United States of America v. $10,000,000 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: $10,000,000 in United States Currency
Case Number: 1:2019cv03978
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:981
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Anthony Pellegrino. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $10,000,000 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pellegrino, Louis)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Anthony Pellegrino to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; the PDF caption must identify the party role for listed parties (i.e. Plaintiff v. Defendant/Defendant-in-rem). Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. If the deficiency/deficiencies are not corrected within five (5) days per Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131 this case will be administratively closed. Initial Pleading due by 5/13/2019. (jgo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Pellegrino, Louis)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE against $10,000,000 in United States Currency.Document filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Pellegrino, Louis) Modified on 5/6/2019 (jgo).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $10,000,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $10,000,000 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Louis Anthony Pellegrino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?