Dello Russo v. AETNA Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Laura Dello Russo
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company and AETNA Health Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04086
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/12/2019) (mro)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #5 Proposed Stipulation and Order filed by AETNA Life Insurance Company, AETNA Health Inc. ENDORSEMENT: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/3/2019) (mml)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER: ORDERED that Defendants' time to reply, plead, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended until July 8, 2019. SO ORDERED. AETNA Health Inc. answer due 7/8/2019; AETNA Life Insurance Company answer due 7/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/3/2019) (mml)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Patricia Ann Lee on behalf of AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Lee, Patricia)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. AETNA Health Inc. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service was accepted by Brian Knighton, Legal Compliance. Document filed by Laura Dello Russo. (Simon, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. AETNA Life Insurance Company served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/6/2019. Service was accepted by Brian Knighton, Legal Compliance. Document filed by Laura Dello Russo. (Simon, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence to Judge) (Lee, Patricia)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Simon, David)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Life Insurance Company. (pc)
May 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Simon. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 5 (Loal Question); Dollar Demand $117,510,000;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 3 (Federal Question); the Dollar Demand has been modified to blank;. (pc)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney David Simon. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Health Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Laura Dello Russo. (Simon, David)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AETNA Health Inc., AETNA Life Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16836506)Document filed by Laura Dello Russo.(Simon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dello Russo v. AETNA Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Patricia Ann Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AETNA Health Inc.
Represented By: Patricia Ann Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Dello Russo
Represented By: David Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?