Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG v. Maersk Line A/S
Plaintiff: Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG
Defendant: MAERSK LINE A/S
Case Number: 1:2019cv04014
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Maersk Line A/S. Document filed by Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Casey, Martin)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/20/2019) (cf)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maersk Line A/S. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Martin F Casey. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Maersk Line A/S. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Maersk Line A/S d/b/a Maersk Line, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG. (Casey, Martin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG.(Casey, Martin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Casey, Martin)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MAERSK LINE A/S. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16824910)Document filed by Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG.(Casey, Martin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG v. Maersk Line A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolfes & von Etzdorf Assecuranzbureau OHG
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAERSK LINE A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?