Mofaz v. Chung
Plaintiff: Zviel Mofaz
Defendant: Jarrod Chung
Case Number: 1:2019cv04200
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lewis A Kaplan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332md
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Steven T. Halperin dated July 3, 2019 re: Service of Process on the Defendant Jarrod Chung. Document filed by Zviel Mofaz.(Halperin, Steven)
July 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Amended Complaint. Jarrod Chung served on 6/22/2019, answer due 7/15/2019. Service was accepted by Jae Chung. Document filed by Zviel Mofaz. (Halperin, Steven)
June 20, 2019 Minute Entry Status Conference held on 6/20/2019. Plaintiff's counsel appeared but reported to the courtroom deputy clerk that service has not been made. Counsel was informed that the judge will dismiss the case for failure to prosecute if the complaint is not served within 90 days. (Mohan, Andrew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven T. Halperin on behalf of Zviel Mofaz. (Halperin, Steven)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from Jeffrey Weiskopf dated June 17, 2019. Document filed by Zviel Mofaz.(Weiskopf, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Jarrod Chung with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Zviel Mofaz. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Weiskopf, Jeffrey)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Jurisdiction is invoked pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332. The complaint fails adequately to allegethe existence of subject matter jurisdiction because, perhaps among other things, it fails adequately to allege: The citizenship of one or more natural persons. See, e.g., Sun Printing & PublishingAss'n v. Edwards, 194 U.S. 377 (1904); Leveraged Leasing Administration Corp.v. PacifiCorp Capital, Inc., 87 F.3d 44 (2d Cir. 1996). Absent the filing, on or before June 1, 2019, of an amended complaint adequately alleging the existence of subject matter jurisdiction, the action will be dismissed or, if removed, remanded. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2019.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/17/2019) (jca)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE SCHEDULING AND INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/13/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. (And as further set forth in this Order). (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/13/2019) (jca)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jarrod Chung. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jarrod Chung, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Zviel Mofaz. (Weiskopf, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiskopf, Jeffrey)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jarrod Chung. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16851831)Document filed by Zviel Mofaz.(Weiskopf, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mofaz v. Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zviel Mofaz
Represented By: Jeffrey Michael Weiskopf
Represented By: Steven T. Halperin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?