Blackwell v. The Phia Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Blackwell
Defendant: The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04031
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Charles Kannebecker, Esq. dated June 24, 2019 re: Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document filed by Kevin Blackwell.(Kannebecker, Charles)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction . Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/23/2019 Return Date set for 8/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Chris Aguiar, #2 Exhibit Aguiar Dec. Ex. 1, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Bruce Buchanan, #4 Exhibit Buchanan Ex. 1, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Ron Peck, #6 Exhibit Peck Ex. 1, #7 Exhibit Peck Ex. 2, #8 Exhibit Peck Ex. 3, #9 Affidavit Declaration of Ryan Woody, #10 Exhibit Woody Ex. 1, #11 Exhibit Memorandum of Law, #12 Affidavit Affidavit of service)(Luz, Thomas)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Thomas J. Luz dated June 24, 2019 re: Response to Kannebecker. Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC.(Luz, Thomas)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Attorney Charles Kannebecker dated 06/14/2019 re: Permission to File Partial MSJ. Document filed by Kevin Blackwell.(Kannebecker, Charles)
June 11, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 6/25/2019. Responses due by 7/23/2019 Replies due by 8/6/2019. (rro)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; denying #12 Motion for Entry of Default; terminating #16 Letter Motion for Conference. Per this Court's Individual Rule II(B) (1), Motions made in lieu of an Answer do not require a pre-motion conference. Defendants' request to file a Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED according to the following briefing schedule: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss due on June 25, 2019; Plaintiff's Opposition due on July 23, 2019; Defendants' Reply due on August 6, 2019. Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendants The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation (ECF No. 12) is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to terminate docket numbers 8, 12, and 16. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 6/11/2019) (rro)
June 11, 2019 Filing 17 SECOND MOTION for Entry of Default as to The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation . Document filed by Kevin Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Request for Entry of Default, #2 Affidavit of Charles Kannebecker, Esq., #3 Proposed Order, #4 Entry of Default, #5 Certificate of Service)(Kannebecker, Charles)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Conference addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Thomas J. Luz dated June 4, 2019. Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC.(Luz, Thomas)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation . . Document filed by Kevin Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(Kannebecker, Charles)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re: #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation . . Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (Woody, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ryan L. Woody on behalf of INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (Woody, Ryan)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation . Document filed by Kevin Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Proposed Entry of Default, #3 Certificate of Service)(Kannebecker, Charles)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADMITTING RYAN L. WOODY PRO HAC VICE: granting #10 Motion for Ryan L. Woody to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED.(Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/30/2019) (ama)
May 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
May 28, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
May 28, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:17-cv-08230 and declined by Judge Lorna G. Schofield and returned to wheel for assignment. (bcu)
May 24, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #10 MOTION for Ryan L. Woody to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16952395. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Ryan L. Woody to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16952395. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Good Standing Certificate, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Affidavit of service)(Luz, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC.(Luz, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File motion to dismiss addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Thomas J. Luz dated May 24, 2019. Document filed by INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC.(Luz, Thomas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas John Luz on behalf of INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (Luz, Thomas)
May 7, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kannebecker, Charles)
May 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Lorna G. Schofield as possibly related to 17cv8230. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (pc)
May 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Charles Thomas Kannebecker to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Multiple natures of suit were selected. Choose one. (pc)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Charles Thomas Kannebecker. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 2 (Citizen of Another State); Arbitration code e (Exempt); County code Orange;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 5 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-Other State); the Arbitration code has been deleted; the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Charles Thomas Kannebecker. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Kevin Blackwell. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Phia Group, LLC and INDECS Corporation, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kevin Blackwell. (Kannebecker, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 17-cv-8230 (LGS). Document filed by Kevin Blackwell.(Kannebecker, Charles)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kannebecker, Charles) Modified on 5/7/2019 (pc).
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INDECS Corporation, The Phia Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16827640)Document filed by Kevin Blackwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Kannebecker, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blackwell v. The Phia Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Phia Group, LLC
Represented By: Thomas John Luz
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INDECS Corporation
Represented By: Thomas John Luz
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Blackwell
Represented By: Charles Thomas Kannebecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?