3B Medical, Inc. v. SoClean, Inc.
Case Number: |
1:2019cv03545 |
Filed: |
April 22, 2019 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Southern District of New York |
Office: |
Foley Square Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Katherine Polk Failla |
Nature of Suit: |
Trademark |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1125 la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2022 |
Filing
109
ORDER: Upon review of all premotion letters, the Court is not persuaded that a premotion conference or further briefing is necessary to resolve the parties' disputes. In accordance with this Court's Individual Practices and Rule 7.1 of the Court's Local Rules, SoClean may file a combined motion to dismiss and stay of this action which shall not exceed five pages in length (single spaced, twelve-point font), unless, upon a party's request, the Court authorizes a larger number. The substance of such motion may not deviate materially from the basis for dismissal that SoClean stated in its initial premotion letters. In response, within seven (7) days of the filing of SoClean's motion, 3B Medical may file its o pposition, which may similarly not exceed five pages (single spaced, twelve-point font), opposing the motion. SoClean may file a three-page reply within seven (7) days of the filing of 3B Medicals response. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 6/24/2022) (jca)
|
November 2, 2021 |
Filing
102
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Victor Marrero on 11/2/2021) (tg)
|
June 11, 2021 |
Filing
72
ORDER re: 71 USCA Mandate,, SoClean, Inc.Defendant shall answer the complaint on or by July 7, 2021. Additionally, on or by July 17, 2021, the parties shall submit a joint status update and a Proposed Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order. answer due 7/7/2021. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/11/2021) (ate)
|
September 9, 2020 |
Filing
66
CLERK'S JUDGMENT re: 65 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of SoClean, Inc. against 3B Medical, Inc. It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated September 8, 2020, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED; accordingly, this case is closed. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/9/2020) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal) (km)
|
September 8, 2020 |
Filing
65
OPINION AND ORDER re: 46 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, dtd 10/25/19 filed by SoClean, Inc. For the reasons stated in this Opinion, Defendant's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, adjourn all remaining dates, and close this case. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 9/8/2020) (rro) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?