The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: Slade Industries, Inc. and Zurich American Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04212
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332ds
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Plaintiff, The Charter Oak fire Insurance Company, and Defendant, Zurich American Insurance Company ("NY Marine"), that Zurich's time to Answer the Complaint in the above-captioned action is hereby extended to July 10, 2019. IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED that for the purposes of this stipulation, that facsimile or electronic signatures and facsimile or electronic copy of this stipulation and be considered an original. SO ORDERED. Zurich American Insurance Company answer due 7/10/2019., Motions terminated: #11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, to July 10, 2019 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Alexandra E. Rigney dated June 7, 2019. filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/10/2019) (kv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint, to July 10, 2019 addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Alexandra E. Rigney dated June 7, 2019. Document filed by Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Stipulation)(Rigney, Alexandra)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Slade Industries, Inc. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service was accepted by Arda Safak. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Reid, Meg)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint, served. Zurich American Insurance Company served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service was accepted by Ms. Campangia. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Reid, Meg)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Zurich American Insurance Company. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Slade Industries, Inc.. (dnh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Zurich American Insurance Company, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Reid, Meg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Slade Industries, Inc, re: #2 Complaint,. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Reid, Meg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company.(Reid, Meg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reid, Meg)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Slade Industries, Inc., Zurich American Insurance Company. Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6, #7 Exhibit A7, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Reid, Meg)
May 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Meg R. Reid to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
May 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Meg R. Reid. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16856146)Document filed by The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A1, #2 Exhibit A2, #3 Exhibit A3, #4 Exhibit A4, #5 Exhibit A5, #6 Exhibit A6, #7 Exhibit A7, #8 Exhibit B, #9 Exhibit C, #10 Exhibit D, #11 Exhibit E, #12 Exhibit F)(Reid, Meg) Modified on 5/10/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company v. Zurich American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slade Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexandra Elizabeth Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?