Legion Partners Holdings, LLC v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Legion Partners Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Harriet Edelman, Harsha Ramalingam, Johnathan B Osborne, Ann Yerger, Patrick R Gaston, Steven H Temares, Mary Winston, Stephanie Bell-Rose, Virginia P Ruesterholz, Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. and Andrea Weiss
Case Number: 1:2019cv04248
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Stephanie Bell-Rose, Harriet Edelman, Patrick R Gaston, Johnathan B Osborne, Harsha Ramalingam, Virginia P Ruesterholz, Steven H Temares, Andrea Weiss, Mary Winston, Ann Yerger. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Ward, Adrienne)
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Stephanie Bell-Rose, Harriet Edelman, Patrick R Gaston, Johnathan B Osborne, Harsha Ramalingam, Virginia P Ruesterholz, Steven H Temares, Andrea Weiss, Mary Winston, Ann Yerger. (dnh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Steven H. Temares, Stephanie Bell-Rose, Patrick R. Gaston, Johnathan B. Osborne, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Harriet Edelman, Harsha Ramalingam, Andrea Weiss, Mary Winston, Ann Yerger, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne)
May 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adrienne Marie Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #21 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party names on the PDF and in the docket entry must exactly match the party of record (Mary A. Winston, Ann L. Yerger). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST As To - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Steven H. Temares, Stephanie Bell-Rose, Patrick R. Gaston, Johnathan B. Osborne, Virginia P. Ruesterholz, Harriet Edelman, Harsha Ramalingam, Andrea M. Weiss, Mary A. Winston, and Ann L. Yerger, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/14/2019 (dnh).
May 13, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC.(Ward, Adrienne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 19 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ward, Adrienne)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/13/2019) (cf)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/11/2019 at 10:50 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/13/2019) (cf)
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Adrienne Marie Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #14 Request for Issuance of Summons, #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, #9 Request for Issuance of Summons, #12 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #10 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons, #7 Request for Issuance of Summons, #13 Request for Issuance of Summons, #11 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Adrienne Marie Ward to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): the party name listed on the PDF (Plaintiff) is not a party in this case. (ldi)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Adrienne Marie Ward to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF case caption does not exactly match initial pleading caption;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard William Nicholson, Jr on behalf of Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Nicholson, Richard)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas James Fleming on behalf of Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Fleming, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ann Yerger, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mary Winston, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Andrea Weiss, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Steven H. Temares, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Virginia P. Ruesterholz, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harsha Ramalingam, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Johnathan B. Osborne, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Patrick R. Gaston, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harriet Edelman, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stephanie Bell-Rose, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERRORRULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC.(Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (ldi).
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Ward, Adrienne) Modified on 5/13/2019 (jgo).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bed Bath & Beyond Inc., Stephanie Bell-Rose, Harriet Edelman, Patrick R Gaston, Johnathan B Osborne, Harsha Ramalingam, Virginia P Ruesterholz, Steven H Temares, Andrea Weiss, Mary Winston, Ann Yerger. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16858839)Document filed by Legion Partners Holdings, LLC.(Ward, Adrienne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legion Partners Holdings, LLC v. Bed Bath & Beyond Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harriet Edelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harsha Ramalingam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnathan B Osborne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Yerger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R Gaston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven H Temares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Winston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Bell-Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia P Ruesterholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bed Bath & Beyond Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legion Partners Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Richard William Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Adrienne Marie Ward
Represented By: Thomas James Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?