Helt v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Robert Helt
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Inc. and Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04651
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 11 AMENDED SCHEDULE: Upon consideration of the parties' agreed-to proposed amended schedule, the Court adopts the following deadlines: Motions due by 8/13/2020. Responses due by 9/17/2020 Replies due by 10/5/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. Pursuant to instructions from Chambers on 7/18/2019. (ks)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.. Document filed by Robert Helt.(Rojas, Rachal)
May 21, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
May 21, 2019 Filing 9 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Eastern; Case Number: 1:19-cv-00209. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-16). CASE TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of New York. MDL No. 2859. (Robles, S) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to STAY by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Inc.. Attorney Laddon, Tarifa Belle added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, #2 Exhibit B to Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings, #3 Proposed Order Regarding Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings)(Laddon, Tarifa) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zimmer Biomet, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Richardson, Katelyn) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Richardson, Katelyn) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc. served on 4/26/2019, answer due 5/17/2019. (Richardson, Katelyn) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Katelyn Elizabeth Richardson* *Johnson Law Group* *2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700* *Houston, TX 77098*. (Gonzalez, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]
February 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Biomet US, Inc., Zimmer Biomet, Inc. by Robert Helt. Attorney Richardson, Katelyn Elizabeth added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8108222) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Richardson, Katelyn) [Transferred from California Eastern on 5/21/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helt v. Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Helt
Represented By: Katelyn Elizabeth Richardson
Represented By: Rachal G. Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet US, Inc.
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Inc.
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Tarifa Belle Laddon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?