Amlin Insurance SE v. M/V Stolt Island et al
Plaintiff: Amlin Insurance SE
Defendant: Stolt Island B.V., M/V Stolt Island, her engines, boilers, etc., Stolt Tankers BV and M/V Stolt Island
Case Number: 1:2019cv04645
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lorna G Schofield
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333ad
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #8 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application GRANTED in part. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 18, 2019, is adjourned to August 29, 2019, at 10:40 a.m. Initial Conference set for 8/29/2019 at 10:40 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/15/2019) (cf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Lawrence C. Glynn dated July 12, 2019. Document filed by Amlin Insurance SE.(Glynn, Lawrence)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file their joint letter and proposed Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order as soon as possible, and in any event no later than July 15, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/12/2019) (cf)
May 31, 2019 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #7 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ks)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 1106, Thurgood Marshal Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/31/2019) (ks)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M/V Stolt Island, Stolt Island B.V., Stolt Tankers BV. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to M/V Stolt Island, Stolt Island B.V., Stolt Tankers BV, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Amlin Insurance SE. (Glynn, Lawrence)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent MS Amlin plc for Amlin Insurance SE. Document filed by Amlin Insurance SE.(Glynn, Lawrence)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Glynn, Lawrence)
May 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lawrence Caruso Glynn. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: M/V Stolt Island, her engines, boilers, etc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M/V Stolt Island, her engines, boilers, etc., Stolt Island B.V., Stolt Tankers BV. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16920880)Document filed by Amlin Insurance SE.(Glynn, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amlin Insurance SE v. M/V Stolt Island et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolt Island B.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Stolt Island, her engines, boilers, etc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stolt Tankers BV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M/V Stolt Island
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amlin Insurance SE
Represented By: Lawrence Caruso Glynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?