Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC et al
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: GRK 8th Street, GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC, Fulton Quality Foods LLC, GRK Fresh Holdings, LLC, GRK PAS LLC and GRK 8th Street, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04614
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Loretta A Preska
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. All Defendants. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Seltzer, Daniel)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to GRK Fresh Holdings, LLC. (jgo)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to GRK FRESH HOLDINGS LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Seltzer, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seltzer, Daniel)
May 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Loretta A. Preska. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Daniel Lewis Seltzer. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission; GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC; GRK Fresh Holdings, LLC; Fulton Quality Foods LLC; GRK PAS LLC; GRK 8th Street, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; alias party name was omitted;. (jgo)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Daniel Lewis Seltzer. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code none (no fee required);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to wv (waived);. (jgo)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Daniel Lewis Seltzer to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF was not signed by the attorney;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Seltzer, Daniel) Modified on 5/21/2019 (jgo).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fulton Quality Foods LLC, GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC, GRK 8th Street, GRK Fresh Holdings, LLC, GRK PAS LLC. Document filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission.(Seltzer, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Daniel Lewis Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRK 8th Street
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRK 451 Lexington Ave LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fulton Quality Foods LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRK Fresh Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRK PAS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRK 8th Street, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?