Iantosca v. Elie Tahari, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Mark Iantosca
Defendant: Elie Tahari, Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04527
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jed S Rakoff
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE re: Document No. #10 MOTION for Sergei Orel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the filing fee was not paid; Pursuant to Rule 1.3. the Attorney Affidavit missing the language of disciplinary.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (wb)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Sergei Orel to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Elie Tahari, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Order, #2 Appendix Certificate of Good Standing)(Orel, Sergei) Modified on 7/12/2019 (wb).
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Pre-Motion Phone Call Request. Document filed by Elie Tahari, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Individual Rules of Practice)(Orel, Sergei)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sergei Orel on behalf of Elie Tahari, Ltd.. (Orel, Sergei)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: Defendants's time to move or answer is extended to July 10, 2019. Elie Tahari, Ltd. answer due 7/10/2019. Ready for Trial by 12/2/2019. The case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 8/16/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 8/16/2019. Deposition due by 11/1/2019. Requests to Admit. Requests to Admit, if any, must be served by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions due by 11/8/2019. Responses due by 11/22/2019 Replies due by 11/29/2019. Oral Argument set for 12/6/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2019 at 04:00 PM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 7/1/2019) (jwh)
July 1, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 7/1/2019. (Kotowski, Linda)
June 30, 2019 Filing 6 INITIAL REPORT OF PARTIES BEFORE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Document filed by Mark Iantosca.(Liebowitz, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/1/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 14B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Jed S. Rakoff, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 6/13/2019) (jwh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elie Tahari, Ltd.. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Elie Tahari, Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Mark Iantosca. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elie Tahari, Ltd.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16902946)Document filed by Mark Iantosca. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iantosca v. Elie Tahari, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Iantosca
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elie Tahari, Ltd.
Represented By: Sergei Orel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?