Giuffre v. Dershowitz
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE
Defendant: Alan M. Dershowitz
Counter Claimant: Alan Dershowitz
Interested Party: Boies Schiller Flexner LLP, Leslie H. Wexner and John W Zeiger
Not Classified By Court: Sharon Churcher
Intervenor: Miami Herald Media Company and Julie Brown
Case Number: 1:2019cv03377
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 322 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 07/21/2021. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Giuffre's First Set of Interrogatories to Dershowitz, #2 Exhibit B - Email re Interrogatories).(Moss, Nicole)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kiely, Christian)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 320 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . REDACTED VERSION. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ***SELECTED PARTIES***REPLY AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #296 .(Kiely, Christian)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY to Response to Motion re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #296 .(Kiely, Christian)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #314 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The requested enlargement of pages is approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/26/2021) (va)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #315 Letter Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The requested enlargement of pages is approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/26/2021) (va)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 315 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated May 25, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 314 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/25/2021. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 313 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/21/2021 re: Combined Reply to Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letter seeking Leave to Amend the Complaint (Doc. No. 304) and Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re Protective Order (Doc. No. 303). Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Opposition re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5).(Proctor, Haley)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 311 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Opposition re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #305 .(Cooper, Charles)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 309 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #305 .(Cooper, Charles)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated May 14, 2021 re: Response to Plaintiff's Pre-Motion Letters Seeking Leave to Amend (ECF No. 304) and for a Protective Order (ECF No. 303). Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Kiely, Christian)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER granting #306 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #304 Letter, #303 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re: Protective Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/06/2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/7/2021) (va)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 306 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #304 Letter, #303 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re: Protective Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/06/2021. addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated May 6, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #302 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: Because the sealed material is subject to the protective order, sealing is appropriate. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/6/2021) (va)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 304 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/06/2021 re: Request for Permission To File Motion To Amend Complaint. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Plaintiff's Objections & Responses to Defendant's First Requests For Production to Giuffre, #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Second Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit C - Redline of Proposed Second Amended Complaint).(Cooper, Charles)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 303 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re: Protective Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/06/2021. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 302 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 05/05/2021 re: Permission to File Under Seal. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 301 AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M).(Kiely, Christian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 300 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . REDACTED VERSION. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #296 .(Kiely, Christian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #296 .(Kiely, Christian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 297 MOTION to Compel Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre to Produce Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, Or, In the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER granting #295 Letter Motion to Seal. Because the materials to be filed contain material designated confidential pursuant to applicable protective orders, counsel may file the motion under seal with a redacted copy on the public docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/4/2021) (va)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 295 LETTER MOTION to Seal Memorandum in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel the Production of Certain Attorney-Client Communications on the Basis of Waiver, or, in the Alternative, Request for Zolin Examination addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated May 3, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 294 REPLY re: #270 Letter to Intervene and Unseal. Document filed by Julie Brown, Miami Herald Media Company..(Walz, Christine)
April 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 293 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction by Charles J Cooper re #284 Transcript,,..(Cooper, Charles)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 292 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #291 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is approved. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 5/4/2021., Responses due by 5/20/2021, Replies due by 5/27/2021.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/19/2021) (ama)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 291 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated April 16, 2021 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Compel the Production of Certain Attorney-Client Communications. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 290 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated April 15, 2021 re: Response to Miami Herald's Motion to Intervene. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger..(Little, Marion)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 289 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated April 15, 2021 re: Response to #270 Letter Motion to Intervene and Unseal. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 288 NOTICE of Intent to Request Redactions Via Motion re: #285 Notice of Filing Transcript,,. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger..(Little, Marion)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 287 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated April 15, 2021 re: Response to Miami Herald Letter Motion to Intervene and Unseal. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER: The Court has reviewed Defendant's letters seeking leave to file a motion to compel production of certain communications between Plaintiff and her counsel on the basis of waiver and, alternatively, seeking the Court's review of certain communications in camera to determine whether the crime-fraud exception applies. Defendant may proceed with the motion. Defendant's opening brief and Plaintiff's opposition brief each shall not exceed 15 pages. Defendant may file a reply brief of no longer than 5 pages. The parties shall confer and propose a briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/14/2021) (va)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/25/21 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 284 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/25/2021 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Eve Giniger, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/5/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/13/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated April 13, 2021 re: Reply re: Motion to Compel Production of Certain Attorney-Client Communications. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #269 .(Kiely, Christian)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 04/12/2021 re: Response to #274 re: Motion to Compel Production of Certain Attorney-Client Communications. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #278 .(Cooper, Charles)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER re: #275 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. Mr. Dershowitz's request to compel Plaintiff to submit to her first day of deposition by video in April or May (dkt. no. 275) is denied without prejudice, subject to reinstatement upon the substantial completion of paper discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/9/2021) (va)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 280 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated April 8, 2021 re: Reply re: Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Day 1 of Her Deposition Via Zoom. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 279 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 04/08/2021 re: Response to #275 LETTER re: Pre-Motion Letter re: Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Day 1 of Her Deposition Via Zoom. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 278 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #277 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel's requests to file a response under seal and to discuss Defendant's pre-motion letter with Plaintiff's prior counsel are approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/7/2021) (va)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 277 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 04/06/2021 re: Permission to File Under Seal. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the April 2, 2021 letters from Defendant seeking to compel Plaintiffs testimony (dkt. no. 275) and the production of certain documents (dkt. no. 274). Plaintiff shall file any responses to these letters no later than April 12, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/5/2021) (jca)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 275 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated April 2, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter re: Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Appear for Day 1 of Her Deposition Via Zoom. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated April 2, 2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter re: Motion to Compel Production of Certain Attorney-Client Communications. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #269 .(Kiely, Christian)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 273 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #270 Letter filed by Julie Brown, Miami Herald Media Company. ENDORSEMENT: Any party opposing the Miami Herald's motion to intervene and to unseal certain documents shall file opposing papers no later than April 15, 2021. Any reply shall be filed no later than April 22, 2021. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 4/15/2021. Replies due by 4/22/2021.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/1/2021) (va)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 272 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Barry Kamins on behalf of Alan Dershowitz..(Kamins, Barry)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 271 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John M. Leventhal on behalf of Alan Dershowitz..(Leventhal, John)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 270 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christine N. Walz dated 3/31/2021 re: request to intervene and unseal documents. Document filed by Julie Brown, Miami Herald Media Company..(Walz, Christine)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER granting #266 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The sealing request is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/26/2021) (va)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER: The conference scheduled for March 25, 2021 at 1:30 p.m. EST will occur by video. The Court will communicate separately to counsel information for joining the videoconference. Members of the public may access the conference using the following listen-only teleconference line: (877) 226-8216, access code: 3329593. The Court will open the teleconference line to the public after counsel has addressed the sealed motions at dkt. nos. 249 and 250, which contain materials designated confidential under the protective order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/24/2021) (va)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ADDENDUM TO AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER: IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED with the consent of the parties that an Addendum to the Protective Order be entered for the purposes of assuring the confidentiality of the protected information which may be disclosed by Mr. Pottinger in response to discovery or a subpoena, in response to orders of the Court, in conjunction with the filing of any motion or response thereto, or otherwise during the hearing of this matter as follows: 1. The Protective Order in this action as entered on December 21, 20201 will govern Mr. Pottinger's production in this matter, and Mr. Pottinger and the parties shall be bound by the Protective Order's provisions with respect to Mr. Pottinger's production. 2. However, as to Mr. Pottinger, Paragraph 2 of the Protective Order shall be modified as follows in bold, as further set forth. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2021) (mml)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 266 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated March 16, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated March 16, 2021 re: Reply re: Defendant's Renewed Request to Compel Deposition of Leslie Wexner. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre, Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #248 .(Kiely, Christian)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #262 Letter Motion to Continue. The request for an adjournment is granted. The conference is rescheduled for March 25, 2021 at 1:30 pm. SO ORDERED. Status Conference set for 3/25/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/16/2021) (va)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 03/10/2021 re: Response to #250 LETTER re: Pre-Motion Conference to Provide Information and Materials to the US Attorney's Office. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #260 .(Cooper, Charles)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 262 LETTER MOTION to Continue Status Conference Currently Scheduled for March 18, 2021 addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated March 15, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER: Counsel for the parties shall appear for a videoconference on March 18, 2021 at 11:00 a.m. to address the issues raised in their pre-motion conference letters (dkt. nos. 242, 249, 250). Counsel for Mr. Wexner also shall appear to address Mr. Dershowitz's renewed motion to compel Mr. Wexner's testimony (dkt. no. 249). The Court will communicate separately to counsel information for joining the videoconference. The Court will docket call-in information for the public before the conference. SO ORDERED. ( Status Conference set for 3/18/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/15/2021) (va)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER granting #255 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/12/2021) (va)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated March 12, 2021 re: Response to Alan Dershowitz March 4, 2021 Letter. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz, Leslie H. Wexner.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #248 .(Little, Marion)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 258 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 03/12/2021 re: Renewed Request to Compel Deposition of Leslie Wexner. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz, Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #254 .(Moss, Nicole)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 257 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 03/11/2021 re: Letter in Reply and in Further Support of Alan Dershowitz's Letter Re: Pre-Motion Conference seeking Permission to Provide Information and Materials to the U.S. Attorney's Office. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz.Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #246 .(Ansari, Imran)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 255 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal re: Doc. 245 Letter Motion for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 03/09/2021. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #251 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Counsel's request for an extension of time to March 12, 2021 to file a response letter and the request to file that letter under seal are granted. Defendant shall file any reply no later than March 16, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/8/2021) (js)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/12/2021 Replies due by 3/16/2021. (js)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #252 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Counsel's request for an extension of time to March 12, 2021 to file a response letter and the request to file that letter under seal are granted. Defendant shall file any reply no later than March 16, 2021. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/8/2021) (js)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated March 8, 2021. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner..(Little, Marion)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Response to Defendant's Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal with Extension of Time to File addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 03/08/2021. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari dated 03/05/2021 re: Pre-Motion Conference to Provide Information and Materials to the US Attorney's Office. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter to Strauss)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #246 .(Ansari, Imran)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated March 4, 2021 re: Renewed Request to Compel Deposition of Leslie Wexner. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre, Leslie H. Wexner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #248 .(Kiely, Christian)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER granting #243 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The request for leave to file a letter under seal is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2021) (va)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 03/04/2021 re: Reply Letter: Motion to Compel. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 ORDER granting #245 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. The request for leave to file a pre-motion conference letter under seal is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 3/4/2021) (va) Modified on 3/4/2021 (va).
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated March 3, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Ansari, Imran)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated March 3, 2021 re: Response to Pre-Motion Letter. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E).(Kiely, Christian)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Motion Letter Under Seal addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated March 3, 2021. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 02/26/2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter: Motion To Compel. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #242) - LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 02/26/2021 re: Pre-Motion Letter: Motion To Compel. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole) Modified on 3/1/2021 (ldi).
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 OPINION & ORDER re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel, filed by Alan Dershowitz. For the reasons described above, Defendant's motion to disqualify the law firm of Cooper & Kirk (dkt. no. 203) is denied. The Clerk of the Court shall close the open motion. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/28/2021) (va)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #238 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Sharon Churcher. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/22/2021) (va)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated January 21, 2021 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. . Document filed by Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss, Howard M. Cooper, & Arthur L. Aidala dated 01/20/2021 re: Request for clarification of #233 ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 01/15/21 re: Joint Status Report re Party Depositions. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #234 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Sharon Churcher. ENDORSEMENT: Ms. Churcher's request for a pre-motion conference will be held in abeyance through January 21, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/8/2021) (va)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 1/7/2021 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. Requesting Court to hold request for pre-motion conference in abeyance until January 21, 2021. Document filed by Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER: The Court does not read the protective order, as presently entered, to give the parties unrestricted authority to disclose publicly the confidential materials from Maxwell--not least of all because the parties only may agree to downgrade confidentiality designations for materials that the "designating party has subsequently produced in this action," i.e., only materials that Ms. Giuffre alone designated as confidential in Maxwell. To avoid any doubt, however, the parties shall append to the end of the definition of "Confidential Information" in the protective order the underlined language at the end of the following excerpt, which makes clear that the parties cannot agree to unseal the identities of non-party Does where that information is still sealed in Maxwell: (As further set forth herein this Order.) The parties shall file a revised protective order with this language appended to the definition of "Confidential Information." SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/6/2021) (va)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated January 5, 2021 re: Protective Order. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 01/05/2021 re: Protective Order. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 230 ORDER granting #229 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Professor Dershowitz and Ms. Giuffre may respond no later than January 5, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/24/2020) (mml)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 229 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 12/23/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper, Howard M. Cooper, and Arthur L. Aidala dated 12/22/2020 re: Discovery Status. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 227 AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... SO ORDERED AND SIGNED this 21 day of December, 2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/21/2020) (va)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 226 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . REDACTED VERSION. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 224 DECLARATION of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kiely, Christian)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #200 .(Kiely, Christian)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER holding in abeyance #199 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The request for a pre-motion conference (dkt. no. 199) will be held in abeyance through January 7, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/9/2020) (va)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 221 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated December 8, 2020 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. . Document filed by Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 220 DECLARATION of Nicole J. Moss in Opposition re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Moss, Nicole)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ***SELECTED PARTIES***DECLARATION of Nicole J. Moss in Opposition re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #200 .(Moss, Nicole)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre, Alan Dershowitz. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #200 .(Cooper, Charles)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 216 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/24/20 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 215 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/24/2020 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Paula Speer, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/31/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/1/2021..(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 214 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 11/24/2020 re: Follow-up from status conference. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held via Skype on 11/24/2020. The parties shall update the Court no later than December 22, 2020. (Court Reporter Paula Speer) (mph)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #212 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Sharon Churcher. ENDORSEMENT: The Court will hold Ms. Churcher's request for a conference in abeyance pending further word from her. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/24/2020) (va)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 212 LETTER REPLY to Response to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated November 23, 2020 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. . Document filed by Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER: The teleconference scheduled for November 24, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. EST (see dkt. nos. 191, 202) has been rescheduled to November 24, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. EST. The Court will communicate separately to counsel information for joining the teleconference. Members of the public may join the teleconference using the following listen-only line: (888) 3634734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/23/2020) (va)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated November 20, 2020 re: #199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Kiely, Christian)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 209 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 11/19/2020 re: Response to #194 LETTER re Dispute Concerning Scope of Protective Order. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 208 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated November 19, 2020 re: Reply re: Dispute Concerning Scope of Protective Order. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I).(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Redacted Version. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ***SELECTED PARTIES***AFFIDAVIT of Christian G. Kiely in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel .. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #200 .(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ***SELECTED PARTIES*** MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz, Virginia L. Giuffre. Motion or Order to File Under Seal: #200 .(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER: In advance of the teleconference scheduled for November 24, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. EST (see dkt. no. 191), the Court will communicate separately to counsel information for joining the teleconference. Members of the public may join the teleconference using the following listen-only line: (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/18/2020) (va)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 11/20/2020. Replies due by 11/23/2020. (va)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER with respect to #199 Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. The Court is in receipt of the letter from counsel to non party Sharon Churcher requesting a pre-motion conference (dkt. no. 199). Mr. Dershowitz shall provide a response to the letter no later than November 20, 2020. Ms. Churcher shall file any reply no later than November 23, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/18/2020) (va)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #196 Letter Motion to Seal. Mr. Dershowitz's sealing request is granted. Ms. Giuffre also may file her response under seal to the extent it includes confidential or sealed material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/18/2020) (nb)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Laura R. Handman dated 11/17/2020. Document filed by Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Joel Feder on behalf of Sharon Churcher..(Feder, Eric)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura R. Handman on behalf of Sharon Churcher..(Handman, Laura)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 LETTER MOTION to Seal Memorandum of Law and Certain Exhibits to Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Cooper & Kirk PLLC addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated November 17, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #192 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: The requested extension is approved. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 11/18/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/12/2020) (jca)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated November 12, 2020 re: Dispute Concerning Scope of Protective Order. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kiely, Christian)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 LETTER MOTION for Discovery re Protective Order addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated 11/12/2020. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Draft Proposed Agreed Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B 12-16-19 Letter re Initial Disclosures).(Moss, Nicole)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated November 12, 2020 re: Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letter dated November 5, 2020 addressing the status of discovery. (See dkt. no. 190.) The proposed briefing schedule addressing whether the documents produced by Plaintiff in Giuffre v. Maxwell under the protective order in that case should remain protected in this case is approved. The parties shall file initial letters no later than 5:00 p.m. EST on Thursday, November 12, and responsive letters no later than 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, November 19. Counsel for the parties shall appear for a telephonic conference on November 24, 2020 at 2:30 p.m. EST. The dial in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 11/24/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2020) (va)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Nicole J. Moss dated November 5, 2020 re: Joint Discovery Status Report. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Moss, Nicole)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #188 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: The briefing schedule proposed above is approved. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 11/16/2020., Responses due by 12/4/2020, Replies due by 12/11/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/2020) (js)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated October 30, 2020 re: Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters regarding Defendant Dershowitzs proposed motion to disqualify Ms. Giuffre's counsel. He may proceed with the motion. Counsel shall confer and inform the Court of the proposed briefing schedule. Counsel shall also confer and inform the Court by letter no later than November 5, 2020 of the status of discovery. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/28/2020) (va)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 185 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(jus)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated October 5, 2020 re: Reply re: Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Disqualify Cooper & Kirk PLLC. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 09/30/2020 re: Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Disqualify Cooper & Kirk PLLC. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1).(Cooper, Charles)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER re: #176 Letter, filed by Alan Dershowitz. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Alan Dershowitz's letter dated September 23, 2020, requesting that the Court hold a pre-motion conference at which Mr. Dershowitz will seek leave to file a motion to disqualify counsel for Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre, Cooper & Kirk. (See dkt. no. 176.) Ms. Giuffre shall respond by letter to Mr. Dershowitz's request no later than September 30, 2020. Mr. Dershowitz may reply no later than October 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/23/2020) (va)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated September 23, 2020 re: Defendant's Request for Pre-Motion Conference Regarding Motion to Disqualify Cooper & Kirk PLLC. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Kiely, Christian)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault..(dn)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER re: (153 in 1:19-cv-03377-LAP) Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. Mr. Dershowitz's request to modify the Maxwell protective order (dkt. no. 153) is granted in part and denied in part. Ms. Giuffre shall produce to Mr. Dershowitz all sealed materials and discovery that mentions Mr. Dershowitz, excluding material produced by or material (or portions of material) discussing a specific nonparty Doe whose privacy interests are the subject of a separate sealed order to be provided to Ms. Giuffre. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/9/2020) (va)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER: The Court has reviewed letters from Defendant Alan Dershowitz and Nonparties John Zeiger and Leslie Wexner regarding the Court's communications with Justice Goetz. (See dkt. nos. 169, 170.) First, it was not the Court's intention to discuss any substantive matters with Justice Goetz. Second, because he has not returned the Court's calls to his chambers, the matter is moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/1/2020) (va)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER: In an order dated August 4, 2020 (dkt. no. 1097 in 15 Civ. 7433), the Court invited any nonparties named in the sealed materials at issue in Giuffre v. Maxwell, No. 15 Civ. 7433, to submit to the Court for in camera review their comments on Defendant Alan Dershowitz's request in Giuffre v. Dershowitz, No. 19 Civ. 3377, that Plaintiff Virginia Giuffre produce to him confidential discovery materials and sealed filings from the Maxwell litigation. In that order, the Court noted that it would "at the least, inform the parties generally of the nature of any comments received." (Id. at 2.) The Court writes to provide that update. (As further set forth herein this Order.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/31/2020) (va)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari and Howard M. Cooper dated August 24, 2020 re: Alan Dershowitz's Response to Letter Filed by John Doe Dated August 19, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A).(Ansari, Imran)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated August 21, 2020 re: Communications between Federal and State Courts. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger..(Little, Marion)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated August 18, 2020 re: Communications between Federal and State Courts. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dershowitz Answer with Counterclaims without exhibits, #2 Exhibit Boies Summon and Complaint).(Ansari, Imran)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/18/2020) (va)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger..(Little, Marion)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated August 17, 2020 re: Response to Offer of Proof [Doc. 164]. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpt of Dershowitz Deposition Transcript).(Little, Marion)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER: Certain Does have contacted the Court to request additional time to comment on the disclosure of sealed materials from Giuffre v. Maxwell, No. 15 Civ. 7433, to Alan Dershowitz, Defendant in Giuffre v. Dershowitz, No. 19 Civ. 3377, as discussed in the Court's Order dated August 4, 2020 [dkt. no. 154]. Accordingly, the Does shall submit comments about the proposed disclosure to the Court's email address at PreskaNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov by no later than August 25, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/14/2020) (va)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated August 14, 2020 re: Offer of Proof Regarding Subpoenas to Leslie Wexner and John Zeiger. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Kiely, Christian)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #161 Motion for Marion H. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Marion H. Little, Jr. for admission to practice pro hac vice in the above caption matter is granted. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/14/2020) (va)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #161 MOTION for Marion H. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Re: Status of Negotiations as to Rule 45 Subpoenas to John Zeiger and Leslie Wexner Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MOTION for Marion H. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice).(Little, Marion)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #160 MOTION for Marion H. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21142459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (vba)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY -MOTION for Marion H. Little, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-21142459. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner, John W Zeiger..(Little, Marion) Modified on 8/13/2020 (vba).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Marion H. Little, Jr. dated July 28, 2020 re: [ #156 ] FIRST LETTER from Howard M. Cooper dated July 23, 2020 re: Rule 45 Subpoenas to Leslie Wexner and John Zeiger.. Document filed by Leslie H. Wexner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Petrillo, Guy)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 07/28/2020 re: Response to Defendant's Letter of July 23, 2020 Rule 45 Subpoenas to Leslie Wexner and John Zeiger. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated July 31, 2020 re: Rule 45 Subpoenas to Leslie Wexner and John Zeiger. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated July 23, 2020 re: Rule 45 Subpoenas to Leslie Wexner and John Zeiger. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F).(Kiely, Christian)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Telephone Conference set for 8/17/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (va)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER: Accordingly, counsel for Mr. Dershowitz, Ms. Giuffre, and Mr. Wexner and Mr. Zeiger shall confer regarding Mr. Dershowitz's and Ms. Giuffre's requests and report to the Court by letter no later than August 13, 2020, the status of their discussions. Third, counsel for Mr. Dershowitz, Ms. Giuffre, and Mr. Wexner and Mr. Zeiger shall appear for a telephonic conference on August 17, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. EST. The Court will communicate separately to counsel information for joining the teleconference. Members of the media and the general public may join the teleconference using the following listen-only line: (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/10/2020) (va)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER: Accordingly, by posting this order both in Giuffre v. Maxwell, No. 15 Civ. 7433, and Giuffre v. Dershowitz, No. 19 Civ. 3377, the Court invites the Does to comment on the proposed disclosure. Any Doe who wishes to be heard on the disclosure proposed by counsel in Giuffre v. Dershowitz shall inform the Court of his/her views no later than August 18, 2020. Because those comments may discuss information that is currently under seal in Giuffre v. Maxwell, they will be submitted directly to the Court so that the Court can review them in camera. Comments may be sent to the Court's email address at PreskaNYSDChambers@nysd.uscourts.gov. The Court specifically requests comment from counsel for John Doe who has appeared in Maxwell. The Court will, at the least, inform the parties generally of the nature of any comments received. Relatedly, the parties request that the Court clarify that deposition transcripts and other documents not designated confidential on their face (excerpts of some of which were submitted under seal as part of the (now unsealed) summary judgment record in Maxwell, see infra n. 1) are not subject to the Maxwell Protective Order (dkt. no. 62 in 15 Civ. 7433) and thus may be freely disclosed and produced to Defendant without any restrictions on their use or disclosure. The Court agrees that materials not designated confidential are not covered by the Maxwell Protective Order but disagrees that there is necessarily no restriction on their disclosure. Specifically, certain materials may both (1) lack confidentiality designations made pursuant to the Protective Order and (2) be filed under seal in the Maxwell litigation. To the extent that the materials mention non-parties to the Maxwell action and remain under seal, such materials should not be disclosed before the non-parties mentioned are given notice and an opportunity to comment on the disclosure. (See supra at 2.) However, where such materials have already been unsealed--either by this Court or by the Court of Appeals--they may be freely disclosed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/4/2020) (va)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from the Parties dated July 29, 2020 re: Court's July 22, 2020 Order (ECF No. 152). Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER with respect to #146 Letter Motion to Stay. Counsel shall report to the Court by letter no later than July 29, 2020, the status of their discussions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/22/2020) (va)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated July 10, 2020 re: Reply to Response to Dershowitz Pre-Motion Letter of July 2, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Kiely, Christian)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 DECLARATION of Charles J. Cooper in Opposition re: #146 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #144 Order,,,, addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated 07/02/2020.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Email Exchange, #2 Exhibit B- Transcript, #3 Exhibit C- Subpoena, #4 Exhibit D- Email Exchange, #5 Exhibit E- Letter, #6 Exhibit F- Initial Disclosures, #7 Exhibit G- Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to Defendant's First Request for Production to Giuffre final (excerpts), #8 Exhibit H- Plaintiff's Objections and Responses to First Set of Interrogatories to Giuffre final (excerpts), #9 Exhibit I- Email Exchange, #10 Exhibit J- Email Exchange, #11 Exhibit K- Transcript).(Cooper, Charles)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated July 7, 2020 re: Dershowitz Pre-Motion Letter of July 2, 2020. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 7/7/2020 Replies due by 7/10/2020. (kv)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER with respect to #146 Letter Motion to Stay. The Court's July 1 order [dkt. no. 144] is hereby stayed pending further order of the Court. Ms. Giuffre shall respond to Mr. Dershowitz's requests by letter no later than July 7, 2020. Mr. Dershowitz shall reply to Ms. Giuffre no later than July 10,2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/6/2020) Copies Mailed By Chambers. (kv)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 LETTER MOTION to Stay re: #144 Order,,,, addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated 07/02/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 MEMORANDUM & ORDER re: (133 in 1:19-cv-03377-LAP) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated June 12, 2020, filed by Alan Dershowitz. For the reasons discussed above: (1) Cooper & Kirk shall destroy (a) all materials from Giuffre v. Maxwell, No. 15 Civ. 7433, currently in its possession, save for the transcript of Ms. Giuffre's deposition in that case and (b) all work product derived from the Maxwell materials. Cooper & Kirk shall submit to the Court an affidavit detailing the steps that it took to destroy the materials. In addition, to the extent it is doing so, Cooper & Kirk shall cease all use of the Maxwell materials--outside of Ms. Giuffre's deposition transcript--in its work on Ms. Giuffre's action against Mr. Dershowitz. (2) Mr. Dershowitz's request to modify the Maxwell Protective Order [dkt. no. 133 in 19 Civ. 3377] is denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/1/2020) (va)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Telephone Conference held on 6/23/2020. (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) (mph)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER: Counsel for the parties in the above-captioned actions1 shall appear for a telephonic conference on June 23, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. EST. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. The parties are directed to call in promptly at 2:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 6/23/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2020) (va)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated June 18, 2020 re: Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's letter dated June 17, 2020 re: Sealed Materials from Giuffre v. Maxwell, Case No. 15-cv-07433-LAP.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Ansari, Imran)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 06/17/2020 re: Sealed Materials from Giuffre v. Maxwell, Case No. 15-cv-07433-LAP. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #135 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: The proposed briefing schedule is approved. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 7/2/2020, Replies due by 7/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/16/2020) (va)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 15, 2020 re: Motion to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Vol. I Am. Counterclaims and Exs., #4 Exhibit 3 Vol. II Am. Counterclaims and Exs.).(Cooper, Charles)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 15, 2020 re: Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER: Plaintiff shall inform the Court by letter no later than June 17, 2020, of her views regarding Defendants letter dated June 12, 2020 [dkt. no. 133]. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/15/2020) (cf)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated June 12, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D).(Cooper, Howard)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER re: #130 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. The Court has reviewed Plaintiff's letter regarding Defendant's amended counterclaims. (See dkt. no. 130.) Plaintiff's counsel shall inform the Court by letter no later than June 15, 2020, if Plaintiff wishes to 1) stand on her pending motion to dismiss, supplemented, if appropriate, by argument related to the newly-added material in the counterclaim, or 2) withdraw the present motion and file a new motion addressed to the amended counterclaim. Plaintiff's counsel shall inform Defendant's counsel and the Court of the course chosen, and, if appropriate, counsel shall confer and inform the Court of a proposed briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2020) (va)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' letters regarding the scope of various subpoenas issued by Defendant to Plaintiff's current and prior counsel. (See dkt. nos. 125, 128, 129.) Defense counsel shall conclude negotiations with counsel for the law firms before asking the Court to intervene. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/8/2020) (va)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated June 8, 2020 re: Amended Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 06/05/2020 re: #125 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Michael A. Brille dated June 5, 2020 re: #125 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. . Document filed by Boies Schiller Flexner LLP..(Weill, Richard)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 AMENDED COUNTERCLAIM amending #117 Amended Complaint against All Defendants.Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Related document: #117 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P).(Oren, Kristine)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER re: #125 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. filed by Alan Dershowitz. The Court is in receipt of Defendant Alan Dershowitz's request for a pre-motion conference on a motion to compel Boies Schiller Flexner LLP ("BSF") to produce documents requested in a Rule 45 subpoena that was served on BSF on December 5, 2019. (See dkt. no. 125.) BSF shall respond to Mr. Dershowitz's request no later than June 5, 2020. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 6/5/2020) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/1/2020) (va)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper, Esq. dated May 29, 2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 4, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 5, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Part 6, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 5).(Cooper, Howard)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting #123 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #119 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 6/16/2020. Replies due by 6/30/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/28/2020) (va)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #119 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 05/27/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz..(Oren, Kristine)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 05/19/2020 re: Motion To Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECLARATION of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: #119 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 Answer with Counterclaims).(Cooper, Charles)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #119 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MOTION to Dismiss Counterclaims. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Responses due by 6/2/2020.(Cooper, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ANSWER to #117 Amended Complaint with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia L. Giuffre. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P).(Kiely, Christian)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #116 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,, against Alan Dershowitz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Related document: #116 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint,,..(Cooper, Charles)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Charles J Cooper to RE-FILE re: Document No. #116 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; Add Virginia Giuffre to CM ECF. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILER ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Alan Dershowitz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Cooper, Charles) Modified on 4/15/2020 (pc).
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2020. (va)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MEMORANDUM & ORDER granting #99 Motion to Amend/Correct. For the reasons detailed above, Giuffre's motion to amend [dkt. no. 99] is GRANTED. To the extent not addressed in this opinion, the Court considered Dershowitz's remaining arguments and found them unavailing. Giuffre is directed to file her First Amended Complaint by no later than April 15, 2020. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 4/8/2020) (va) (Main Document 115 replaced on 4/9/2020) (va). Modified on 4/9/2020 (va).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated February 7, 2020 re: Motion for Leave To File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre..(Cooper, Charles)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Oren, Kristine)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #110 Letter, filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant may file an opposition of up to 25 pages. Plaintiff may have an additional five pages for her reply if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/23/2020) (va)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated January 23, 2020 re: Request Pursuant to Individual Practice Rule 2.C Requesting Leave to File a Memorandum of Law of up to 25 Pages in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER granting #108 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 1/24/2020 Replies due by 2/7/2020. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/16/2020) (mml)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 AMENDED LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 1/16/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Kristine C. Oren dated 1/15/2020. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Oren, Kristine)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #105 Motion for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 1/3/2020) (mml)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #105 MOTION for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18409777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MOTION for Kristine Chappen Oren to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18409777. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Oren, Kristine)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 104 AGREED ORDER: Based on the parties agreement, it is hereby ORDERED that the microcassette tape produced by Defendant to Stroz Friedberg and currently in Stroz Friedberg's possession shall be promptly turned over to the forensic firm of CDS Legal for whatever analysis either party requests and pays for. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 12/23/2019) (va)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Christian G. Kiely dated December 23, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Kiely, Christian)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Counsel dated 12/23/2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Agreed Order)(Cooper, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 101 AFFIDAVIT of Haley N. Proctor in Support re: #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, .. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Proposed Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Transcript)(Cooper, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Cooper, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint,, . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated December 20, 2019 re: Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 97 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 12/2/19 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 12/2/2019 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Karen Gorlaski, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/31/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2020.(McGuirk, Kelly)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the parties that the time within which Plaintiff Virginia L. Giuffre may move, answer, or otherwise respond to Defendant Alan Dershowitz's counterclaims is hereby extended up to and including: (1) December 20, 2019, if Plaintiff elects not to move to amend the Complaint on or before that date, (2) if Plaintiff moves to amend the Complaint and the Court denies such motion, 21 days after the Court enters the denial, or (3) if the Court grants a motion to amend the Complaint, 21 days after Defendant serves his amended answer and counterclaims. The parties further stipulate that Defendant's time to respond to a motion to amend the Complaint or to dismiss the counterclaims, filed on or before December 20, 2019, is hereby extended up to and including January 17, 2020. No provision of this Stipulation and Order shall be construed as a waiver of, and Plaintiff expressly reserves, any and all defenses. The original deadline for Plaintiff to move, answer, or otherwise respond to the counterclaims was November 29, 2019. There has been no previous request for extension of time in connection with Plaintiff's response to the counterclaims or Defendant's response to a motion to amend the Complaint or to dismiss the counterclaims. Virginia L. Giuffre answer due 12/20/2019. (Motions due by 12/30/2019., Responses due by 1/17/2020.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/25/2019) (mml)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Proctor, Haley)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Moss, Nicole)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Counsel dated 11/20/2019 re: Electronic Device Request. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Proctor, Haley)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER: In advance of the conference scheduled for December 2, 2019, counsel shall submit their discovery plan by no later than 12:00 pm on Wednesday, November 27, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/15/2019) (mml)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with JURY DEMAND., COUNTERCLAIM against Virginia L. Giuffre. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Kiely, Christian)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER: The Court has conferred with counsel for both parties. The currently scheduled conference will remain on December 2, 2019 at 9:00 AM. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2019) (mml)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #87 Motion for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/6/2019) (mml)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #87 MOTION for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17897934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MOTION for Nicole Jo Moss to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17897934. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Nicole J. Moss, #2 Exhibit Maryland Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit North Carolina Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Moss, Nicole)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER: Because Plaintiff has engaged new counsel, counsel shall confer with each other and with the Court's deputy regarding a date earlier than December 2 for a conference and shall submit their discovery plan in advance of the conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/2019) (mml)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying #71 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Defendant's request for pre-Answer discovery is denied on the following grounds: 1. Defendant has not made any showing that pre-Answer discovery is necessary - and not just helpful - to his preparation of an Answer and/or Counterclaims. 2. Defendant has not provided the Court with any justification for departing from the Court-ordered unsealing process in Giuffre v. Maxwell. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/5/2019) (mml)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated 11/04/2019 re: Pre-Answer Discovery and Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #78 Motion for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #77 Motion for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #76 Motion for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 11/4/2019) (mml)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari, Esq. dated 11/4/19 re: Reply/Response to Letter Filed by Plaintiff re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 79 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Charles J. Cooper dated November 1, 2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Cooper, Charles)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #78 MOTION for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17869086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MOTION for Haley Marie Nix Proctor to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17869086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Haley N. Proctor, #2 Exhibit Oklahoma Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Virginia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Proctor, Haley)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #77 MOTION for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MOTION for Michael William Kirk to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868876. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Michael W. Kirk, #2 Exhibit New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kirk, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #76 MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MOTION for Charles Justin Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17868673. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Charles J. Cooper, #2 Exhibit Alabama Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit Georgia Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing, #5 Text of Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Cooper, Charles)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/30/19 re: Response to Letter Filed by John Doe. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #73 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's time to serve a responsive pleading is extended to November 7. To avoid further delay, counsel shall confer with plaintiff's current counsel on this rather ministerial matter. SO ORDERED. Alan Dershowitz answer due 11/7/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/30/2019) (mml)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/30/2019 re: Request for Extension of Time to File Answer and Counterclaims. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER with respect to #71 Letter Motion for Local Rule 37.2 Conference. Counsel shall confer with Plaintiff's counsel. If Plaintiff's counsel disagrees, he or she may inform the Court by letter no later than November 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/25/2019) (ks) Modified on 11/26/2019 (ks).
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 LETTER MOTION for Local Rule 37.2 Conference re: Pre-Answer Discovery addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Howard M. Cooper dated October 24, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Return Date set for 10/29/2019 at 05:00 PM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kiely, Christian)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #69 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Initial Conference set for 12/2/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/23/2019) (mml)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/18/19 re: Request for Adjournment of November 20, 2019 Rule 16 Conference. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (js)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 OPINION AND ORDER: re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. filed by Alan Dershowitz, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. filed by Alan Dershowitz. Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint [dkt. no. 22] is denied. Defendant's motion to disqualify the law firm of Boies Schiller Flexner LLP [dkt. no. 7] is granted. New counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendant shall confer and submit a proposed discovery plan no later than November 13. Counsel shall appear for a Rule 16 conference on November 20 at 11:00 A.M. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/16/2019) (js)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #65 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Prof. Dershowitz shall forthwith turn over the microcassette to the Stroz Friedberg firm for whatever analysis the parties order and pay for. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/10/2019) (mml)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran H. Ansari dated October 10, 2019 re: Audio Recording. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated October 3, 2019 re: Response to Defendant Letter (DE 61). Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/19 re: Correction to Post-Argument Letter. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/19 re: * TITLE CORRECTION* Post Argument Letter re: Motion to Disqualify AND MOTION TO DISMISS. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/03/2019 re: Post Argument Letter re: Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #54 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Counsel may submit a three-page, double spaced letter in 12-point type no later that October 3 at 9:00am. Plaintiff may submit a similar letter no later than 5:00pm on October 4. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/2/2019) (mml)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SECOND LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Reply in Support of Request for Leave to File a Post-Argument Submission. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated October 1, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Objection to DE 54. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #55 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2019) (mml)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Defendant's counsel shall forthwith turn over the tape recording of Mr. Boies discussed at last week's oral argument to Stroz Friedberg or a similar digital forensic firm for whatever analysis either party requests and pays for. The digital forensic firm shall forthwith produce a copy of the tape recording to counsel for each party. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2019) (mml)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Objection to Release of Audio Tape. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 10/01/2019 re: Request for Leave to File a Post-Argument letter to Clarify and Provide Factual Information. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Sigrid McCawley dated September 26, 2019 re: Sealed Document DE 50. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(McCawley, Sigrid)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(rz)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #50 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/25/2019) (mml)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated September 25, 2019 re: Request for Order to File Documents Under Seal Pursuant to Sept 24, 2019 hearing. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Oral Argument held on 9/24/2019 re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. filed by Alan Dershowitz, #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Court Reporter Karen Gorlaski) (mph)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER: It is the Court's intention to hold a separate argument with respect to the Confidential Memorandum referred to in this Court's July 17, 2019 order [dkt. no. 41]. The Court will ask Professor Dershowitz how disclosure of the Memorandum to the Boise Schiller Firm ("BSF") could result in any detriment to him and will ask BSF to specify how the contents of the Memorandum have been made public. The Court is willing to meet separately with the parties, if necessary. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/18/2019) (mml) Modified on 9/18/2019 (mml).
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for September 24, 2019 at 9:00 a.m. is adjourned to September 24, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 9/24/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/18/2019) (mml)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #46 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The argument is adjourned to September 24 at 9:0am in Courtroom 12A. (Oral Argument set for 9/24/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 9/5/2019) (jwh)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SECOND LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Disqualify addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 9/5/19. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Return Date set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM.(Ansari, Imran)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #44 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Oral Argument set for 9/11/2019 at 11:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/15/2019) (mml)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated 8/14/19 re: Oral argument adjournment. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: Counsel shall appear for oral argument on the motion to disqualify and the motion to dismiss on September 9, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 12A. SO ORDERED. Oral Argument set for 9/9/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 8/5/2019) (mml)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault.(mhe)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER re: #39 Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, filed by Alan Dershowitz. Pursuant to footnote 5 of his reply brief on the motion to disqualify [dkt. no. 39], Defendant is directed to file the Confidential Memorandum under seal for the Court's in camera review. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/17/2019) (kv)
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cooper, Howard)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL DECLARATION OF ALAN DERSHOWITZ, #2 Exhibit EMAIL FROM SIRES TO DERSHOWITZ, #3 Exhibit EMAIL FROM SIRES TO DERSHOWITZ, #4 Exhibit DAILY MAIL ARTICLE)(Ansari, Imran)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #30 Motion for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/3/2019) (jwh)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of Joshua I. Schiller in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16)(Schiller, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of David Boies in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 DECLARATION of Prof. Roy D. Simon, Jr. in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Schiller, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Schiller, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #31 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/3/2019) (kv)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated July 2, 2019 re: Length of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #30 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17176235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Sigrid S. McCawley to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17176235. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit COGS, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCawley, Sigrid)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #27 Motion for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/27/2019) (jca)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #26 Motion for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/26/2019) (rjm)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #27 MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christian G. Kiely, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order for Admission)(Kiely, Christian)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #26 MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Howard M. Cooper, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission)(Cooper, Howard)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #25 MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #21 MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Massachusetts; missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Christian G. Kiely to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138926. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Christian G. Kiely)(Kiely, Christian) Modified on 6/26/2019 (wb).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 DECLARATION of Michelle Proctus in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cooper, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Cooper, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Responses due by 7/9/2019(Cooper, Howard)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Howard M. Cooper to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17138693. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Howard M. Cooper)(Cooper, Howard) Modified on 6/26/2019 (wb).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/25/2019) (rjm)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Memorandum of Law in Support of a Motion to Dismiss the Complaint addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 25, 2019. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #17 Letter filed by Alan Dershowitz. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Set Deadlines/Hearing as to #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff: Responses due by 7/3/2019, Replies due by 7/10/2019.) (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/19/2019) (jwh)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Imran Ansari, Esq. dated June 19, 2019 re: Motion Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Ansari, Imran)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re: #15 Letter filed by Virginia L. Giuffre: Following review of Mr. Schiller's letter dated June 17, 2019 [dkt no. 15], it is hereby ordered that: 1) Mr. Dershowitz is excused from the requirement for a premotion conference on the Court's finding that such a conference would be futile; 2) Mr. Dershowitz's motion to disqualify the Boise Schiller firm [dkt. nos. 7-11] is reinstated to the calendar; 3) Mr. Dershowitz may file a memorandum of law of 28 pages; and 4) Counsel shall confer and inform the Court by letter of the proposed briefing schedule. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/17/2019) (jwh)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated June 17, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Arthur L. Aidala dated June 12, 2019 re: Request for Pre-Motion Conference re: Defendant's Motion to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz.(Aidala, Arthur)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on: #12 LETTER terminating #7 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. ENDORSEMENT: Mr. Dershowitz's motion to disqualify [dkt. no. 8-10] is marked off the calendar for failure to comply with the Court's Individual Practice Rule. 2.1. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 6/11/2019) (jwh)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from Joshua I. Schiller dated 6/11/2019 re: Defendant Dershowitz's Motion to Disqualify. Document filed by Virginia L. Giuffre.(Schiller, Joshua)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #11 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. Related Document Number: #7 . (Aidala, Arthur) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DECLARATION of Alan Dershowitz in Support re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SDNY Complaint, #2 Exhibit Letter to BSF, #3 Exhibit Email from Schiller, #4 Exhibit Daily Mail Article, #5 Exhibit Freeh's Report, #6 Exhibit Cassell and Edwards Statement, #7 Exhibit Decision of Judge Marra, #8 Exhibit Emails btwn Dershowitz and Sires, #9 Exhibit Gravante Letter, #10 Exhibit McMahon Decision)(Aidala, Arthur)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 DECLARATION of Bruce A. Green in Support re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff.. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 CV of Bruce Green)(Aidala, Arthur)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. . Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Aidala, Arthur)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel for Plaintiff. Document filed by Alan Dershowitz. (Attachments: #1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Aidala, Arthur)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur Louis Aidala on behalf of Alan Dershowitz. (Aidala, Arthur)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Imran H. Ansari on behalf of Alan Dershowitz. (Ansari, Imran)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Alan Dershowitz. (pc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Plaintiff code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Dollar Demand $75,000,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 3 (Citizen or Subject of a Foreign Country); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Joshua Schiller. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE, Alan M. Dershowitz. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Schiller, Joshua)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ALAN DERSHOWITZ, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Schiller, Joshua)
April 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan M. Dershowitz. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16706500)Document filed by VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1_Article, #2 Exhibit 2_Article, #3 Exhibit 3_Article, #4 Exhibit 4_Article, #5 Exhibit 5_Article, #6 Exhibit 6_Social Media Post, #7 Exhibit 7_Letter, #8 Exhibit 8_Article, #9 Exhibit 9_Article, #10 Exhibit 10_Article, #11 Exhibit 11_Article, #12 Exhibit 12_Affidavit, #13 Exhibit 13_Affidavit, #14 Exhibit 14_Affidavit, #15 Exhibit 15_E-Mail, #16 Exhibit 16_Article)(Schiller, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Giuffre v. Dershowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA L. GIUFFRE
Represented By: Joshua Schiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan M. Dershowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Alan Dershowitz
Represented By: Imran H. Ansari
Represented By: Christian Kiely
Represented By: Howard M. Cooper
Represented By: Arthur Louis Aidala
Represented By: Kristine Chappen Oren
Represented By: John M. Leventhal
Represented By: Barry Kamins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Leslie H. Wexner
Represented By: Marion H. Little, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: John W Zeiger
Represented By: Marion H. Little, Jr.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Sharon Churcher
Represented By: Eric Joel Feder
Represented By: Laura R. Handman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Miami Herald Media Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Julie Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?