Goodman v. Nvidia Corporation

Plaintiff: James B. Goodman
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04667
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE TERMINATED - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a final decision was rendered on 6/7/2019 in a court action filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (mro)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(1)(A): The plaintiff has filed a notice of dismissal of this action under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. It is respectfully pointed out that the Defendant, Nvidia Corp., has not responded to the Complaint. The plaintiff has filed a notice of dismissal of this action under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/5/2019) (mro)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 41(1)(A). Document filed by James B. Goodman. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fink, David)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court at the time and place listed below. DUE DATE OF JOINT LETTER and PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN: August 13, 2019. DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: August 20, 2019 at 3:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12C of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse at 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, 10007. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/20/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 12C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Gregory H. Woods. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 5/28/2019) (ama)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nvidia Corporation. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Fink, David)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NVIDIA CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James B. Goodman. (Fink, David)
May 22, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pc)
May 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Fink to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Party name on the summons does not match what is listed on the Complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney David Fink. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PATENT FORM. Notice to Attorney David Fink to RE-FILE re: Document No. #4 AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the Date of Patent and Holder of Patent field on the AO 120 Patent/Trademark form was not completed by the attorney;.. Re-file the document using the event type AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct AO 120 Patent/Trademark PDF form. (pc)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Fink, David) Modified on 5/22/2019 (pc).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NVIDIA CORP., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by James B. Goodman. (Fink, David) Modified on 5/22/2019 (pc).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Fink, David)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nvidia Corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16924484)Document filed by James B. Goodman.(Fink, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman v. Nvidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nvidia Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James B. Goodman
Represented By: David Fink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?