, and the parties agree that Plaintiff is entitled to a jury trial under the claims as they are currently pleaded. Defendants preserve their right to object at an appropriate time should the issues in this case be narrowed. Amended Pleadings due by 6/17/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 6/17/2019. Non-expert depositions shall be completed by 10/4/2019. Expert Deposition due by 1/10/2020. Discovery due by 1/10/2020. The next case management conference is scheduled for 1/15/2020, at 11:00 a.m. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/8/2019) (mml) Modified on 4/16/2019 (jar). (Main Document 33 replaced on 4/16/2019) (jar). Modified on 5/7/2019 (jar).
April 5, 2019 Filing 32 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Kohn, Felicity)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, On April 3, 2019, the Court heard argument from the above-captioned parties concerning Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction. For the reasons stated on the record, Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is DENIED. The parties are directed to submit a scheduling order by close of business Friday, April 5, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/3/2019) (kv)
April 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Show Cause Hearing held on 4/3/2019. Plaintiff's counsel present. Defendant's counsel present. For the reasons stated on the record, a preliminary injunction will not issue. A proposed joint case management plan is due Friday, April 5, 2019. (jar)
April 3, 2019 Filing 30 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Stephen H. Jett to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Seal Document. The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/2/2019) (kv)
April 2, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Albert J. Cook II in Support re: #24 Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan. 3, 2019 Email, #2 Exhibit March 21, 2019 Email, #3 Exhibit March 23, 2019 Email, #4 Exhibit Letter from RadPartners)(Loeber, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Dr. Cory A. Kutlick in Support re: #24 Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Loeber, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 25 DECLARATION of Michael Davis Hoenig in Support re: #24 Memorandum of Law in Support. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ohio Sec. of State Website (Mercy Health), #2 Exhibit Ohio Sec. of State Website (MHY), #3 Exhibit Dun & Bradstreet Rpt. (MHY))(Loeber, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Order to Show Cause,, . Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Loeber, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION to Seal Document addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Christopher C. Loeber dated April 2, 2019. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc..(Loeber, Christopher)
April 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Davis Hoenig on behalf of Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Hoenig, Michael)
April 2, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Radiology Partners, Inc., Corporate Parent Radiology Partners Holdings, LLC for Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc..(Picca, Dominic)
April 2, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #20 MOTION for Stephen H. Jett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16607261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Dominic Joseph Picca to RE-FILE Document #9 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were not added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
April 2, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Stephen H. Jett to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16607261. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Jett, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 19 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Lucas Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
March 29, 2019 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Lucas Smith, dtd 3/29/19 in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Charles McRae, dtd 3/28/19 in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 15 DECLARATION of J.D. Keighley, dtd 3/28/19 in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Katia Kaiser 3/28/19 in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Jason Dodgion in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Carrie Copeland, dtd 3/28/19 in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Declaration of Cameron Cleeton in Support re: #10 Memorandum of Law in Support,. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #3 Order to Show Cause,, Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for a Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order,dtd 3/29/19. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Picca, Dominic)
March 29, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - CORPORATE PARENT/OTHER AFFILIATE NOT ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc..(Picca, Dominic) Modified on 4/2/2019 (ldi).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #7 Letter, filed by Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc. ENDORSEMENT: The application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 3/29/2019) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 3/28/2019) (kv)
March 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Lucas Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
March 27, 2019 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #6 MOTION for Lucas Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Filing fee $ 200.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16572902, paid on 3/27/2019. (wb)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Dominic J. Picca dated March 27, 2019 re: permission to seal the CIM and portion of briefing discussing. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc..(Picca, Dominic)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Lucas Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Dominic J. Picca, Esq. in Support of the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Lucas Smith, Esq., #2 Declaration of Lucas Smith in Support of Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission, with Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Picca, Dominic)
March 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a ARGUMENT proceeding held on 3/20/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: ARGUMENT held on 3/20/2019 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/25/2019.(McGuirk, Kelly)
March 21, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edgardo Ramos: Hearing held on 3/21/2019 re: application for temporary restraining order. Counsel for plaintiff and all defendants present. For reasons stated on the record, plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order is DENIED. Parties shall appear on April 3, 2019, at 3:00 p.m., for a preliminary-injunction hearing. Defendants' opposition papers are due Friday, March 29, 2019. Any reply is due Tuesday, April 2, 2019. (jar)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER defendants shall show cause as to why an order should not be issued pursuant to Rule 65 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure enjoining Radiology Partners, Inc. ("RadPartners"). Show Cause Hearing set for 4/3/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 619, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Edgardo Ramos. Show Cause Response due by 3/29/2019. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos. on 3/20/2019) (js) Modified on 3/21/2019 (js). Modified on 3/21/2019 (js).
March 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Columbus Radiology Corp.. (pne)
March 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC. (pne)
March 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc.. (pne)
March 20, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Radiology Partners, Inc.. (pne)
March 20, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (pne)
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Columbus Radiology Corp., Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc., Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC, Radiology Partners, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 465401231574)Document filed by Ohio Imaging Associates, Inc..(pne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Imaging Associates, Inc. v. Radiology Partners, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Partners, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Joseph Picca
Represented By: Lucas R Smith
Represented By: David Charles Kurtz
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Associates of S.E.O., LLC
Represented By: Dominic Joseph Picca
Represented By: Lucas R Smith
Represented By: David Charles Kurtz
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Columbus Radiology Corp.
Represented By: Dominic Joseph Picca
Represented By: Lucas R Smith
Represented By: David Charles Kurtz
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radiology Associates of Canton, Inc.
Represented By: Dominic Joseph Picca
Represented By: Lucas R Smith
Represented By: David Charles Kurtz
Represented By: Stephen Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Imagina Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher C. Loeber
Represented By: Felicity Sloan Kohn
Represented By: Christopher Loeber
Represented By: Stephen Howell Jett
Represented By: Michael Davis Hoenig
Represented By: Nicholas B Wille
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?