In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Defendant: UBS Deutschland AG
Appellee: Citibank NA London, FS/Andbanc Andorra, FS/SG Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) SA, Judith Cherwinka, Hambros Guernsey Nominees, EFG Bank, Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin), Mirabaud & Cie, Royal Bank of Canada, Citibank (Switzerland) AG, FS/AEB Lux, Credit Suisse (Bahamas), Banco Inversis SA, Rothschild Lugano Dublin, Bank Julius Baer and Co. Ltd., Zurich, Catalunya Caixa, Theodoor GGC Amsterdam, SG Hambros Nominees (Jersey), FS Mizrahi Tefahot Bank Ltd., BNP Paribas Securities Nominees Ltd., CDC ICM the GHOS Portfolio, PFPC Bank Limited, FS/NBK Kuwait, Quasar Funds SPC, FS/HSBC Guyerzeller Zurich, HSBC Private Bank (Guernsey) Ltd., Banco Atlantico (Bahamas), ABN AMRO Schweiz AG, Dexia BIL, Bank Hapoalim (Suisse) Ltd., FS/Banque Degroof Bruxelles, Six Sis AG, FS/HSBC Private Banking Nom, SNS Global Custody B.V., SG Hambros Bank (Channel Islands) Limited- Guernsey, Natixis, Kiangsu Chekiang and Shanghai Residents (H.K.) Association, Dreadnought Finance OY, BSI Ex Banca Del Gottardo, Banca Arner SA, UMR, DGAM Alternative Strategy Fund II, SPC - Cell A, Fortis Bank Nederland NV, Strategy Sicav Edpaf, BBVA (Suisse) SA, EFG Private Bank SA, Blush Nominees, LLC, FS/CBESSA, Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA, ICM Tactical Master, Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD., ICIB Centre France Alpha Prot Master, Bipielle Banke (Suisse), FCP-BE CAEN, Bank Zurich, HSBC Republic Bank, BankMed (Suisse) S.A., UBS AG New York, Zurich Capital Markets Company, SG Hambros Bank, GE Life S Pore Li Inv Fd Par Slam (FI), Investec Bank (Switzerland) AG, BBVA Grand Cayman, CPR Online, Banco Itau International, Shareholders Fund - SCMS, Bank Sarasin & Cie AG, BSI AG, Andorra Banc Agricol Reig SA, Avalon Absolute Return Funds PLC, FS/GSCO London, Sciens CFO 1 Feeder Fund Ltd., Societe Generale Bank & Trust (Luxembourg), Bank Hapoalim Switzerland Ltd., BP Alpha S.A., Naidot & Co., ABN AMRO Retained Nominees (IOM) Limited, Eduardo Fernandez de Valderrama Murillo, ING Bank (Suisse) SA, Bordier & Cie, Citibank, Rothschild Trust (Schweiz) AG, Hyperiod (HD) Limited, Natixis Private Banking International SA, Martin Lavarello, Banca Privata Edmond de Rothschild Lugano S.A., Fortis Global Custody Services NV, HSBC Seoul Branch, Ltd., Fortis Bank SA/NV, Al Nahysan Mansour Zayed, Banque SCS Alliance SA, Centrum Bank AG (AMS), Parson Finance Panama SA, Liongate Multistrategy Fund SEG Portfolio, Kefong Lee, CDC IXIS Capital Markets North America Inc., FS/BK Hapoalim/B M Tel Aviv, Credit Suisse Gibraltar Limited, RBC Dexia Investor Service Julius Baer Sicav, Delta S.P.A., FS/Bank Leumi Israel, Hontai Life Insurance Company Limited, FS Stichting Stroeve Global Custody, Abu Dhabi Investment Authority, RBC Capital Markets Corporation, ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) Ltd., Murdoch & Co., Caixa DEstalvis de Catalunya, Credit Suisse AG Zurich, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Ex Fortis, Unicorp Bank & Trust Limited, Banco ITAU Europa Luxembourg, Arden International Capital Ltd., UBS Jersey Nominees, ICIB Hyperion Alternative Basket II Master, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Private, SIS Seeganintersettle, Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. (Luxembourg), Banca Commerciale Lugano, LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG, ICIB Atlantique Alpha Master, Banque Degroof Luxembourg S.A., FS/Swedclient/IAM, Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA, Wegelin & Company, Barclays Private Bank & Trust (Channel Islands) Limited, RBC Dominion Securities, Nadine Pavlovsky, Rothschild Bank AG, Credit Lyonnais SA, Safra National Bank of New York, Societe Europeenne de Banque S.A., CAIS Bank, Multi-Strategy Fund Limited, HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Asia) Limited, Banque Piguet & Cie S.A., GE Brunei Life Ins FD Lion Capital Balanced (330008), HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited, Fund Nominees Limited, Luisa M. Strina, Credit Suisse, BCV AMC Defensive Al Fund, Clarks Fork Foundation, Barfield Nominees Limited, UBS Fund Services (Cayman) Limited, Kasbank Effecten Bewaarbedrijf N.V., HSBC Private Bank (C.I.) Limited, Chelsea Trust Company Limited, HSBC International Trustee Limited, FS Oddo & Cie, EFG Bank AG and, PKB Privatbank AG, Credit Agricole Titres, Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd., Deutsche Bank AG Singapore, Legacy Fund Ltd., GE Brunei Life Ins Fd Slam Balanced, Dexia World Alternative, Fairfield Investment GCI, Banco Santander (Suisse) S.A., Bank of Ireland Nominees Limited, SNS Bank N.V., Life Ins Fund-Par (FI)-Lion Capital-SCND, National Bank of Kuwait, Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg S.A., Pleasant T. Rowland Foundation Inc., Kredietbank SA Luxembourgeoise, Schroders Italy SIM SPA, Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, Deutsche Bank Nominees (Jersey) Limited, DGAM Asset Allocation Fund L.P., Fortis Bank (Nederland) N.V., Fidessa Alpha Fund, FS/ING Lux, Blubank Ltd., FS/GSCO New York, Alok Sama, Atlantic Security Bank, HSBC Securities (Panama) SA, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, FS/NBP Titres, Dresdner Bank Schweiz, Credit Andorra/Crediinvest, Bank of America National Trust and Savings Association, Banque Syz & Co. SA, Lloyds TSB Bank Geneva, Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse), Palmares Europlus, Finter Bank Zurich, Banca Profilo SPA, HSH Nordbank Securities S.A., BP Alpha, ICIB Hyperion Alternative Basket Master, Fondo Hunter, Verwaltungs und Privat - Bank AG Aktiengesellschaft (AMS), Mirabaud, Credit Lyonnais Miami, FIF Advanced Ltd., Lion Global Investors, Bank Morgan Stanley SA, FS/Israel Discount Bank, Limited, Tel Aviv, Commercial Bank of Kuwait, First Gulf Bank, UBS Zurich, Fairfield Investment Fund Ltd., Bank Julius Baer and Co. SA, Schroder & Co. Bank AG, Deutsche bank (Suisse) SA Geneve, Public Bank Nominees Limited, Private Space Ltd., Graziela Strina de Toledo Arruda, Clearstream, Harmony Capital Fund Ltd, Woori Bank, Banque Privee Edmond de Rothschild (Europe), Citibank Korea Inc., Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited, Dexia Private Bank (Switzerland), Perenco SA, UBS Fund Services (Cayman) Limited REF Greenlake Arbitrage Fund Ltd., CDC IXIS, Hinduja Bank (Switzerland) SA, Fox & Co., Lombardi Properties Limited, FS/BBVA Miami, Vorarlberger Landes UND Hypothekenbank Aktiengesellschaft, T1 Global Fund Ltd., Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique, Ihag Handelsbank AG, Incore Bank AG, IPCM, PFPC International Bank Limited, Republic Nominees Limited, Arden International Capital Limited, Banco Nominees (IOM) Limited, AAAM, FS, Barclays Bank SA Madrid, Neue Bank AG, Barclays Bank (Suisse) SA, SG Hambros Nominees, Edmond de Rothschild (Suisse) S.A., Banque de Luxembourg, Caliber Investments Ltd., Nomura International PLC, Simgest SpA, DGAM Alternative Strategy Fund II, SPC - Cell B, Hansard Europe Limited, Sis SegaInterSettle AG, Credit Suisse AG, RBC Investor Services Bank SA, Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Deutsche Bank (Cayman), SCND Life Ins Fund Par FI Slam, Melrose Investments Ltd., Citigroup Global Markets Limited, Hambros, Banco Inversis Net, RBS Coutts Bank Ltd., ICIB Cote D'Armor Alpha Master, ICIB Ethias Allocation Master, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria (Portugal) S.A., Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Tayleigh Trust Company Limited, Bie Bank & Trust Bahamas Ltd., Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Banque Havilland S.A., KWI, Gates Charitable Trust, Millenium Multi-Strategy Fund, Deltec Bank & Trust Limited, ICIB Natexis Lux Alpha Master, GE Life, Standard Charted PLC, FS/Fortis Banque Luxembourg, Credit Lyonnais, Banca Carige SPA, Banco Itau Europa International, ZCM Matched Funding Corp., Monte Paschi Ireland Ltd., Corner Banca SA, RBC Dexia Investor Services Espana S.A., Select Absolute Strategies SICAV, FS ABN AMRO Global Custody, BNP Paribas Arbitrage SNC, Banque et Caisse dEpargne de lEtat Luxembourg, Quasar Fund SPC Class A and Class B CGCNV, Dresdner LateinAmerika AG, Sempervirens Capital Management Limited Class E-F Fund, BBVA Miami, Wall Street Securities S.A., Pictet & Cie, Robinson & Co., Collins Stewart (CI) Ltd., BNP Paribas Private Bank and Trust Cayman Ltd., Abdul Hamid M. Saeed, Arden Asset Management Inc., Falcon Private Bank, Credit Suisse International, Banca Unione di Credito, Hyposwiss Private Bank Geneve S.A., SG Hambros Bank & Trust (Guernsey) Ltd., Banc of America Securities, LLC, EFG Eurofinancier D'Invest MCL, Theodoor Gilissen Global Custody N.V., Sherli Elghanian Krayem, GE Life Shareholders Fd Slam FL, FS/LAB/AXA PM, IDF Global Fund, American Express Offshore Alternative Investment Fund, Global Fund Porvenir, Bessemer Trust Company, Credit Suisse Nominees (Guernsey) Limited, Essex 21 Limited, Bank J. Safra Sarasin AG, Bank Hapoalim BM, London, GE Life S Pore Li In Fd Par Slam FL, Sciens Global Opportunity Fund, Rahn & Bodmer Banquiers, HSBC Bank USA, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Banque Baring Brothers Sturdza SA, Banco General SA Banca Privada, Banque Degroof SA Bruxelles, Bank Morgan Stanley AG, Allianzbank SPA/Unifortune Conservative Side Pocket, Fullerton Capital PTE, Ltd., Lina Maria Melguizo, KAS Depositary Trust Co., NBK Banque Privee Suisse SA, Don Chimango SA, HSBC Securities Services (Luxembourg) S.A., Six SIS Ltd., Credit Suisse (Luxembourg) SA, Korea Exchange Bank, Clariden Leu Ltd., Harrier Holdings Limited, Jorge Herman Melguizo, EFG Bank SA Switzerland, RBC Dominion Securities, Inc., Bank Julius Baer and Co. Ltd., Essex 17 Limited, NYROY, Blush & Co., AXA Isle of Man Limited, Lombard Odier Darier Hentsch & Cie, Bureau of Labor Insurance, Fox Nominees, LLC, UBS (Luxembourg) S.A., John E. Niederhuber IRA, PNC International Bank Limited, Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, Banca Cesare Ponti SA, Banque de Reescompte et de Placement, UBS Fund Services (Ireland) Ltd., BBVA Fundas Privianza, DGAM Alternative Strategy Fund L.P., Banque Hapoalim, Dexia Banque Internationale a Luxembourg, Banque Vontobel Geneve SA, Royal Bank of Canada Singapore Branch, Cititrust Bahamas Limited, The Reserve Trust (Tayleigh or Samantha Sackler 1996), HSBC, Societe Generale Bank & Trust, Judith Cherwinka IRA, Hua Nan Commercial Bank, ZCM Asset Holding Co. Bermuda, Citibank (Switzerland) Zurich, Bank Vontobel AG, Bank Sarasin & Cie, Credit Industriel et Commercial Singapore Branch, Calyon Paris, SEI Investments Trustee and Custodial Services (Ireland) Ltd. Nominee A/C 1, ABN AMRO, Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria, S.A., Morgan Stanley & Co. International PLC, Credit Suisse Nominees, BNY AIS Nominees Ltd., FIF Advanced Limited, HSBC Private Bank (Suisse) S.A., Fortis Bank Cayman Limited, Bred Banque Populaire, Banque Generale du Luxembourg, Tercas Cassa di Risparmio della Provincia di Teramo S.P.A., Andorra Banc Agricol Reig, Credit Agricole (Miami), HSBC Trust Company AG, Odyssey Alternative Fund Limited, Celfin International Limited, DMC (HD) Limited, Vontobel Asset Management Inc., Public Bank (Hong Kong) Limited, GE Trust Pte Ltd - Lion Capital FI (330012), Tatiana Melguizo, GE Life - Shareholders FD - Lion Capital FI (330007), Jared Trading Limited/BVI, FS/BBVA Zurich/Shares, Oval Alpha Palmares, American Express Bank, SG Private Banking (Suisse) SA, Centre College, Clearstream Banking SA, Kas Bank, Sumitomo Trust & Banking Co., Ltd., Rothschild Bank Geneva (Dublin), Banco Atlantico Gibraltar Ltd., Arden Endowment Advisers Limited, OAM, Citivic Nominees Limited, Credit Suisse AG Nassau Branch Wealth Management, Rothschild & Cie Banque Paris, FS United Mizrahi Bank Limited, Stanhope Capital, Grand Cathay Securities (Hong Kong) Limited, Karen Lefcourt Trust, SCB Nominees (CI) Ltd., Eurogate Farad Global Niche, Banco Atlantico, Portobelo Advisors Inc., Merrill Lynch Bank, Fortis Global Custody Services N.V., Deutsche Bank (Suisse) SA as Successor to Bank Sal. Oppenheim Jr. & Cie (Schweiz) AG, Schroder & Co. (Asia) Ltd., Natexis Banques Populaires, Swedbank, All Funds Bank, Banca Popolare Dell'Alto Adige Soc. Coop. Resp. Lim., UBS AG Zurich, Kasbank Depositary Trust Company Conc Theta Multistar Low Volatility Fund, NMAS1 Gestion SGIIC SA, BNP Paribas Espana, Platinum All Weather Fund Limited, Merrill Lynch International, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, European Financial Group EFG SA and Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS
Appellant: Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Joanna Lau, Fairfield Lambda Ltd. (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Greig Mitchell and Charlotte Caulfield
In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv03911
Filed: May 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF MOTION OF MATTHEW AGLIALORO TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL granting (27) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Matthew Aglialoro terminated in case 1:19-cv-03911-VSB. PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that, upon the accompanying Declaration, Matthew Aglialoro will move this Court, at the Daniel Patrick Moynihan United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, on a day and time to be determined by the Court, pursuant to this Courts Local Civil Rule 1.4, for leave to withdraw as counsel for Defendants-Appellees CAIS Bank, Calyon Paris, CDC Ixis, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, CPR Online, Credit Agricole Titres, Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, CA Indosuez (Switzerland) SA f/k/a Crdit Agricole (Suisse) SA, Credit Agricole (Miami), Credit Lyonnais Miami n/k/a LCL-LE Credit Lyonnais S.A. Miami, Credit Lyonnais n/k/a LCL-LE Credit Lyonnais SA, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Fox Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Fox & Co., and Blush Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Blush & Co. PLEASE TAKE FURTHER NOTICE that other attorneys at Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP, will continue as counsel for the above-referenced Defendants-Appellees. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 2/12/2020) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al. (ks) Attorney Matthew Aglialoro terminated. Modified on 2/12/2020 (ks).
February 12, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Motion to Withdraw as Counsel served on Banque Privee Espirito Santo SA on February 12, 2020. Service was made by electronic mail and USPS First Class Mail. Document filed by Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA, FS/CBESSA..(Allegaert, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Christopher Allegaert in Support re: #31 MOTION for Christopher Allegaert; John F. Zulack; Lauren J. Pincus and Bianca Lin to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA, FS/CBESSA..(Allegaert, Christopher)
February 12, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION for Christopher Allegaert; John F. Zulack; Lauren J. Pincus and Bianca Lin to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA, FS/CBESSA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Withdraw as Counsel).(Allegaert, Christopher)
February 10, 2020 Filing 30 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by CDC IXIS, Blush Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Blush & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Agricole (Miami), Credit Lyonnais, Credit Lyonnais Miami, Fox Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Fox & Co., CAIS Bank, Calyon Paris, CPR Online, Credit Agricole Titres, Blush Nominees, LLC, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, Fox Nominees, LLC, Calyon Paris, Credit Agricole (Suisse) SA. Related Document Number: #27 . (Aglialoro, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 29 B> FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by CDC IXIS, Blush Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Blush > Co., Brown Brothers Harriman > Co., Credit Agricole (Miami), Credit Lyonnais, Credit Lyonnais Miami, Fox Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Fox > Co., CAIS Bank, Calyon Paris, CPR Online, Credit Agricole Titres, Blush Nominees, LLC, Brown Brothers Harriman > Co., Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, Fox Nominees, LLC, Calyon Paris, Credit Agricole (Suisse) SA. Related Document Number: #27 . (Aglialoro, Matthew) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 2/10/2020 (dt).
February 10, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Matthew Aglialoro, dated February 10, 2020 in Support re: (21 in 1:19-cv-05130-VSB, 27 in 1:19-cv-03911-VSB, 21 in 1:19-cv-05107-VSB, 21 in 1:19-cv-04546-VSB, 25 in 1:19-cv-05023-VSB, 55 in 1:19-cv-04888-VSB, 21 in 1:19-cv-04825-VSB, 53 in 1:19-cv-04964-VSB, 21 in 1:19-cv-05153-VSB, 21 in 1:19-cv-04995-VSB) MOTION for Matthew Aglialoro to Withdraw as Attorney .. Document filed by CDC IXIS, Blush Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Blush & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Agricole (Miami), Credit Lyonnais, Credit Lyonnais Miami, Fox Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Fox & Co., CAIS Bank, Calyon Paris, CPR Online, Credit Agricole Titres, Blush Nominees, LLC, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, Fox Nominees, LLC, Calyon Paris, Credit Agricole (Suisse) SA. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al..(Aglialoro, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Matthew Aglialoro to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by CDC IXIS, Blush Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Blush & Co., Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., Credit Agricole (Miami), Credit Lyonnais, Credit Lyonnais Miami, Fox Nominees, LLC, f/k/a Fox & Co., CAIS Bank, Calyon Paris, Credit Agricole Titres, Blush Nominees, LLC, Brown Brothers Harriman & Co., CPR Online, Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, Fox Nominees, LLC, Credit Agricole (Suisse) SA.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al..(Aglialoro, Matthew)
February 10, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney Matthew Aglialoro to RE-FILE Document No. (23 in 1:19-cv-05153-VSB) Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the proposed order; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order for Withdrawal of Attorney found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(dt)
January 29, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Allegaert on behalf of Lombard Odier Darier Hentsch & Cie, Banque Piguet & Cie S.A., FS/SG Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) SA, SG Private Banking (Suisse) SA, BCV AMC Defensive Al Fund, Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Banque Privee Edmond de Rothschild (Europe), Bordier & Cie, Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA, Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique, Edmond de Rothschild (Suisse) S.A., FS/CBESSA, FS/SG Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) SA, Hambros Guernsey Nominees, IDF Global Fund, Jared Trading Limited/BVI, Rothschild & Cie Banque Paris, Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin), Rothschild Bank Geneva (Dublin), Rothschild Lugano Dublin, SG Hambros Bank & Trust (Guernsey) Ltd., SG Hambros Bank (Channel Islands) Limited- Guernsey, SG Hambros Nominees (Jersey), SG Private Banking (Suisse) SA(now known as Societe Generale Private Banking (Suisse) S.A.), Societe Generale Bank & Trust, Societe Generale Bank & Trust (Luxembourg), Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. (Luxembourg), Banque SCS Alliance SA, SG Hambros Bank (Channel Islands) Limited - Guernsey, Banque de Reescompte et de Placement, Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin), Rothschild Lugano Dublin. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Allegaert, Christopher)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #24 Letter Motion for Oral Argument. Plaintiffs-Appellants request for oral argument is denied with leave to renew. If Plaintiffs-Appellants seek to renew the request, they should do so with the submission of the reply brief. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 12/11/2019) (js)
December 10, 2019 Filing 24 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David Elsberg dated December 10, 2019. Document filed by Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell.(Elsberg, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Compendium of Foreign Authorities - Part 1/Cases. Document filed by Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Compendium of Foreign Authorities - Part 2/Articles)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Elsberg, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 22 Appellant's BRIEF. Document filed by Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell. Appellee Brief due by 1/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A - Final Orders and Notices of Appeal, #2 Addendum B - Table of Defined Terms)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Elsberg, David)
December 10, 2019 Filing 21 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from the parties dated 12/10/2019 re: guidance concerning appendix and the Court's August 20, 2019 order. Document filed by Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell.(Konanova, Yelena)
December 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jordan Garman on behalf of Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Garman, Jordan)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Caitlin Joan Halligan on behalf of Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Halligan, Caitlin)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew Riggs Dunlap on behalf of Kenneth Krys, Greig Mitchell. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Dunlap, Andrew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND ORDER PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that Charles Platt is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record in the above-captioned matters on behalf of Consolidated Appellees Rahn & Bodmer Banquiers, SNS Global Custody B.V. (known as SNS Bank N.V.), Corner Banca SA, Finter Bank Zurich, Ihag Handelsbank AG, and PKB Privatbank AG. As of November 19, 2019, I will no longer be a member of the law firm Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP and will no longer have any association with the above-captioned matters. Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP will continue as counsel for the above-referenced defendants. SO ORDERED. Attorney Charles C. Platt terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 11/20/2019) (jca)
November 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Eric B. Halper on behalf of Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Bank Julius Baer and Co. Ltd., Zurich, ING Bank (Suisse) SA. New Address: McKool Smith, P.C., One Manhattan West, 395 9th Avenue, 50th Floor, New York, NY, USA 10001, (212) 402-9400. (Halper, Eric)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Corner Banca SA, Finter Bank Zurich, Ihag Handelsbank AG, PKB Privatbank AG, Rahn & Bodmer Banquiers, SNS Global Custody B.V.. (Platt, Charles)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Virginia I. Weber on behalf of Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd.. New Address: McKool Smith PC, One Manhattan West, 395 9th Avenue, 50th Floor,, New York City, New York, US 10001, (212) 402-9400. (Weber, Virginia)
October 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Francis Hauser on behalf of Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS. (Hauser, Gregory)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of of Change of Status of Foreign Representatives Appointment Pursuant to 11 u.s.c. 1518. Document filed by Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Caulfield Appointment Order, #2 Exhibit B - Mitchell Appointment Order)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Molton, David)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 COUNTER DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL Document filed by Appellee Citibank NA London. (bkar)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 DESIGNATION OF BANKRUPTCY RECORD ON APPEAL re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,. Document filed by Appellants Fairfield Lambda Ltd. (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (bkar)
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Caisse de dpt et placement du Qubec for Multi-Strategy Fund Limited. Document filed by Multi-Strategy Fund Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB, 1:19-cv-04428-VSB(Lack, Robert)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, that: The Appeals are hereby stayed as to the Interlocutory Rulings, and all rights and arguments in connection therewith, including but not limited to appellate rights, are preserved, pending further order of this Court (the "Stay"). Within 30 days following the date on which the Bankruptcy Court has resolved the Further SafeHarbor Briefing and the Further Personal Jurisdiction Briefing, any party to anAppeal may apply to the Court to lift the Stay and set a schedule for briefingconcerning the Interlocutory Rulings. Nothing herein shall prejudice the right of any party that has noticed an appeal from an appealable order of the Bankruptcy Court resolving the Further Safe Harbor Briefing and the Further Personal Jurisdiction Briefing to apply for consolidation of such appeals with the appeals from the Interlocutory Rulings. On or before the date that is ninety (90) days from the date on which this Order is entered by this Court, the Plaintiffs-Appellants shall file a single consolidated memorandum of law in support of their Appeals solely as to the Common Law Claims and Contract Claims (the "Opening Brief"). If timely filed in Fairfield Sentry (In Liquidation) et al. v. Citibank NA London, 19-cv-03911 (Lead Case) pursuant to this Paragraph B, the Opening Brief shall be deemed timely filed in all the Appeals. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 9/11/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(ama)
September 9, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Other Affiliate Caisse de dpt et placement du Qubec for Multi-Strategy Fund Limited. Document filed by Multi-Strategy Fund Limited.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB, 1:19-cv-04428-VSB(Lack, Robert)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fairfield Lambda Ltd. (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al.(Molton, David)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting (3) Letter Motion to Consolidate Cases 19-CV-3911 (as Lead Case) in case 1:19-cv-03911-VSB. Accordingly, I ORDER that: The 237 actions listed in rows 2 through 238 of the table contained in Exhibit A (attached hereto), are consolidated with and into Case No. 19-CV-3911 (listed in row 1 of the table contained in Exhibit A). All future motions and other filings shall use the number of the first-filed case, Case No. 19-CV-3911, and the caption listed in this Order. An Order entering the parties' jointly proposed briefing schedule for the consolidated appeals will issue separately. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the Liquidator's motion to consolidate, (Doc. 3), and to consolidate cases listed in Exhibit A with and into Case No. 19-CV-3911. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 8/20/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03911-VSB et al. (rro)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David J. Molton dated August 15, 2019 re: Request for Entry of Consolidated Briefing Schedule. Document filed by Fairfield Lambda Ltd. (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Ltd. (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: List of the 238 related appeals, #2 Exhibit B: Proposed briefing schedule)(Molton, David)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 LETTER MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-03911, 19-cv-04385, 19-cv-04386, 19-cv-04388, 19-cv-04395, 19-cv-04396, 19-cv-04415, 19-cv-04418, 19-cv-04078, 19-cv-04079, 19-cv-04081, 19-cv-04084, 19-cv-04089, 19-cv-04099, 19-cv-04100, 19-cv-04101, 19-cv-04102, 19-cv-04105, 19-cv-04129, 19-cv-04134, 19-cv-04145, 19-cv-04146, 19-cv-04153, 19-cv-04168, 19-cv-04170, 19-cv-04173, 19-cv-04178, 19-cv-04254, 19-cv-04257, 19-cv-04261, 19-cv-04262, 19-cv-04263, 19-cv-04267, 19-cv-04278, 19-cv-04285, 19-cv-04357, 19-cv-04359, 19-cv-04364, 19-cv-04365, 19-cv-04367, 19-cv-04369, 19-cv-04379, 19-cv-04381, 19-cv-04382, 19-cv-04384, 19-cv-04219, 19-cv-04265, 19-cv-04268, 19-cv-04274, 19-cv-04317, 19-cv-04416, 19-cv-04426, 19-cv-04324, 19-cv-04414, 19-cv-04420, 19-cv-04432, 19-cv-04439, 19-cv-04461, 19-cv-04484, 19-cv-04490, 19-cv-04495, 19-cv-04500, 19-cv-04546, 19-cv-04550, 19-cv-04561, 19-cv-04567, 19-cv-04570, 19-cv-04603, 19-cv-04604, 19-cv-04607, 19-cv-04657, 19-cv-04660, 19-cv-04668, 19-cv-04683, 19-cv-04687, 19-cv-04691, 19-cv-04767, 19-cv-04424, 19-cv-04425, 19-cv-04431, 19-cv-04434, 19-cv-04437, 19-cv-04438, 19-cv-04441, 19-cv-04445, 19-cv-04446, 19-cv-04459, 19-cv-04479, 19-cv-04483, 19-cv-04486, 19-cv-04489, 19-cv-04491, 19-cv-04498, 19-cv-04501, 19-cv-04502, 19-cv-04515, 19-cv-04533, 19-cv-04535, 19-cv-04536, 19-cv-04539, 19-cv-04543, 19-cv-04545, 19-cv-04552, 19-cv-04565, 19-cv-04573, 19-cv-04608, 19-cv-04610, 19-cv-04623, 19-cv-04743, 19-cv-04744, 19-cv-04765, 19-cv-04766, 19-cv-04768, 19-cv-04770, 19-cv-04772, 19-cv-04778, 19-cv-04779, 19-cv-04788, 19-cv-04782, 19-cv-04798, 19-cv-04853, 19-cv-04864, 19-cv-04930, 19-cv-04933, 19-cv-04934, 19-cv-04941, 19-cv-04944, 19-cv-04962, 19-cv-04967, 19-cv-04985, 19-cv-04988, 19-cv-04990, 19-cv-04994, 19-cv-05019, 19-cv-05020, 19-cv-05024, 19-cv-05106, 19-cv-05110, 19-cv-05220, 19-cv-04771, 19-cv-04773, 19-cv-04090, 19-cv-04131, 19-cv-04138, 19-cv-04148, 19-cv-04155, 19-cv-04188, 19-cv-04203, 19-cv-04225, 19-cv-04319, 19-cv-04475, 19-cv-04620, 19-cv-04428, 19-cv-04540, 19-cv-04547, 19-cv-04549, 19-cv-04569, 19-cv-04571, 19-cv-04585, 19-cv-04605, 19-cv-04611, 19-cv-04624, 19-cv-04627, 19-cv-05237, 19-cv-05241, 19-cv-04785, 19-cv-04789, 19-cv-04965, 19-cv-05034, 19-cv-05040, 19-cv-05056, 19-cv-05118, 19-cv-05238, 19-cv-05240, 19-cv-05223, 19-cv-04739, 19-cv-04742, 19-cv-04963, 19-cv-04741, 19-cv-05228, 19-cv-04860, 19-cv-04861, 19-cv-04964, 19-cv-04888, 19-cv-04869, 19-cv-05006, 19-cv-04973, 19-cv-04818, 19-cv-04886, 19-cv-04972, 19-cv-04974, 19-cv-04976, 19-cv-04979, 19-cv-04986, 19-cv-04806, 19-cv-04809, 19-cv-04813, 19-cv-04817, 19-cv-04825, 19-cv-04863, 19-cv-05023, 19-cv-04865, 19-cv-04882, 19-cv-04989, 19-cv-04991, 19-cv-04995, 19-cv-04998, 19-cv-05030, 19-cv-05033, 19-cv-05035, 19-cv-05042, 19-cv-05044, 19-cv-05054, 19-cv-05057, 19-cv-05061, 19-cv-05067, 19-cv-05068, 19-cv-05071, 19-cv-05089, 19-cv-05107, 19-cv-05108, 19-cv-05109, 19-cv-05112, 19-cv-05115, 19-cv-05117, 19-cv-05119, 19-cv-05135, 19-cv-05131, 19-cv-05157, 19-cv-05125, 19-cv-05126, 19-cv-05130, 19-cv-05132, 19-cv-05142, 19-cv-05143, 19-cv-05149, 19-cv-05153, 19-cv-05154 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from David J. Molton dated August 15, 2019. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys, Fairfield Sigma Ltd. (In Liquidation), Fairfield Lambda Ltd. (In Liquidation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: List of the 238 related appeals, #2 Exhibit B: List of consenting Defendant-Appellees)(Molton, David)
May 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
May 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated April 2, 2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-3622A, 10-B-13164 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bkar)
May 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
May 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citibank NA London
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/Andbanc Andorra
Represented By: Christopher P. Hall
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/SG Private Banking (Lugano-Svizzera) SA
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Judith Cherwinka
Represented By: Melissa Anne Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hambros Guernsey Nominees
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFG Bank
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mirabaud & Cie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Royal Bank of Canada
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citibank (Switzerland) AG
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/AEB Lux
Represented By: Sharon L. Nelles
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Represented By: Andrew John Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse (Bahamas)
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Inversis SA
Represented By: Craig Vincent Rasile
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Lugano Dublin
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Julius Baer and Co. Ltd., Zurich
Represented By: Virginia I. Weber
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Catalunya Caixa
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Theodoor GGC Amsterdam
Represented By: Robert Anthony Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SG Hambros Nominees (Jersey)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS Mizrahi Tefahot Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Kent A. Yalowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas Securities Nominees Ltd.
Represented By: Thomas S Kessler
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CDC ICM the GHOS Portfolio
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PFPC Bank Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Nowell D. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/NBK Kuwait
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Quasar Funds SPC
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Represented By: Norris David Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/HSBC Guyerzeller Zurich
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Private Bank (Guernsey) Ltd.
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Atlantico (Bahamas)
Represented By: Richard Gerard Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABN AMRO Schweiz AG
Represented By: Christopher H. Harris
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dexia BIL
Represented By: Rijie Ernie Gao
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Hapoalim (Suisse) Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/Banque Degroof Bruxelles
Represented By: Gary John Mennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Six Sis AG
Represented By: Andreas Albert Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/HSBC Private Banking Nom
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SNS Global Custody B.V.
Represented By: Andrea J. Robinson
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SG Hambros Bank (Channel Islands) Limited- Guernsey
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Natixis
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kiangsu Chekiang and Shanghai Residents (H.K.) Association
Represented By: Dwight Yellen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dreadnought Finance OY
Represented By: Jyotin Hamid
Represented By: Sandy Diana Tomasik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BSI Ex Banca Del Gottardo
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Arner SA
Represented By: Christopher P. Hall
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UMR
Represented By: Sara Christin Temes
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DGAM Alternative Strategy Fund II, SPC - Cell A
Represented By: Christopher Mario Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fortis Bank Nederland NV
Represented By: Christopher H. Harris
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Strategy Sicav Edpaf
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BBVA (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFG Private Bank SA
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blush Nominees, LLC
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/CBESSA
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Compagnie Bancaire Espiritu Santo SA
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICM Tactical Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Cathay Life Insurance Co. LTD.
Represented By: Susan Florence Balaschak
Represented By: David W Parham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Centre France Alpha Prot Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bipielle Banke (Suisse)
Represented By: James Robert Warnot, Jr
Represented By: Brenda Diane DiLuigi
Represented By: Katherine Zupan Machan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FCP-BE CAEN
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Zurich
Represented By: Alan Borden Vickery
Represented By: Jack G. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Republic Bank
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BankMed (Suisse) S.A.
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS AG New York
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Zurich Capital Markets Company
Represented By: Alan Borden Vickery
Represented By: Jack G. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SG Hambros Bank
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GE Life S Pore Li Inv Fd Par Slam (FI)
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Investec Bank (Switzerland) AG
Represented By: Barry Mark Kazan
Represented By: Emily Joy Mathieu
Represented By: Tammy Phyllis Bieber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BBVA Grand Cayman
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CPR Online
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Itau International
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Shareholders Fund - SCMS
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Sarasin & Cie AG
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Andrew John Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BSI AG
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Andorra Banc Agricol Reig SA
Represented By: Christopher P. Hall
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Avalon Absolute Return Funds PLC
Represented By: Daphne T Ha
Represented By: Gary John Mennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/GSCO London
Represented By: D. Nicole Dhir
Represented By: Daniel Hershel Tabak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sciens CFO 1 Feeder Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Ralph A. Siciliano
Represented By: Richard Walker Trotter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Societe Generale Bank & Trust (Luxembourg)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Hapoalim Switzerland Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BP Alpha S.A.
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney Bonteque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Naidot & Co.
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABN AMRO Retained Nominees (IOM) Limited
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Eduardo Fernandez de Valderrama Murillo
Represented By: Andrew B. Zinman
Represented By: Steven Barry Eichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ING Bank (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Virginia I. Weber
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bordier & Cie
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citibank
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Trust (Schweiz) AG
Represented By: Rijie Ernie Gao
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hyperiod (HD) Limited
Represented By: Joshua Eli Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Natixis Private Banking International SA
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Martin Lavarello
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney Bonteque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Privata Edmond de Rothschild Lugano S.A.
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fortis Global Custody Services NV
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Seoul Branch, Ltd.
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fortis Bank SA/NV
Represented By: Thomas S Kessler
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Al Nahysan Mansour Zayed
Represented By: George Michael Chalos
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque SCS Alliance SA
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Centrum Bank AG (AMS)
Represented By: David M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Parson Finance Panama SA
Represented By: Douglas A. Kellner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liongate Multistrategy Fund SEG Portfolio
Represented By: Eric M. Kay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kefong Lee
Represented By: Martin Mushkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CDC IXIS Capital Markets North America Inc.
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/BK Hapoalim/B M Tel Aviv
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse Gibraltar Limited
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Dexia Investor Service Julius Baer Sicav
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Delta S.P.A.
Represented By: Daphne T Ha
Represented By: Gary John Mennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/Bank Leumi Israel
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hontai Life Insurance Company Limited
Represented By: Jonathan Chi-Shoong Cho
Represented By: Laura Rose Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS Stichting Stroeve Global Custody
Represented By: Robert Anthony Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Abu Dhabi Investment Authority
Represented By: Marc Laurence Greenwald
Represented By: Eric M. Kay
Represented By: Peter E. Calamari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Capital Markets Corporation
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ZCM Asset Holding Company (Bermuda) Ltd.
Represented By: Alan Borden Vickery
Represented By: Jack G. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Murdoch & Co.
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caixa DEstalvis de Catalunya
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse AG Zurich
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Ex Fortis
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Unicorp Bank & Trust Limited
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco ITAU Europa Luxembourg
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arden International Capital Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Weitman
Represented By: M. William Munno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS Jersey Nominees
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Hyperion Alternative Basket II Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Private
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIS Seeganintersettle
Represented By: Andreas Albert Frischknecht
Represented By: Erin Elaine Valentine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Societe Generale Bank & Trust S.A. (Luxembourg)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Commerciale Lugano
Represented By: L Andrew Stern Riccio
Represented By: Charles Bart Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG
Represented By: Stacey Jill Rappaport
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Atlantique Alpha Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Degroof Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: Daphne T Ha
Represented By: Gary John Mennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/Swedclient/IAM
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Merrill Lynch Bank (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Wegelin & Company
Represented By: Anne Elizabeth Railton
Represented By: Gregory Warren Fox
Represented By: Valerie A Haggans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barclays Private Bank & Trust (Channel Islands) Limited
Represented By: Andrew M. Harris
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Dominion Securities
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nadine Pavlovsky
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney Bonteque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Bank AG
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Lyonnais SA
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Safra National Bank of New York
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Andrew John Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Societe Europeenne de Banque S.A.
Represented By: Andrew Ditchfield
Represented By: Elliot Moskowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CAIS Bank
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Multi-Strategy Fund Limited
Represented By: Robert Joel Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Institutional Trust Services (Asia) Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Piguet & Cie S.A.
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GE Brunei Life Ins FD Lion Capital Balanced (330008)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Bank Bermuda Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fund Nominees Limited
Represented By: L Andrew Stern Riccio
Represented By: Jacob Max Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Luisa M. Strina
Represented By: Andrew B. Zinman
Represented By: Steven Barry Eichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BCV AMC Defensive Al Fund
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clarks Fork Foundation
Represented By: Joshua Alan Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barfield Nominees Limited
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS Fund Services (Cayman) Limited
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kasbank Effecten Bewaarbedrijf N.V.
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Private Bank (C.I.) Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Chelsea Trust Company Limited
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC International Trustee Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Represented By: Evan A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS Oddo & Cie
Represented By: Victor P. Muskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFG Bank AG and
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PKB Privatbank AG
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Agricole Titres
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Meritz Fire & Marine Insurance Company Ltd.
Represented By: Seong Hwan Kim
Represented By: Michael T. Driscoll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank AG Singapore
Represented By: Alan Kolod
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney Bonteque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Legacy Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Gerard DiConza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GE Brunei Life Ins Fd Slam Balanced
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dexia World Alternative
Represented By: Jeffrey Steven Margolin
Represented By: Christopher K. Kiplok
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fairfield Investment GCI
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Santander (Suisse) S.A.
Represented By: Richard Beryl Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of Ireland Nominees Limited
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SNS Bank N.V.
Represented By: Andrea J. Robinson
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Life Ins Fund-Par (FI)-Lion Capital-SCND
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: National Bank of Kuwait
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Itau Europa Luxembourg S.A.
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pleasant T. Rowland Foundation Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Alan Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Kredietbank SA Luxembourgeoise
Represented By: Robert Anthony Rich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Schroders Italy SIM SPA
Represented By: Martin Jonathan Crisp
Represented By: Robert Steven Fischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caceis Bank EX IXIS IS
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank Nominees (Jersey) Limited
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Alan Kolod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DGAM Asset Allocation Fund L.P.
Represented By: Christopher Mario Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fortis Bank (Nederland) N.V.
Represented By: Christopher H. Harris
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fidessa Alpha Fund
Represented By: Gary John Mennitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/ING Lux
Represented By: Rijie Ernie Gao
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Blubank Ltd.
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/GSCO New York
Represented By: D. Nicole Dhir
Represented By: Daniel Hershel Tabak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Alok Sama
Represented By: Philip Ransom Schatz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Atlantic Security Bank
Represented By: Scott B. Schreiber
Represented By: Anthony D Boccanfuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC Securities (Panama) SA
Represented By: Thomas J. Maloney
Represented By: Evan A. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/NBP Titres
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dresdner Bank Schweiz
Represented By: Stacey Jill Rappaport
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Andorra/Crediinvest
Represented By: Richard Beryl Levin
Represented By: Carl Nicholas Wedoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank of America National Trust and Savings Association
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Syz & Co. SA
Represented By: Richard Beryl Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lloyds TSB Bank Geneva
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Royal Bank of Canada (Suisse)
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Palmares Europlus
Represented By: Sara Christin Temes
Represented By: Stephen Andrew Donato
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Finter Bank Zurich
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Profilo SPA
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSH Nordbank Securities S.A.
Represented By: David Matthew Schlecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BP Alpha
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Jessica Renee Kenney Bonteque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Hyperion Alternative Basket Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fondo Hunter
Represented By: Elise Scherr Frejka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verwaltungs und Privat - Bank AG Aktiengesellschaft (AMS)
Represented By: David M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Mirabaud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Lyonnais Miami
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FIF Advanced Ltd.
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lion Global Investors
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Morgan Stanley SA
Represented By: James Herron Bicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/Israel Discount Bank, Limited, Tel Aviv
Represented By: Daniel Bernstein
Represented By: Anthony D Boccanfuso
Represented By: Kent A. Yalowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Commercial Bank of Kuwait
Represented By: John A Pintarelli
Represented By: Erica Jean Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: First Gulf Bank
Represented By: George Michael Chalos
Represented By: Briton Paul Sparkman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS Zurich
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fairfield Investment Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Julius Baer and Co. SA
Represented By: Virginia I. Weber
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Schroder & Co. Bank AG
Represented By: Martin Jonathan Crisp
Represented By: Robert Steven Fischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche bank (Suisse) SA Geneve
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Alan Kolod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Public Bank Nominees Limited
Represented By: Alex Rafael Rovira
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Private Space Ltd.
Represented By: Michael C. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Graziela Strina de Toledo Arruda
Represented By: Andrew B. Zinman
Represented By: Steven Barry Eichel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clearstream
Represented By: Joshua Dorchak
Represented By: John Michael Vassos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harmony Capital Fund Ltd
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Woori Bank
Represented By: Jacob Max Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Privee Edmond de Rothschild (Europe)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citibank Korea Inc.
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Somers Nominees (Far East) Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dexia Private Bank (Switzerland)
Represented By: Rijie Ernie Gao
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Perenco SA
Represented By: Martin Jonathan Crisp
Represented By: Robert Steven Fischler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS Fund Services (Cayman) Limited REF Greenlake Arbitrage Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: CDC IXIS
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hinduja Bank (Switzerland) SA
Represented By: L Andrew Stern Riccio
Represented By: Charles Bart Cummings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fox & Co.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lombardi Properties Limited
Represented By: Peter D. Morgenstern
Represented By: Joshua Eli Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS/BBVA Miami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vorarlberger Landes UND Hypothekenbank Aktiengesellschaft
Represented By: Stephen M. Harnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: T1 Global Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher A. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ihag Handelsbank AG
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Incore Bank AG
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Represented By: Andrew Mark Troop
Represented By: Samuel S. Cavior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: IPCM
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PFPC International Bank Limited
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Rosenthal
Represented By: Nowell D. Bamberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Republic Nominees Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Arden International Capital Limited
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Weitman
Represented By: M. William Munno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Nominees (IOM) Limited
Represented By: Diarra Mari Guthrie
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: AAAM
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Weitman
Represented By: M. William Munno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FS
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barclays Bank SA Madrid
Represented By: Andrew M. Harris
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Neue Bank AG
Represented By: William M. Brodsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Barclays Bank (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Benjamin James Oliver Lewis
Represented By: Andrew M. Harris
Represented By: Marc Joel Gottridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SG Hambros Nominees
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Edmond de Rothschild (Suisse) S.A.
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque de Luxembourg
Represented By: Michael Aaron Klein
Represented By: Ian Ross Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caliber Investments Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Zeb Landsman
Represented By: Jordan E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Nomura International PLC
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Simgest SpA
Represented By: Diane Lee McGimsey
Represented By: Andrew John Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: DGAM Alternative Strategy Fund II, SPC - Cell B
Represented By: Christopher Mario Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hansard Europe Limited
Represented By: James Robert Warnot, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Sis SegaInterSettle AG
Represented By: Andreas Albert Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse AG
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Investor Services Bank SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Pamela Addison Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deutsche Bank (Cayman)
Represented By: Mark Nelson Parry
Represented By: Alan Kolod
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SCND Life Ins Fund Par FI Slam
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Melrose Investments Ltd.
Represented By: Michael Zeb Landsman
Represented By: Jordan E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Citigroup Global Markets Limited
Represented By: Eva Pascale Smith Bibi
Represented By: Carmine D. Boccuzzi, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Hambros
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Inversis Net
Represented By: Craig Vincent Rasile
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBS Coutts Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Cote D'Armor Alpha Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Ethias Allocation Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banco Bilbao Vizcaya Argentaria (Portugal) S.A.
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Cantonale Vaudoise
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Christopher Allegaert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Tayleigh Trust Company Limited
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bie Bank & Trust Bahamas Ltd.
Represented By: Randall Lewis Martin
Represented By: Richard Franklin Schwed
Represented By: Brian Howard Polovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Virginia I. Weber
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Havilland S.A.
Represented By: James Robert Warnot, Jr
Represented By: Brenda Diane DiLuigi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: KWI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Gates Charitable Trust
Represented By: Elise Scherr Frejka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Millenium Multi-Strategy Fund
Represented By: William P Weintraub
Represented By: Gregory Warren Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Deltec Bank & Trust Limited
Represented By: Ellen Margaret Halstead
Represented By: Howard Robert Hawkins, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ICIB Natexis Lux Alpha Master
Represented By: James Rocco Serritella
Represented By: Joseph Cioffi
Represented By: Bruce Martin Ginsberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: GE Life
Represented By: Gregg M Mashberg
Represented By: Russell T. Gorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance