Moore v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Tyrone Ray Moore
Defendant: United States of America
Petitioner: Tyrone Moore
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04112
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order 60 Days Amended Complaint (case opening), to Tyrone Ray Moore ID No. 43800-037 F.C.I. - Butner 2 P.O. Box 1500 Butner, NC 27509. (aea)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO AMEND: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Movant, and note service on the docket. Movant is directed to file an amended motion under 28 U.S.C. 2255 that complies with Rule 2. The amended motion must be submitted to this Court's Pro Se Intake Unit within sixty days of the date of this order, be captioned as an "Amended Motion," and bear the docket number 19-CV-4112 (LAP). An Amended Motion Under 28 U.S.C. 2255 form is attached to this order. If Movant fails to comply with this order within the time allowed, and cannot show good cause to excuse such failure, the motion will be denied. Because Movant has not at this time made a substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 5/9/2019) (jwh) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 9, 2019 Form Request Mailed: Request for Docket Sheet from Tyrone Ray Moore, ID No. 43800-037, F.C.I. - Butner 2, P.O. Box 1500, Butner, NC 27509 mailed on 5/9/2019. (bwa)
May 7, 2019 Request for Copy of the updated Docket Sheet Received: Re #2 Letter. Request for Docket Report, from Tyrone Moore received on 5/7/19. Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 LETTER from Tyrone Moore, dated 4/19/19 re: Petitioner requests that the Court notify him as to whether it received his 28:2255 motion in the mail. Document filed by Tyrone Ray Moore.(sc)
May 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sac)
May 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sac)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (28 U.S.C. 2255). NO FURTHER ENTRIES. PLEASE SEE CRIMINAL CASE: 1:16-cr-00167-LAP-12. Document filed by Tyrone Ray Moore. (sac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tyrone Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyrone Ray Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?