McGlynn v. Gizmodo Media Group, LLC

Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Defendant: Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04403
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gizmodo Media Group, LLC served on 5/16/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. Document filed by David McGlynn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Capaccio on behalf of Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Capaccio, Lauren)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/17/2019.(Chan, Tsz)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/14/2019) (kv)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 SECOND LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Cynthia S. Arato dated June 13, 2019. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER...This case, involving claims under the Copyright Act, 17 U.S.C. 101 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Court's experience, cases involving copyright claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference, the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. The parties are hereby notified that Local Rule 83.9 shall govern the mediation, and the parties are directed to participate in the mediation in good faith. No later than one week after the conclusion of all mediation in this case, the parties are directed to notify the Court whether they successfully resolved the case in mediation. The Court specifically requests a mediator with expertise in copyright matters be assigned. To facilitate prompt mediation, the Court orders Plaintiff: to file proof of service no more than three days after service has been effected; and to produce to Defendant, by the earlier of 1) 14 days after service of process or 2) three business days in advance of any mediation session, copies of records sufficient to show the royalty paid the last three times the picture that is at issue in this case was licensed, as well as the number of times the picture was licensed in the last five years. SO ORDERED. Please reference the following when corresponding with the Mediation Office. E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone (212) 805-0643, and facsimile (212) 805-0647. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/24/2019. Mediator Expertise Request due by 6/17/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/12/2019) (kv)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Gizmodo Media Group, LLC answer due 6/13/2019. (jca)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/6/2019) (jca)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Cynthia S. Arato dated June 5, 2019. Document filed by Gizmodo Media Group, LLC.(Arato, Cynthia)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Cynthia S. Arato on behalf of Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Arato, Cynthia)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gizmodo Media Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by David McGlynn. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gizmodo Media Group, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16885503)Document filed by David McGlynn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlynn v. Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McGlynn
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gizmodo Media Group, LLC
Represented By: Cynthia S. Arato
Represented By: Lauren Capaccio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?