In Re Nokia Corporation Securities Litigation
Plaintiff: J. Phillip Max
Defendant: Nokia Corporation, Timo Ihamuotila, Kristian Pullola and Rajeev Suri
Petitioner: Soui Ying Ling, Wei Ming Lin and Clyde W. Waite
Case Number: 1:2019cv03982
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of OF NON-OPPOSITION BY TANNER TOM TO COMPETING MOTIONS FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF, AND APPROVAL OF LEAD COUNSEL re: (5 in 1:19-cv-03509-ALC, 5 in 1:19-cv-03509-ALC, 5 in 1:19-cv-03509-ALC) MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Appoint Tanner Tom to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Consolidate Cases No. 1:19-cv-03509-ALC and No. 1:19-cv-03982-UA .. Document filed by Tanner Tom. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03509-ALC, 1:19-cv-03982-UA(Portnoy, Lesley)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED ACTIONS AND REQUESTING A JOINT STATUS REPORT: Before the Court are four (4) Motions seeking to appoint lead counsel, appoint leadplaintiff(s), and consolidate cases 19-cv-3509 (ALC) and 19-cv-3982 (ALC). ECF Nos. 5, 8, 12, 14. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, the above- captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all purposes into one action. These actions shall be referred to herein as the "Consolidated Action." This Order shall apply to the Consolidated Action and to each case that is subsequently filed in this Court that relates to the same subject matter as in the Consolidated Action. Every pleading in this Consolidated Action shall bear the following caption THIS DOCUMENT RELATES TO: IN RE NOKIA CORPORATION SECURITIES LITIGATION. When the document being filed pertains to all actions, the phrase "All Actions" shall appear immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:". When the document applies to some, but not all, of the actions, the document shall list, immediately after the phrase "This Document Relates To:", the docket number for each individual action to which the document applies, along with the name of the first-listed plaintiff in said action. The Court requests assistance of counsel in calling to the attention of the Clerk of the Court the filing or transfer of any case which might not properly be consolidated as part of this Consolidated Action. It is further ORDERED that a Master Docket and Master File shall be established for the Consolidated Action. The Master File shall be No. 1:19-cv-3509-ALC. All orders, pleadings, motions and other documents shall, when filed and docketed in the Master File, be deemed filed and docketed in each individual case to the extent applicable. When an order, pleading, motion, or document is filed with a caption indicating that it is applicable to fewer than all individual actions in the Consolidated Action, the Clerk shall file such pleadings in the Master File and note such pleadings in the Master Docket and in the docket of each action referenced. Any Party objecting to consolidation must file an application for relief from this Order within ten (10) days of the date on which a copy of this Order is mailed to the Party's counsel. This Order is entered without prejudice to the rights of any Party to apply for severance of any claim or action, upon a showing of good cause. Regarding the multiple Motions to appoint lead counsel and lead plaintiff(s), the Parties are hereby ORDERED to confer amongst each other and provide the Court with a Joint Status Report on or before July 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 6/27/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-03509-ALC, 1:19-cv-03982-UA(rj)
June 27, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:19-cv-03509-ALC.. (rj)
June 25, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Non-Opposition to Competing Lead Plaintiff Motions. Document filed by Wei Ming Lin, Soui Ying Ling. (Gonnello, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 DECLARATION of David A. Rosenfeld in Support re: #20 MOTION to Appoint HONORABLE CLYDE W. WAITE (RET.), INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FBO ESTATE OF LILLIAN DUNN U/A 03/01/2015 to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-3509 .. Document filed by Clyde W. Waite. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Press Release, #2 Exhibit B - Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit D - Firm Resume)(Rosenfeld, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #20 MOTION to Appoint HONORABLE CLYDE W. WAITE (RET.), INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FBO ESTATE OF LILLIAN DUNN U/A 03/01/2015 to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-3509 . . Document filed by Clyde W. Waite. (Rosenfeld, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Appoint HONORABLE CLYDE W. WAITE (RET.), INDIVIDUALLY AND AS TRUSTEE FBO ESTATE OF LILLIAN DUNN U/A 03/01/2015 to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel ., MOTION to Consolidate Cases 19-cv-3509 . Document filed by Clyde W. Waite. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rosenfeld, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Wei Ming Lin, Soui Ying Ling. Related Document Number: #16 . (Gonnello, Richard) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 18, 2019 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Richard W. Gonnello in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Wei Ming Lin and Soui Ying Ling to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel .. Document filed by Wei Ming Lin, Soui Ying Ling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - PSLRA Notice, #2 Exhibit B - PSLRA Certification, #3 Exhibit C - Loss Calculation, #4 Exhibit D - Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP Firm Resume)(Gonnello, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #16 MOTION to Appoint Wei Ming Lin and Soui Ying Ling to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Wei Ming Lin, Soui Ying Ling. (Gonnello, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appoint Wei Ming Lin and Soui Ying Ling to serve as lead plaintiff(s) ., MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Wei Ming Lin, Soui Ying Ling.(Gonnello, Richard)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and among the undersigned counsel for the parties, that: 1 Defendant Nokia Corporation accepts service of the complaint in the above-referenced action as of the date hereof. 2. Lead plaintiff appointed pursuant to the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, 15 U.S.C. 78u-4 ("Lead Plaintiff") will file any consolidated amended complaint within 60 days of the order appointing Lead Plaintiff. 3. No defendant shall have an obligation to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint until at least 60 days after the filing of a consolidated amended complaint by Lead Plaintiff. Except as set forth in paragraph 1, all defenses, including with respect to personal jurisdiction and service, are preserved by all parties. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 5/30/2019) (anc)
May 30, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Susan L. Saltzstein dated May 30, 2019 re: Time to Respond to the Complaint. Document filed by Nokia Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order)(Saltzstein, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Nokia Corporation.(Saltzstein, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey S. Geier on behalf of Nokia Corporation. (Geier, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Susan Leslie Saltzstein on behalf of Nokia Corporation. (Saltzstein, Susan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jay B. Kasner on behalf of Nokia Corporation. (Kasner, Jay)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Timo Ihamuotila, Nokia Corporation, Kristian Pullola, Rajeev Suri. (dnh)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Alexander Hood, II on behalf of J. Phillip Max. (Hood, Joseph)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokia Corporation, Rajeev Suri, Kristian Pullola, and Timo Ihamuotila, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J. Phillip Max. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): second party name on the PDF 'To' section must include 'care of c/o' or 'via';. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 6, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. as possibly related to 19-cv-3509. (jgo)
May 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeremy Alan Lieberman. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: J. Phillip Max; Nokia Corporation; Rajeev Suri; Kristian Pullola; Timo Ihamuotila. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text contained a typographical error; party text was removed. (jgo)
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-CV-03509-ALC. Document filed by J. Phillip Max.(Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by J. Phillip Max.(Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jonathan David Lindenfeld on behalf of J. Phillip Max. (Lindenfeld, Jonathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nokia Corporation, Rajeev Suri, Kristian Pullola, and Timo Ihamuotila, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by J. Phillip Max. (Lieberman, Jeremy) Modified on 5/6/2019 (jgo).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lieberman, Jeremy)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Timo Ihamuotila, Nokia Corporation, Kristian Pullola, Rajeev Suri. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16815875)Document filed by J. Phillip Max. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Schedule A)(Lieberman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re Nokia Corporation Securities Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nokia Corporation
Represented By: Susan Leslie Saltzstein
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Geier
Represented By: Jay B. Kasner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timo Ihamuotila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristian Pullola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajeev Suri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Phillip Max
Represented By: Jonathan David Lindenfeld
Represented By: Jeremy Alan Lieberman
Represented By: Joseph Alexander Hood, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Soui Ying Ling
Represented By: Richard William Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wei Ming Lin
Represented By: Richard William Gonnello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clyde W. Waite
Represented By: David Avi Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?