Flores v. Wilson
Plaintiff: Gerardo Flores
Defendant: Jennifer R Wilson
Case Number: 1:2019cv04154
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441pr
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/2/2019.(mf)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that this case is referred for mediation to the Court-annexed Mediation Program. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation and are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. The mediation will have no effect upon any scheduling Order issued by this Court without leave of this Court. SO ORDERED. ALL ISSUES ARE ELIGIBLE. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/8/2019. Mediator Expertise Request due by 7/1/2019. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/26/2019) (ama) Transmission to Mediation Clerk for processing.
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order is submitted by the parties in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f)(3). All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). Motions due by 7/26/2019. Deposition due by 11/8/2019. All Fact Discovery due by 9/27/2019. All Expert Discovery due by 11/8/2019. This case is to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred, and the present best estimate of the length of trial is 5 days. The next Pretrial Conference set for 10/2/2019 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/26/2019) (ama)
June 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jesse M. Furman: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/26/2019. Philip Agiletti present for Plaintiff. Robert Varga present for Defendant. (ab)
June 21, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER addressed to Judge Jesse M. Furman from Robert Varga dated June 21, 2019 re: Joint Statement. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson.(Varga, Robert)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Philip Martin Aglietti on behalf of Gerardo Flores. (Aglietti, Philip)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Individual Rules, Civil Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order, Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference, Order and Affidavit served on GERARDO FLORES on June 6, 2019. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order, dated June 7, 2019 served on GERARDO FLORES on June 7, 2019. Service was made by EMAIL. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Scheduling Order, dated June 7, 2019 served on GERARDO FLORES on June 7, 2019. Service was made by FEDEX Overnight. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for June 12, 2019 is ADJOURNED to June 26, 2019 at 2:45 p.m. The parties are reminded, again, that they are required to submit a joint letter addressing certain topics and a proposed case management plan no later than the Thursday prior to that conference - a deadline that they failed to meet this time around. See Docket No. 3, at 1-2. The Court declines to impose sanctions this time, but may revisit the issue if counsel fail to stay properly apprised of, or fail to comply with, the Court's orders. Counsel for Defendant is directed to serve a copy of this Order on counsel for Plaintiff by email and overnight courier immediately and to file proof of such service. Initial Conference set for 6/26/2019 at 02:45 PM before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/7/2019) (kgo)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND ORDER served on GERARDO FLORES on 6/6/19. Service was made by FEDEX. Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Varga on behalf of Jennifer R Wilson. (Varga, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: It is therefore ORDERED that no later than June 5, 2019, counsel for Defendant shall serve a copy of the Court's May 9, 2019 Order and a copy of this Order on counsel for Plaintiff and file proof of such service on the docket, or face sanctions. If counsel for Defendant believes that counsel for Plaintiff has already received service or notice of the Court's May 9, 2019 Order, she shall inform the Court in a letter filed on ECF that also includes (1) proof of service of this Order and (2) a statement of whether the parties are prepared to proceed with the initial pretrial conference on June 12, 2019, including by filing a joint letter addressing certain topics by June 6, 2019. See Docket No. 3, at 1-2. Counsel for Plaintiff shall file a notice of appearance on ECF within one business day of receipt of this Order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 6/3/2019) (jca)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1105, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jesse M. Furman. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/9/2019) (ne)
May 9, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Bonnie Lynn Fisher. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fisher, Bonnie)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme, County of Bronx. Case Number: 31094/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16847122).Document filed by Jennifer R Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Jennifer R. Wilson, #3 Exhibit Bill of Particulars and Responses to Combined Demands, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Answer and Demands and all other pleadings)(Fisher, Bonnie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer R Wilson
Represented By: Bonnie Lynn Fisher
Represented By: Robert Varga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerardo Flores
Represented By: Philip Martin Aglietti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?