Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Menendez

Plaintiff: Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Defendant: Joshua Menendez
Case Number: 1:2019cv04161
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201dj
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Menendez. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua Menendez, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. (Dixon, Jeanette)
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
May 13, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-11895-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
May 9, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Denise L. Cote as possibly related to 18CV11895. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 9, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pne)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Jeanette L. Dixon re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-11895 (DLC). Document filed by Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc..(Dixon, Jeanette)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Blackboard US Holdings, Inc. for Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.. Document filed by Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc..(Dixon, Jeanette)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dixon, Jeanette)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Joshua Menendez. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-16847130)Document filed by Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc..(Dixon, Jeanette)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc. v. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hamilton Specialty Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jeanette L Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joshua Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?