Maersk Line A/S v. Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc
Plaintiff: MAERSK LINE A/S
Defendant: FUYAO GLASS ILLINOIS INC. d/b/a FUYAO GLASS AMERICA and Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04468
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 04:30 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (kv)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Time to answer the complaitn extended to August 30, 2019. Conference adjourned to Thursday, September 5, 2019, at 4:30 p.m. SO ORDERED. Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc. answer due 8/30/2019. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/26/2019) (kv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and adjourn July 24 conference addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Dayton Haigney dated June 24, 2019. Document filed by Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stipulation to extend time to answer)(Haigney, Dayton)
June 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Dayton Peter Haigney, III on behalf of Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc.. (Haigney, Dayton)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc.. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $198,134,000; County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $198,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MAERSK LINE A/S, FUYAO GLASS ILLINOIS INC. d/b/a FUYAO GLASS AMERICA. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FUYAO GLASS ILLINOIS INC. d/b/a FUYAO GLASS AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MAERSK LINE A/S. (Wolfson, Garth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MAERSK LINE A/S.(Wolfson, Garth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolfson, Garth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FUYAO GLASS ILLINOIS INC. d/b/a FUYAO GLASS AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16896568)Document filed by MAERSK LINE A/S.(Wolfson, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maersk Line A/S v. Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAERSK LINE A/S
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FUYAO GLASS ILLINOIS INC. d/b/a FUYAO GLASS AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fuyao Glass Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Dayton Peter Haigney, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?