Western Express Bancshares, LLC v. Green Dot Corporation

Plaintiff: Western Express Bancshares, LLC
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04465
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Denise L Cote
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338pt
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Adam Robert Brausa to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #10 Motion for Andrew Louis Perito to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Denise L. Cote)(Text Only Order) (gr)
June 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #9 MOTION for Adam Robert Brausa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17061374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #10 MOTION for Andrew Louis Perito to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17062033. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Andrew Louis Perito to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17062033. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Perito, Andrew)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Adam Robert Brausa to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17061374. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Brausa, Adam)
May 23, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Denise L. Cote, Patent Judge. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Green Dot Corporation waiver sent on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. Document filed by Western Express Bancshares, LLC. (Langsam, Andrew)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Green Dot Corporation. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Andrew Sol Langsam. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 18:1341; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1338pt; the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Langsam, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Green Dot Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Western Express Bancshares, LLC. (Langsam, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Western Express Bancshares, LLC.(Langsam, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Langsam, Andrew)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Green Dot Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16896446)Document filed by Western Express Bancshares, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Patent), #2 Exhibit B (Cert. of Correction))(Langsam, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Express Bancshares, LLC v. Green Dot Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Represented By: Adam R. Brausa
Represented By: Andrew L. Perito
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Express Bancshares, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Sol Langsam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?