MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Innovative Commodities Group, LLC
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: INNOVATIVE COMMODITIES GROUP, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04216
Filed: May 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1291
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/22/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 1305, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/20/2019) (ks)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Innovative Commodities Group, LLC.(Casey, Martin)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Innovative Commodities Group, LLC.(Casey, Martin)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANT'S TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATION AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, attorneys for the parties herein, that the lime in which INNOVATIVE COMMODITIES GROUP, LLC, may answer, appear or otherwise move with respect to the Complaint is hereby extended up to and including June 19, 2019. So ordered. Innovative Commodities Group, LLC answer due 6/19/2019. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/5/2019) (rjm)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Innovative Commodities Group, LLC. (Casey, Martin)
June 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin F Casey on behalf of Innovative Commodities Group, LLC. (Casey, Martin)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Innovative Commodities Group, LLC served on 5/15/2019, answer due 6/5/2019. Service was accepted by Javier Rena, CFO. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gareth Winston Stewart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MTS Logistics, Inc., Innovative Commodities Group, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
May 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gareth Winston Stewart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Innovative Commodities Group, LLC. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to INNOVATIVE COMMODITIES GROUP, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against INNOVATIVE COMMODITIES GROUP, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16853749)Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Innovative Commodities Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNOVATIVE COMMODITIES GROUP, LLC
Represented By: Martin F Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Gareth Winston Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?