Barbera v. Grande et al
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Defendant: Grandari, Inc. and Ariana Grande
Case Number: 1:2019cv04349
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew J. Craig on behalf of Grandari, Inc., Ariana Grande. (Craig, Matthew)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to RE-FILE Document #9 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR(S): service dates were not entered correctly, please re-file. (ldi)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ldi).
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint, Complaint. Grandari, Inc. served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019; Ariana Grande served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard) Modified on 5/22/2019 (ldi).
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Charles Quinn on behalf of Grandari, Inc., Ariana Grande. (Quinn, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 11D, U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/15/2019) (rjm)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Grandari, Inc., Ariana Grande. (sj)
May 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
May 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 (REDACTED) COMPLAINT against Grandari, Inc., Ariana Grande. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (rjm).
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ARIANA GRANDE and GRANDARI, INC., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Grandari, Inc., Ariana Grande. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16877386)Document filed by Robert Barbera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barbera v. Grande et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grandari, Inc.
Represented By: John Charles Quinn
Represented By: Matthew J. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ariana Grande
Represented By: John Charles Quinn
Represented By: Matthew J. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Barbera
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?