State of New York et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al Featured Case

The attorneys general of several states, including New York, California, Illinois, Minnesota, New Mexico, Vermont, and the District of Columbia, have filed a lawsuit against the Trump administration over its weakening of the federal nutrition standards for school meals that are fed to about 30 million children across the country.

Plaintiff: District of Columbia, State of Minnesota, State of Illinois, State of New Mexico, State of Vermont and State of California
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture and Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture
Lead Plaintiff: State of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv02956
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii): IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the parties, through their respective counsels, that This action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and without interest, costs, expenses, disbursements, or fees to any party; and This Stipulation may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which taken together shall constitute one and the same document; electronically scanned signatures are acceptable as originals, and the parties consent to electronic signatures (i.e., /s/ [Name of Counsel]). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/03/2020) (ama)
May 21, 2020 ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. 75 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal,,, was reviewed and referred to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. for approval for the following reason(s): The parties have consented to e-signatures pursuant to the court' s ECF Rules & Instructions. (ad)
May 21, 2020 Filing 75 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by State of New Mexico, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of California, State of Illinois, State of New York, State of Minnesota. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Shterngel, Max) Modified on 5/21/2020 (km). Modified on 5/21/2020 (ad).
May 20, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Notice to Attorney Shterngel, Max. RE-FILE Document No. 74 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the voluntary dismissal is against was/were selected; Documents requiring signatures of more than one party must be electronically filed by submitting a scanned document containing all necessary signatures and select each individual party; do not select all parties for the filers. Re-file the document using the event type Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - select the correct party/parties the voluntary dismissal is against - and attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) PDF. (ad)
May 20, 2020 Filing 74 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR AND FILER ERROR - STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Defendants pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by State of New Mexico, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of California, State of Illinois, State of New York, State of Minnesota. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Shterngel, Max) Modified on 5/20/2020 (ad).
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, Defendants substitutes Arastu K. Chaudhury, State Bar No. 4468963 as counsel of record in place of Casey K. Lee. The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED., Attorney Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury for Sonny Perdue,Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury for United States Department of Agriculture,Arastu Kabeer Chaudhury for United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service added. Attorney Casey Kyung-Se Lee terminated. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/20/2020) (rj)
April 17, 2020 Filing 72 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service..(Chaudhury, Arastu)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 OPINION AND ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, Sonny Perdue. Plaintiff States alleged an injury in fact to their proprietary interests and thus, have established standing. Accordingly, Defendants' 12(b)(1) motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/16/2020) (rj)
April 14, 2020 Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Plaintiffs dated April 14, 2020 re: Memorandum Opinion in CSPI et al v. Perdue et al, No. 19 Civ. 1004 (GJH) (D. Md.). Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Attachments: # 1 CSPI et al v. Perdue et al (D. Md. Memorandum Opinion dated 4-13-2020)).(Shterngel, Max)
April 9, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Aaron Scott Chait to RE-FILE Document 69 MOTION to Withdraw Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error, .. ERROR(S): Supporting Documents are filed separately, each receiving their own document #. (db)
March 12, 2020 Filing 69 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Withdraw Notice to Attorney to Re-File Document - Deficient Docket Entry Error, . Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Jamie Getz, # 2 Text of Proposed Order).(Chait, Aaron) Modified on 4/9/2020 (db).
March 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jamie Davidson Getz to RE-FILE Document 66 MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Withdraw as Attorney . ERROR(S): Supporting documents must be filed separately, each receiving their own document number. Declaration in Support of Motion is found under the event list Replies, Opposition and Supporting Documents. (ldi)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting 67 Motion for Aaron Scott Chait to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 2/19/2020) (ama)
February 14, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 67 MOTION for Aaron Scott Chait to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18804368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
February 14, 2020 Filing 67 MOTION for Aaron Scott Chait to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18804368. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, # 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Chait, Aaron)
February 14, 2020 Filing 66 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order).(Getz, Jamie) Modified on 3/10/2020 (ldi).
February 5, 2020 Filing 65 REPLY re: 60 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, Sur-reply. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont..(Liskow, Samantha)
January 29, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 2/5/2020. (jca)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 61 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply (Dkt. 60). On November 22, 2019, the State of New York requested leave to file a sur-reply. That request is GRANTED. That sur-reply is due February 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 1/29/2020) (jca)
November 25, 2019 Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated November 25, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' Sur-Reply Request (Dkt. No. 61). Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.(Lee, Casey)
November 25, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Plaintiff State of New York dated 11/25/2019 re: Docket 61. Document filed by State of New York.(Liskow, Samantha)
November 22, 2019 Filing 61 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Defendants' Reply (Dkt. 60) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Plaintiffs dated November 22, 2019. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont.(Shterngel, Max)
November 18, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Lee, Casey)
November 18, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of District of Columbia. New Address: DC OAG, 441 4th Street NW, Washington, DC, USA 20001, 202-741-0444. (Konopka, Kathleen)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 57 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines,, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated October 30, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/13/2019) Replies due by 11/18/2019. (ks)
October 30, 2019 Filing 57 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 Memo Endorsement, Set Deadlines,, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated October 30, 2019. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.(Lee, Casey)
October 29, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Sarah A. Kogel-Smucker on behalf of District of Columbia. New Address: Office of the Attorney General for the District of Columbia, 441 4th Street NW, Suite 630 South, Washington, DC, United States 20001, 202-724-9727. (Kogel-Smucker, Sarah)
October 25, 2019 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Shterngel, Max)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER TERMINATING APPEARANCE OF VALERIE M. NANNERY granting 53 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the appearance of Valerie M. Nannery in this matter is terminated; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the Clerk of Court shall remove Ms. Nannery from the docket sheet in this matter. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Attorney Valerie M. Nannery terminated.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/11/19) (yv)
October 10, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for Valerie Maria Nannery to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by District of Columbia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannery, Valerie)
October 10, 2019 Filing 52 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kathleen Konopka on behalf of District of Columbia. (Konopka, Kathleen)
October 7, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sarah A. Kogel-Smucker on behalf of District of Columbia. (Kogel-Smucker, Sarah)
October 3, 2019 Filing 50 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . filed by United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, United States Department of Agriculture, Sonny Perdue., ENDORSEMENT: Deadline extension request is granted. Plaintiff's Opposition brief is due 10/25/2019. Defendants' reply if any is due 11/8/2019. Responses due by 10/25/2019, Replies due by 11/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 10/3/2019) (rj)
September 30, 2019 Filing 49 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated September 30, 2019 re: Plaintiffs' September 26, 2019, Letter. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.(Lee, Casey)
September 26, 2019 Filing 48 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. re: Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' September 23, 2019 Letter (Dkt. 47). Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont.(Shterngel, Max)
September 23, 2019 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated September 23, 2019 re: Response to Plaintiffs' September 20, 2019, Letter. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Redline of Amended Complaint)(Lee, Casey)
September 20, 2019 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont.(Shterngel, Max)
September 16, 2019 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. re: Amended Complaint (Dkt. 44). Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont.(Shterngel, Max)
September 16, 2019 Filing 44 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.Document filed by State of New Mexico, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of California, State of Illinois, State of New York, State of Minnesota. Related document: 1 Complaint,.(Shterngel, Max)
September 16, 2019 Filing 43 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.Document filed by State of New Mexico, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of California, State of Illinois, State of New York, State of Minnesota. Related document: 1 Complaint,.(Shterngel, Max) Modified on 9/17/2019 (pc).
August 26, 2019 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . . Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Lee, Casey)
August 26, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. Responses due by 10/9/2019(Lee, Casey)
July 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 10/9/2019 Replies due by 10/23/2019. (ama)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER: granting 39 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 8/26/2019. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/23/2019) (ama)
July 22, 2019 Filing 39 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated July 22, 2019. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.(Lee, Casey)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/12/2019. Responses due by 9/11/2019 Replies due by 9/25/2019. (kv)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 32 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying 36 Letter Motion for Conference. The Court is in receipt of the parties' letters dated June 7, 2019, June 17, 2019, and June 20, 2019, regarding Defendants' request for a pre-motion conference to discuss their anticipated motion to dismiss and Plaintiffs' request for a pre-motion conference to discuss their anticipated motion for summary judgment. ECF Nos. 32, 35-37. The requests for pre-motion conferences are DENIED. In addition, Plaintiffs' request for a briefing schedule on their motion for summary judgment is DENIED. The parties are hereby ORDERED to adhere to the following briefing schedule: as further set forth in this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/11/2019) (kv)
June 20, 2019 Filing 37 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated June 20, 2019 re: 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. . Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Lee, Casey)
June 17, 2019 Filing 36 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 1 Complaint, Plaintiffs' Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment, addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Document filed by State of New York.(Shterngel, Max)
June 17, 2019 Filing 35 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. re: 32 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 1 Complaint, Defendants' Proposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated J . Document filed by State of New York. (Shterngel, Max)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 33 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 6/17/2019.) (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/11/2019) (anc) (Main Document 34 replaced on 6/11/2019) (anc).
June 10, 2019 Filing 33 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 32 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 1 Complaint, Defendants' Proposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated J addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr.. Document filed by State of New York.(Shterngel, Max)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: 1 Complaint, Defendants' Proposed Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Casey K. Lee dated June 7, 2019. Document filed by Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service.(Lee, Casey)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 30 Motion for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/3/2019) (mro)
June 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 30 MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
May 31, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Julia Harumi Mass ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Mass, Julia)
May 20, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 29 MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): expired Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
May 17, 2019 Filing 29 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Julia Harumi Mass ISO Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing, # 2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Mass, Julia) Modified on 5/20/2019 (wb).
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 23 Motion for Valerie M. Nannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/17/2019) (anc)
May 17, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 27 Proposed Order, 25 MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16901494. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 26 Affidavit in Support of Motion,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): please submit the affidavit, a valid certificate of good standing from California and proposed order as attachments to the motion, DO NOT FILE THEM SEPARATELY. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by State of California. Related Document Number: 25 . (Mass, Julia) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 5/17/2019 (ma).
May 16, 2019 Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Julia Harumi Mass in Support re: 25 MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16901494. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1-Certificate of Good Standing)(Mass, Julia) Modified on 5/17/2019 (ma).
May 16, 2019 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Julia Harumi Mass to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16901494. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of California.(Mass, Julia) Modified on 5/17/2019 (ma).
May 1, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of Sonny Perdue, United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (Lee, Casey)
April 30, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 23 MOTION for Valerie Maria Nannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16793576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 30, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Valerie Maria Nannery to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16793576. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by District of Columbia. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Caifornia Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Nannery, Valerie)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 21 Motion for Jamie Davidson Getz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/26/2019) (jwh)
April 25, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 21 MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
April 25, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Getz, Jamie)
April 15, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 20 MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16696113. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): certificates of good standing must be issued by the supreme court of Illinois. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (ma)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Jamie Davidson Getz to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16696113. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Illinois. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Getz, Jamie) Modified on 4/15/2019 (ma).
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Sonny Perdue served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; United States Department of Agriculture served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019; United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service served on 4/5/2019, answer due 6/4/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by State of New Mexico; District of Columbia ; State of Vermont; State of California; State of Illinois; State of New York ; State of Minnesota. (Shterngel, Max)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sonny Perdue. (dnh)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture. (dnh)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting 12 Motion for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 4/5/2019) (rj)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sonny Perdue, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Shterngel, Max)
April 4, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Agriculture, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Shterngel, Max)
April 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Samantha Liskow to RE-FILE Document No. 4 Request for Issuance of Summons, 6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Samantha Liskow. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: State of New York; Sonny Perdue. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
April 4, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Samantha Liskow. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 05:551;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 05:702;. (jgo)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Max Kieley, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kieley, Max)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. 11 Proposed Order, 10 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 9 MOTION for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): With Pro Hac Motions, all supporting documents are filed as attachments to the motion. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Kieley, Max) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 4/3/2019 (jc).
April 3, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Max Kieley in Support re: 9 MOTION for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kieley, Max) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jc).
April 3, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Max Hollister Kieley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615746. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by State of Minnesota. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kieley, Max) Modified on 4/3/2019 (jc).
April 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Colangelo on behalf of State of New York. (Colangelo, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Max Shterngel on behalf of State of New York. (Shterngel, Max)
April 3, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Liskow, Samantha) Modified on 4/4/2019 (jgo).
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Liskow, Samantha)
April 3, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Agriculture, re: 1 Complaint,. Document filed by District of Columbia, State of California, State of Illinois, State of Minnesota, State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Vermont. (Liskow, Samantha) Modified on 4/4/2019 (jgo).
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Monica Blong Wagner on behalf of State of New York. (Wagner, Monica)
April 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liskow, Samantha)
April 3, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for 1 Complaint,. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16613394.(Liskow, Samantha)
April 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service, Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture. (Filing Fee $ 400.00.)Document filed by State of New Mexico, State of New York, State of Illinois, District of Columbia, State of Vermont, State of California, State of Minnesota.(Liskow, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of New York et al v. United States Department of Agriculture et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: District of Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Minnesota
Represented By: Max Kieley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New Mexico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Vermont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture Food and Nutrition Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny Perdue, in his official capacity as Secretary of Agriculture
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Monica Blong Wagner
Represented By: Max Shterngel
Represented By: Matthew Colangelo
Represented By: Samantha Liskow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?