Gleason v. Neway Fertility Corp

Plaintiff: Kim Gleason
Defendant: Neway Fertility Corp
Case Number: 1:2019cv04622
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: The Basil Law Group, P.C., New Attorney: Babchik & Young, LLP . Document filed by Neway Fertility Corp. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Affirmation in Support of Motion to Change Attorney)(Babchik, Jack)
June 24, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 7/24/2019.(Chan, Tsz)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 6/21/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (Chan, Tsz)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Neway Fertility Corp.(Basil, Robert)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Neway Fertility Corp.(Basil, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neway Fertility Corp. (pc)
May 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Nicole Deanna Grunfeld. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neway Fertility Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Kim Gleason. (Grunfeld, Nicole)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Grunfeld, Nicole)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Neway Fertility Corp. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16917940)Document filed by Kim Gleason.(Grunfeld, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gleason v. Neway Fertility Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neway Fertility Corp
Represented By: Jack Babchik
Represented By: Robert James Basil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Gleason
Represented By: Nicole Deanna Grunfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?