Kannuu Pty Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al

Plaintiff: Kannuu Pty Ltd.
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. and Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04297
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Edgardo Ramos
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. answer due 9/9/2019. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Edgardo Ramos)(Text Only Order) (jar)
June 17, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg)(Goldberg, Perry)
June 15, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer of Samsung Electronics America, Inc. addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Lewis E. Hudnell, III dated 6/15/2019. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd..(Hudnell, Lewis)
June 15, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 14, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. waiver sent on 6/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
June 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California (our court does not accept state bar certificates for California). Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit/Declaration - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
June 6, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg)(Goldberg, Perry) Modified on 6/6/2019 (jc).
June 6, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Kannuu Pty Ltd.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17028032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.>/B.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of California;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 5, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Perry Goldberg to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Kannuu Pty Ltd.. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17028032. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg, #2 Text of Proposed Order regarding Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Perry Goldberg)(Goldberg, Perry) Modified on 6/6/2019 (wb).
May 13, 2019 Filing 10 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hudnell, Lewis)
May 13, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Lewis Emery Hudnell, III to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the second page of the Civil Cover Sheet was omitted. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Hudnell, Lewis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd..(Hudnell, Lewis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Hudnell, Lewis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Hudnell, Lewis) Modified on 5/13/2019 (dnh).
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16866421)Document filed by Kannuu Pty Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Hudnell, Lewis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kannuu Pty Ltd. v. Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samsung Electronics America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kannuu Pty Ltd.
Represented By: Lewis Emery Hudnell, III
Represented By: Perry Mark Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?