BS BIG V, LLC. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Plaintiff: BHRA BIG V, LLC, BS BIG V, LLC. and BHC BIG V
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04273
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher T. Bradley on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Bradley, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Bradley, Christopher)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Johnathan Charles Lerner on behalf of BHC BIG V, BHRA BIG V, LLC, BS BIG V, LLC.. (Lerner, Johnathan)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED between the undersigned counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants, that Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended up to and including July 3, 2019. (Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company answer due 7/3/2019.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/11/2019) (jwh)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Christopher T. Bradley dated June 10, 2019 re: Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation)(Bradley, Christopher)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/21/2019) (rj)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc. for Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company.(Bradley, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Bradley, Christopher)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Christopher T. Bradley. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on BS BIG V, LLC on 5/10/19. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Bradley, Christopher)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme court, County of Rockland. Case Number: 32079/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16863539).Document filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service)(Bradley, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BS BIG V, LLC. et al v. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHRA BIG V, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan Charles Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BS BIG V, LLC.
Represented By: Johnathan Charles Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BHC BIG V
Represented By: Johnathan Charles Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Christopher T. Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?