Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd. et al v. Danmar Lines, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd., Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd., Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd., Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd., Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch, Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd., Taian Insurance Co. Ltd., Qisda America Corp., South China Insurance Co. Ltd., First Insurance Co. Ltd. and Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd
Defendant: Danmar Lines, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03998
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333ad
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Nathan T. Williams dated May 20, 2019 re: Plaintiffs Letter Request to File Corrected Complaint. Document filed by Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd., Qisda America Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Subrogation Receipt, #2 Exhibit Proposed Corrected Complaint)(Williams, Nathan)
May 6, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 6, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 6, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nathan Thomas Williams. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (sj)
May 6, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Nathan Thomas Williams. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: First Insurance Co. Ltd.; Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd.; Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd; Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd.; South China Insurance Co. Ltd.; Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch; Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd.; Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.; Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd.. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
May 3, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Qisda Corporation for Qisda America Corp.. Document filed by Qisda America Corp..(Williams, Nathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - TENTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Taian Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - NINTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Mega Financial Holding Co. Ltd. for Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - EIGHTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CHUBB for Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch. Document filed by Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch.(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - SEVENTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Hua Nan Financial Holdings Co. Ltd. for South China Insurance Co. Ltd.. Document filed by South China Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - SIXTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - FIFTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Cathay Financial Holding Co. Ltd. for Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd.(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - FOURTH RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by First Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - THIRD RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR - SECOND RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MS&AD Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (lb).
May 3, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Fubon Financial Holding Co., Ltd for Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd.. Document filed by Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - FILER ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danmar Lines Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd, Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd., First Insurance Co. Ltd., Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd., Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch, Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd., Qisda America Corp., Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd., South China Insurance Co. Ltd., Taian Insurance Co. Ltd., Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd.. (Williams, Nathan) Modified on 5/6/2019 (sj).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Williams, Nathan)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Danmar Lines, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16818371)Document filed by South China Insurance Co. Ltd., First Insurance Co. Ltd., Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd, Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd., Taian Insurance Co. Ltd., Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd., Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd., Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd., Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch, Qisda America Corp., Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd..(Williams, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd. et al v. Danmar Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fubon Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taiwan Fire & Marine Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Msig Mingtai Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shinkong Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Insurance Company of North America Taipei Branch
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chung Kuo Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taian Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qisda America Corp.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South China Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Insurance Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathay Century Insurance Co. Ltd
Represented By: Nathan Thomas Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danmar Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?