Grecia v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03278
Filed: April 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2020 USCA Case Number 2020-1831 from the USCA Federal Circuit assigned to #48 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by William Grecia. (tp)
May 15, 2020 Appeal Record Sent to USCA Federal Circuit (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for #48 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit, filed by William Grecia were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit.(tp)
May 15, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals Federal Circuit re: #48 Notice of Appeal to the Federal Circuit. (tp)
May 15, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEAL TO THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT from #45 Memorandum & Opinion, #47 Amended Judgment,, #35 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #36 Clerk's Judgment,,. Form 7 and Form 22 are due within 14 days. Document filed by William Grecia. Filing fee $ 505.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19843072..(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 28, 2020 Filing 47 AMENDED JUDGMENT amending #45 Memorandum & Opinion, in favor of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. against William Grecia. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Amended Opinion and Order dated April 24, 2020, Defendants' motions are GRANTED. Grecia's complaints are dismissed with prejudice without leave to amend; accordingly, the cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 04/28/2020) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Right to Appeal) (dt)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 AMENDED OPINION AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Defendants motions are GRANTED. Grecia's complaints are dismissed with prejudice without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close all captioned cases and open motions. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/24/2020) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying #37 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff's motion for reconsideration is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close all open motions in the above-captioned cases.SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/24/2020) (ama)
April 24, 2020 Filing 43 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #35 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #36 Clerk's Judgment,, . . Document filed by William Grecia..(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Matthew M. Wawrzyn to RE-FILE Document #38 MOTION for Reconsideration Memo in Support. Use the event type Memorandum in Support of Motion found under the event list Replies, Oppositions and Supporting Documents, then link to #37 Motion. (db)
April 17, 2020 Filing 42 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #35 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #36 Clerk's Judgment,, ., #38 MOTION for Reconsideration Memo in Support. . Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 10, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joseph Faragi on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Faragi, Eric)
April 10, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION for Jonathan D. Brit to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Sirota, Neil)
April 10, 2020 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #35 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #36 Clerk's Judgment,, ., #38 MOTION for Reconsideration Memo in Support. . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc...(Sirota, Neil)
March 27, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Reconsideration Memo in Support. Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION for Reconsideration re; #35 Memorandum & Opinion,,, #36 Clerk's Judgment,, . Document filed by William Grecia..(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 36 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: #35 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. against William Grecia. It is, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated March 13, 2020, Defendants' motions are GRANTED. Grecia's complaints are dismissed with prejudice without leave to amend; accordingly, the cases are closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 3/16/2020) (Attachments: #1 Right to Appeal) (km)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 OPINION AND ORDER: re: (30 in 1:19-cv-02811-VEC) MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Citibank, N.A., (39 in 1:19-cv-02810-VEC) MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, (43 in 1:19-cv-02813-VEC) MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by TIAA, FSB d/b/a TIAA Bank, (33 in 1:19-cv-02812-VEC) MOTION to Dismiss The Amended Complaint filed by Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, (29 in 1:19-cv-03278-VEC) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motions are GRANTED. Grecia's complaints are dismissed with prejudice without leave to amend. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close all captioned cases and open motions. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/13/2020) (ama) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
November 21, 2019 Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew Michael Wawrzyn dated November 21, 2019 re: Grecia v. Samsung: Notice of Supplemental Authority. Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Judgment)(Sirota, Neil)
August 30, 2019 Filing 32 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Sirota, Neil)
August 23, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
August 2, 2019 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Sirota, Neil)
August 2, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Sirota, Neil)
July 8, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 8/2/2019. Responses due by 8/23/2019 Replies due by 8/30/2019. (ama)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: denying as moot #20 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss are DENIED as moot under Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B) and Rule 4(E)(i) of the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that each Defendant must respond to the Amended Complaint-with either an Answer or any appropriate motion-no later than August 2, 2019. Should any Defendant file a motion, Plaintiffs' response to the motion will be due no later than August 23, 2019. Any reply in support of the motion will be due no later than August 30, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that discovery remains STAYED pending the resolution of any second motions to dismiss that may be filed. After disposing of any such motions, or if no such motions are filed, the Court will, if necessary, hold a conference at which it will resolve Defendants' request that discovery be bifurcated. The parties are reminded that the Court is happy to refer them to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions upon a joint request. The Court will consolidate these cases before a single Magistrate Judge for that purpose. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motions at: 1. Dkt. 26 in 19-CV-2810; 2. Dkt. 23 in 19-CV-2811; 3. Dkt. 21 in 19-CV-2812; 4. Dkt. 26 in 19-CV-2813; and 5. Dkt. 20 in 19-CV-3278. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/08/2019) (ama)
July 5, 2019 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by William Grecia. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: (28 in 1:19-cv-02812-VEC) Letter filed by William Grecia, (35 in 1:19-cv-02810-VEC) Letter filed by William Grecia, (26 in 1:19-cv-02811-VEC) Letter filed by William Grecia, (39 in 1:19-cv-02813-VEC) Letter filed by William Grecia, (25 in 1:19-cv-03278-VEC) Letter filed by William Grecia. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED., ( Amended Pleadings due by 7/5/2019.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/27/2019) (ama)
June 27, 2019 Filing 25 CONSENT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew M. Wawrzyn dated 6/27/2019 re: Amendment of Complaint. Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that discovery is STAYED pending the resolution of the pending motions to dismiss. After disposing of the motions, the Court will, if necessary, hold a conference at which it will resolve Defendants' request that discovery be bifurcated. The parties are reminded that the Court is happy to refer them to a Magistrate Judge for settlement discussions upon a joint request. The Court will consolidate these cases before a single Magistrate Judge for that purpose. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/14/2019) (ama)
June 14, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/14/2019. (jp)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: granting #22 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew M. Wawrzyn dated 6/12/2019. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 7/5/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/12/2019) (ama)
June 12, 2019 Filing 22 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew M. Wawrzyn dated 6/12/2019. Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). . Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Sirota, Neil)
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6). Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Sirota, Neil)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Matthew M. Wawrzyn dated 6/6/2019 re: Case Management Letter. Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #17 Motion for Timothy S. Durst to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/6/2019) (jca)
June 5, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #17 MOTION for Timothy S. Durst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17024370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Timothy S. Durst to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17024370. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Durst, Timothy)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan Drew Cocks on behalf of Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Cocks, Jonathan)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for all parties in the above-captioned cases are directed to appear before the undersigned for an IPTC in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on June 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Plaintiff is encouraged to serve defendants promptly. Plaintiff's counsel is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 6/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/28/2019) (ama)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Judge Denise L. Cote is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIRMATION of Matthew M. Wawrzyn re: #13 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference, . Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/2/2019) (gr)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by 6/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 5/2/2019) (gr)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
May 1, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote, Patent Judge. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
April 29, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. for Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Sirota, Neil)
April 29, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Neil P. Sirota dated 4/29/2019. Document filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc..(Sirota, Neil)
April 29, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (wb)
April 29, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Analisa Torres. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (wb)
April 29, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 19-2810 and declined by Judge Valerie Caproni and returned to wheel for assignment. (wb)
April 26, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Valerie E. Caproni as possibly related to 19 Civ. 2810. (ad)
April 16, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (dnh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
April 12, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
April 12, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by William Grecia. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #5 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
April 11, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Matthew M. Wawrzyn to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16675432. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew M. Wawrzyn, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-2810 (UA). Document filed by William Grecia.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wawrzyn, Matthew)
April 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16675390)Document filed by William Grecia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Wawrzyn, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grecia v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Grecia
Represented By: Matthew M. Wawrzyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Phillip Sirota
Represented By: Jonathan Drew Brit
Represented By: Timothy S. Durst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?