Peralta v. Suter, Jr. et al

Plaintiff: Freddy Peralta
Defendant: Robert J. Suter, Jr. and Quality Carriers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03993
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Discovery pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) shall be exchanged by 7/15/2019. Amended Pleadings due by 9/9/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/9/2019. Deposition due by 10/9/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Discovery due by 1/9/2020. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/20/2020. The parties may at any time consent to have this case tried before the assigned Magistrate Judge pursant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/1/2019) (mml)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Conference cancelled. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/1/2019) (mml)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File for the Approval of Revised Civil Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Farid Ahmed dated 06/28/2019. Document filed by Freddy Peralta.(Ahmed, Farid)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/9/2019) (rro)
May 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
May 9, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Adam Segal. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
May 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Quality Carriers, Inc..(Segal, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Segal, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Bronx. Case Number: 34389/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16818075).Document filed by Quality Carriers, Inc., Robert J. Suter, Jr.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit A- Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Medical Records)(Segal, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peralta v. Suter, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freddy Peralta
Represented By: Farid Ahmed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Suter, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Carriers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Adam Segal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?